Hawley et al v. Boysen et al
Plaintiff: Blake Hawley, Motega Holdings, Inc. and Motega Holdings, Inc. doing business as Motega Health
Defendant: Initiatives Worldwide, LLC, Melicent Boysen, Jeff Shear, Al Kershman and Shear Kershman Laboratories, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv02562
Filed: November 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Toby Crouse
Referring Judge: Teresa J James
2 Judge: Holly L Teeter
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by Melicent Boysen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(hw)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to District Judge Toby Crouse for all further proceedings. District Judge Holly L. Teeter no longer assigned to case. Signed by District Judge Holly L. Teeter on 12/17/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(md)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Blake Hawley, Motega Holdings, Inc. upon Initiatives Worldwide, LLC served on 11/17/2020, answer due 12/8/2020 (McInnes, Jack)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Blake Hawley, Motega Holdings, Inc. upon Melicent Boysen served on 11/17/2020, answer due 12/8/2020 (McInnes, Jack)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Blake Hawley, Motega Holdings, Inc.. Al Kershman waiver sent on 11/17/2020, answer due 1/19/2021; Jeff Shear waiver sent on 11/17/2020, answer due 1/19/2021; Shear Kershman Laboratories, Inc. waiver sent on 11/17/2020, answer due 1/19/2021. (Ashworth, Benjamin)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 AO FORM 120: REPORT on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Ashworth, Benjamin)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - AO 120 form needs to be filed. The filing party/attorney is directed to correct the deficiency immediately.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (hw)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Motega Holdings, Inc. identifying None as corporate parent (Ashworth, Benjamin)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiffs Blake Hawley, Motega Holdings, Inc. - trial to be held in Kansas City. (McInnes, Jack)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiffs Blake Hawley, Motega Holdings, Inc.. (McInnes, Jack)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5315658.), filed by Blake Hawley, Motega Holdings, Inc..(McInnes, Jack)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order SUMMONS ISSUED as to Melicent Boysen, Initiatives Worldwide, LLC, Al Kershman, Jeff Shear, Shear Kershman Laboratories, Inc. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Holly L. Teeter and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hawley et al v. Boysen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Initiatives Worldwide, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melicent Boysen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Shear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Al Kershman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shear Kershman Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blake Hawley
Represented By: Jack D. McInnes
Represented By: Benjamin Darwin Ashworth
Represented By: Robert A. Wasserman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Motega Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Jack D. McInnes
Represented By: Benjamin Darwin Ashworth
Represented By: Robert A. Wasserman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Motega Holdings, Inc. doing business as Motega Health
Represented By: Jack D. McInnes
Represented By: Benjamin Darwin Ashworth
Represented By: Robert A. Wasserman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?