Colvin v. Tyson Foods, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Henry Randall Colvin
Defendant: Tyson Poultry, Inc., Tyson Chicken, Inc., Koch Foods, Inc., Pilgrim's Pride Corporation, Sanderson Farms, Inc., Koch Meat Co., Inc. doing business as Koch Poultry Co., Perdue Foods LLC, Tyson Breeders, Inc. and Tyson Foods, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv02464
Filed: September 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: James P O'Hara
Referring Judge: Holly L Teeter
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2020 Filing 45 NOTICE OF JOINDER by Pilgrim's Pride Corporation re #14 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to the First-to-File Rule (Gilman, Stacey)
October 27, 2020 Filing 44 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Koch Foods, Inc. identifying None as corporate parent . (Woolf, John)
October 27, 2020 Filing 43 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Koch Meat Co., Inc. identifying Koch Foods, Inc. as corporate parent . (Woolf, John)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting #41 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Scott W. Pedigo for Koch Foods, Inc., Koch Meat Co., Inc. pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 10/26/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (heo)
October 26, 2020 Filing 41 MOTION for attorney Scott W. Pedigo to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5300444.) by Defendants Koch Foods, Inc., Koch Meat Co., Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 ECF Registration Form)(Woolf, John)
October 23, 2020 Filing 40 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Pilgrim's Pride Corporation identifying JBS, S.A. as corporate parent . (Gilman, Stacey)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting #38 unopposed motion to stay Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 deadlines and discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 10/23/2020. (amh)
October 22, 2020 Filing 38 Unopposed MOTION to Stay Deadlines by Defendants Sanderson Farms, Inc., Sanderson Farms, Inc., Sanderson Farms, Inc., Sanderson Farms, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (May, Kirk)
October 22, 2020 Filing 37 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Thomas C. Jones on behalf of Henry Randall Colvin. (Jones, Thomas)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #35 defendant Perdue Foods, LLC's unopposed motion for extension. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint by December 8, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 10/22/20. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jc)
October 22, 2020 Filing 35 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (attorney) or otherwise respond by Defendant Perdue Foods LLC (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Campbell, Terrence)
October 22, 2020 Filing 34 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Timothy C. Gaarder on behalf of Henry Randall Colvin. (Gaarder, Timothy)
October 22, 2020 Filing 33 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Thomas E. Ruzicka, Jr on behalf of Henry Randall Colvin. (Ruzicka, Thomas)
October 22, 2020 Filing 32 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Grant L. Davis on behalf of Henry Randall Colvin. (Davis, Grant)
October 22, 2020 Filing 31 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Henry Randall Colvin upon Perdue Foods LLC served on 10/13/2020, answer due 11/3/2020 (Davis, Grant)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting motion for extension of time #29 . The parties filed a stipulation extending the time to respond and reply to the pending motion to dismiss #14 . The Court construes the stipulation as a joint motion to extend the deadlines. The Court grants the motion. Plaintiff shall file its response to the motion to dismiss on or before November 17, 2020. Defendants shall file their reply on or before December 15, 2020. Signed by District Judge Holly L. Teeter on 10/22/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(md)
October 21, 2020 Filing 29 STIPULATION to Extend Plaintiff's Time to Respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to the First-to-File Rule and Extension of Time for Defendants to File a Reply to Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to the First-to-File Rule by Tyson Breeders, Inc., Tyson Chicken, Inc., Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Poultry, Inc.. (Church, Daniel)
October 19, 2020 Filing 28 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Henry Randall Colvin upon Tyson Breeders, Inc. served on 9/30/2020, answer due 12/8/2020 (Davis, Grant)
October 19, 2020 Filing 27 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Henry Randall Colvin upon Tyson Foods, Inc. served on 9/30/2020, answer due 12/8/2020 (Davis, Grant)
October 19, 2020 Filing 26 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Tyson Breeders, Inc., Tyson Chicken, Inc., Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Poultry, Inc. identifying None as corporate parent . (Church, Daniel)
October 16, 2020 ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED as to Pilgrim's Pride Corporation. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)
October 16, 2020 Filing 25 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Perdue Foods LLC identifying Perdue Farms, Inc. as corporate parent . (Campbell, Terrence)
October 16, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE OF JOINDER by Perdue Foods LLC re #14 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to the First-to-File Rule (Campbell, Terrence)
October 15, 2020 Filing 23 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Henry Randall Colvin upon Tyson Chicken, Inc. served on 9/30/2020, answer due 12/8/2020 (Davis, Grant)
October 15, 2020 Filing 22 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Henry Randall Colvin upon Koch Meat Co., Inc. served on 10/8/2020, answer due 12/8/2020 (Davis, Grant)
October 15, 2020 Filing 21 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Henry Randall Colvin upon Koch Foods, Inc. served on 9/30/2020, answer due 12/8/2020 (Davis, Grant)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Bradley D. Justus; granting #18 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Kail J. Jethmalani; granting #19 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Rachel J. Adcox for Tyson Breeders, Inc., Tyson Chicken, Inc., Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Poultry, Inc. pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 10/15/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (heo)
October 15, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION for attorney 1 to appear pro hac vice for Rachel J. Adcox ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5289090.) by Defendants Tyson Breeders, Inc., Tyson Chicken, Inc., Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Poultry, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Attachments: #1 ECF Registration Form, #2 Affidavit)(Church, Daniel)
October 15, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION for attorney Kail J Jethmalani to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5289072.) by Defendants Tyson Breeders, Inc., Tyson Chicken, Inc., Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Poultry, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Attachments: #1 ECF Registration Form, #2 Affidavit)(Church, Daniel)
October 15, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for attorney Bradley D Justus to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5288992.) by Defendants Tyson Breeders, Inc., Tyson Chicken, Inc., Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Poultry, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Attachments: #1 ECF Registration Form, #2 Affidavit)(Church, Daniel)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Christa C. Cottrell; granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Kate Guilfoyle; granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Daniel E. Laytin; granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Stacy Pepper for Sanderson Farms, Inc. defendants pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 10/14/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (heo)
October 13, 2020 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #14 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to the First-to-File Rule by Defendants Sanderson Farms, Inc., Sanderson Farms, Inc., Sanderson Farms, Inc., Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(May, Kirk)
October 13, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to the First-to-File Rule by Defendants Sanderson Farms, Inc., Sanderson Farms, Inc., Sanderson Farms, Inc., Sanderson Farms, Inc., Perdue Foods LLC and Pilgrim's Pride Corporation (May, Kirk) Modified to add Perdue Foods LLC as filing party to motion per DE #24 on 10/20/2020 (smc). Modified to add Pilgrim's Pride Corporation as filing party to motion per #45 on 10/29/2020 (smc).
October 13, 2020 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Processing Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc., Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Production Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Foods Division) identifying Sanderson Farms, Inc. as corporate parent (May, Kirk)
October 13, 2020 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Processing Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc., Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Production Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Foods Division) identifying None as corporate parent (May, Kirk)
October 13, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for attorney Stacy Pepper to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5286862.) by Defendants Sanderson Farms, Inc., Sanderson Farms, Inc., Sanderson Farms, Inc., Sanderson Farms, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit in Support, #2 Exhibit Pro Hac Vice Electronic Filing Registration Form, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(May, Kirk)
October 13, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for attorney Daniel E. Laytin to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5286860.) by Defendants Sanderson Farms, Inc., Sanderson Farms, Inc., Sanderson Farms, Inc., Sanderson Farms, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit in Support, #2 Exhibit Pro Hac Vice Electronic Filing Registration Form, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(May, Kirk)
October 13, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for attorney Kate Guilfoyle to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5286858.) by Defendants Sanderson Farms, Inc., Sanderson Farms, Inc., Sanderson Farms, Inc., Sanderson Farms, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit in Support, #2 Exhibit Pro Hac Vice Electronic Filing Registration Form, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(May, Kirk)
October 13, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for attorney Christa C. Cottrell to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5286854.) by Defendants Sanderson Farms, Inc., Sanderson Farms, Inc., Sanderson Farms, Inc., Sanderson Farms, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit in Support, #2 Exhibit Pro Hac Vice Electronic Filing Registration Form, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(May, Kirk)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 unopposed motion for extension of time until December 8, 2020, for Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Chicken, Inc., Tyson Breeders, Inc., Tyson Poultry, Inc., Koch Foods, Inc., Koch Meat Co., Inc., Sanderson Farms, Inc., Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Food Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Production Division), and Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Processing Division) to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 10/13/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (amh)
October 13, 2020 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer All Defendants by Defendants Tyson Breeders, Inc., Tyson Chicken, Inc., Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Poultry, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Church, Daniel)
October 12, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Henry Randall Colvin. Tyson Poultry, Inc. waiver sent on 10/9/2020, answer due 12/8/2020. (Davis, Grant)
October 8, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of request to consolidate and transfer to JPML Pending Case No. 143. (hw)
September 24, 2020 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Koch Foods, Inc., Koch Meat Co., Inc., Perdue Foods LLC, Pilgrim's Pride Corporation, Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Processing Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc., Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Production Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Foods Division), Tyson Breeders, Inc., Tyson Chicken, Inc., Tyson Foods, Inc. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (gw)
September 21, 2020 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Henry Randall Colvin - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Davis, Grant)
September 18, 2020 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Designation of place of trial is missing. The filing party/attorney is directed to correct the deficiency immediately.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
September 18, 2020 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Holly L. Teeter and Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
September 18, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Henry Randall Colvin. (Davis, Grant)
September 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5262708.), filed by Henry Randall Colvin.(Davis, Grant)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Colvin v. Tyson Foods, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyson Poultry, Inc.
Represented By: Kail J. Jethmalani
Represented By: Rachel J. Adcox
Represented By: Bradley D. Justus
Represented By: Daniel F. Church
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyson Chicken, Inc.
Represented By: Kail J. Jethmalani
Represented By: Rachel J. Adcox
Represented By: Bradley D. Justus
Represented By: Daniel F. Church
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Koch Foods, Inc.
Represented By: John P. Woolf
Represented By: Scott W. Pedigo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pilgrim's Pride Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanderson Farms, Inc.
Represented By: Kate Guilfoyle
Represented By: Christa C. Cottrell
Represented By: Daniel E. Laytin
Represented By: Stacy Pepper
Represented By: Kirk T. May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Koch Meat Co., Inc. doing business as Koch Poultry Co.
Represented By: John P. Woolf
Represented By: Scott W. Pedigo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perdue Foods LLC
Represented By: Terrence J. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyson Breeders, Inc.
Represented By: Kail J. Jethmalani
Represented By: Rachel J. Adcox
Represented By: Bradley D. Justus
Represented By: Daniel F. Church
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyson Foods, Inc.
Represented By: Kail J. Jethmalani
Represented By: Rachel J. Adcox
Represented By: Bradley D. Justus
Represented By: Daniel F. Church
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry Randall Colvin
Represented By: Timothy C. Gaarder
Represented By: Grant L. Davis
Represented By: Thomas E. Ruzicka, Jr.
Represented By: Thomas C. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?