National Nurses Organizing Committee v. Midwest Division-MMC, LLC
Plaintiff: National Nurses Organizing Committee-Missouri & Kansas/National Nurses United and National Nurses Organizing Committee
Defendant: Midwest Division-MMC, LLC d/b/a Menorah Medical Center and Midwest Division-MMC, LLC doing business as Menorah Medical Center
Case Number: 2:2020cv02571
Filed: November 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: James P O'Hara
Referring Judge: Julie A Robinson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER: See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 1/6/21. (jc)
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting as unopposed #13 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. The response deadline is extended to 2/3/2021. Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 12/29/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ams)
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #12 Memorandum in Support of Motion by Plaintiff National Nurses Organizing Committee (McClitis, Jason)
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #12 Memorandum in Support of Motion . The motion will be resolved by the District Judge. (jc)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Midwest Division-MMC, LLC(Franklin, Corey)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Midwest Division-MMC, LLC (Franklin, Corey)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 defendant's unopposed motion for leave to file answer out of time. Defendant has shown excusable neglect. Defendant shall file its answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint by December 22, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 12/14/20. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jc)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and Memorandum of Law In Support by Defendant Midwest Division-MMC, LLC (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Franklin, Corey)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Corey Louis Franklin on behalf of Midwest Division-MMC, LLC. (Franklin, Corey)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by National Nurses Organizing Committee upon Midwest Division-MMC, LLC served on 11/17/2020, answer due 12/8/2020 (McClitis, Jason)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Micah L. Berul for National Nurses Organizing Committee pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 11/12/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (hw)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order SUMMONS ISSUED as to Midwest Division-MMC, LLC. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson and Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
November 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by National Nurses Organizing Committee-Missouri & Kansas/National Nurses United identifying NONE as corporate parent . (McClitis, Jason)
November 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION for attorney Micah L. Berul to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5318580.) by Plaintiff National Nurses Organizing Committee-Missouri & Kansas/National Nurses United (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 ECF Registration Form)(McClitis, Jason)
November 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff National Nurses Organizing Committee-Missouri & Kansas/National Nurses United - trial to be held in Kansas City. (McClitis, Jason)
November 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff National Nurses Organizing Committee-Missouri & Kansas/National Nurses United. (McClitis, Jason)
November 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5318569.), filed by National Nurses Organizing Committee-Missouri & Kansas/National Nurses United. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(McClitis, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: National Nurses Organizing Committee v. Midwest Division-MMC, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midwest Division-MMC, LLC d/b/a Menorah Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midwest Division-MMC, LLC doing business as Menorah Medical Center
Represented By: Corey Louis Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Nurses Organizing Committee-Missouri & Kansas/National Nurses United
Represented By: Jason R. McClitis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Nurses Organizing Committee
Represented By: Jason R. McClitis
Represented By: Micah L. Berul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?