Main Street Autobody & Tow, Inc. v. CDJ Automotive, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Main Street Autobody & Tow, Inc.
Defendant: Douglas A. Kinney and CDJ Automotive, LLC doing business as Main Street of Lansing doing business as Main Street Body & Paint
Case Number: 2:2020cv02471
Filed: September 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Gwynne E Birzer
Referring Judge: Julie A Robinson
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Defendants' Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. CDJ Automotive, LLC and Douglas A. Kinney shall answer or otherwise respond on or before 11/23/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 11/2/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ala)
November 2, 2020 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (attorney) STIPULATED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT by Defendants CDJ Automotive, LLC, Douglas A. Kinney (referred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer) (Karpin, Kevin)
October 13, 2020 Filing 5 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 11/2/2020 for Defendants CDJ Automotive, LLC, Douglas A. Kinney to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 10/13/2020. (ca)
October 5, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Main Street Autobody & Tow, Inc. upon Douglas A. Kinney served on 9/28/2020, answer due 10/19/2020 (Kernell, James)
October 5, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Main Street Autobody & Tow, Inc. upon CDJ Automotive, LLC served on 9/28/2020, answer due 10/19/2020 (Kernell, James)
September 24, 2020 SUMMONS ISSUED as to CDJ Automotive, LLC, Douglas A. Kinney. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (gw)
September 24, 2020 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson and Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (gw)
September 24, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Main Street Autobody & Tow, Inc.. (Kernell, James)
September 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5268338.), filed by Main Street Autobody & Tow, Inc..(Kernell, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Main Street Autobody & Tow, Inc. v. CDJ Automotive, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Main Street Autobody & Tow, Inc.
Represented By: James J. Kernell
Represented By: Kyle D. Donnelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas A. Kinney
Represented By: Kevin J. Karpin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CDJ Automotive, LLC doing business as Main Street of Lansing doing business as Main Street Body & Paint
Represented By: Kevin J. Karpin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?