Jensen v. United States Tennis Association et al
Plaintiff: Adrienne Jensen
Defendant: Kansas City Racquet Club and United States Tennis Association
Case Number: 2:2020cv02422
Filed: August 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Teresa J James
Referring Judge: John W Lungstrum
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jonathan Little for Adrienne Jensen pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 10/20/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (smc)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MOTION for attorney Jonathan Little to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5294261.) by Plaintiff Adrienne Jensen (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Electronic Filing Form)(Dove, Christopher)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kansas City Racquet Club. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER. Upon the request of plaintiff and defendant United States Tennis Association, the Court holds in abeyance all the requirements of and deadlines set in the Court's #18 Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling pending notification of plaintiff's service of process upon defendant KC Racquet Club. The Scheduling Conference set for 11/9/2020 and all related deadlines are canceled. Counsel for plaintiff shall email chambers immediately upon obtaining service so that the scheduling conference can be rescheduled and other Rule 26 deadlines reset. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 10/14/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(byk)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 11/9/2020 at 11:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James. Participating counsel must dial 1-888-363-4749 and enter ACCESS CODE 4901386 to join the conference. Rule 26(f) Planning Conference Deadline 10/19/2020. Completed Report of Parties' Planning Conference and Rule 26(a) Initial Disclosures due 11/2/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 9/30/2020. (byk)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Defendant United States Tennis Association re: #6 Motion to Dismiss Party, (Attachments: #1 Press Release, #2 Gilbert)(Johannsen, Derek)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Adrienne Jensen re #6 Motion to Dismiss Party, (Dove, Christopher)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #6 MOTION to dismiss party USTA filed by Derek G. Johannsen on behalf of United States Tennis Association and the Response deadline is extended to 9/11/2020. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 09/03/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ses)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #6 . The motion will be resolved by the District Judge. (mn)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #6 by Plaintiff Adrienne Jensen (Dove, Christopher)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #6 Motion to Dismiss Party USTA. Response deadline 9/4/2020 per 9 Order.(hw)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Missouri Western; Case Number 4:20-cv-00610. Electronic file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (hw)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #3 motion to change venue. Signed on 8/27/2020 by District Judge Greg Kays. (Law clerk) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 8/27/2020.]
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 RESPONSE to motion re #3 MOTION to change venue filed by Christopher S Dove on behalf of Plaintiff Adrienne Jensen. Reply suggestions due by 9/10/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Dove, Christopher) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 8/27/2020.]
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Case electronically transferred to District of District of Kansas. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Ellis, Lindsey) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 8/27/2020.]
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #7 motion for extension of time to file response/reply re #3 MOTION to change venue. Plaintiff's suggestions in opposition/response is due by 8/28/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. Signed on 8/14/2020 by District Judge Greg Kays. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Law clerk) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 8/27/2020.]
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 motion for extension of time to file response/reply re #6 MOTION to dismiss party USTA. Plaintiff's suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/4/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court.Signed on 8/14/2020 by District Judge Greg Kays. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Law clerk) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 8/27/2020.]
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply as to #6 MOTION to dismiss party USTA filed by Christopher S Dove on behalf of Adrienne Jensen. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/27/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #6 ) (Dove, Christopher) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 8/27/2020.]
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply as to #3 MOTION to change venue filed by Christopher S Dove on behalf of Adrienne Jensen. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/27/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #3 ) (Dove, Christopher) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 8/27/2020.]
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 8/27/2020.]
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION to dismiss party USTA filed by Derek G. Johannsen on behalf of United States Tennis Association. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/21/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Press Release)(Johannsen, Derek) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 8/27/2020.]
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RULE 16 NOTICE. Rule 26 conference due by 9/4/2020. Proposed scheduling order due by 9/18/2020. Signed on 8/6/20 by District Judge Greg Kays. (Strodtman, Tracy) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 8/27/2020.]
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 8/27/2020.]
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION to change venue filed by Derek G. Johannsen on behalf of Kansas City Racquet Club, United States Tennis Association. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/14/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Johannsen, Derek) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 8/27/2020.]
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Derek G. Johannsen on behalf of Defendant United States Tennis Association.(Johannsen, Derek) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 8/27/2020.]
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Jackson County, Missouri County, case number 2016-CV13141, Kansas City Racquet Club, United States Tennis Association. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-6973487. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Petition and Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Johannsen, Derek) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 8/27/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jensen v. United States Tennis Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adrienne Jensen
Represented By: Christopher S. Dove
Represented By: Jonathan C. Little
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kansas City Racquet Club
Represented By: Derek G. Johannsen
Represented By: Heather Hatley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Tennis Association
Represented By: Derek G. Johannsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?