Smith v. Valu Merchandisers, Co.
Plaintiff: Charmane Smith
Defendant: Valu Merchandisers, Co.
Case Number: 2:2020cv02580
Filed: November 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: John W Broomes
Referring Judge: Teresa J James
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2021 Filing 8 JUDGMENT. In accordance with the Memorandum and Order filed January 7, 2021, Plaintiff's complaint is DISMISSED. Signed by deputy clerk on 1/7/2021. Mailed to pro se party Charmane Smith at 6434 Sulgrave Dr. Memphis, TN 38119 by regular mail. (mam)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER adopting #6 the Report and Recommendations of the magistrate judge as the findings and conclusions of this court. Plaintiff's complaint (Doc. #1 ) is DISMISSED. Signed by District Judge John W. Broomes on 1/7/2021. Mailed to pro se party Charmane Smith at 6434 Sulgrave Dr. Memphis, TN 38119 by regular mail. (mam)
November 23, 2020 Filing 6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Complaint filed by Charmane Smith. The undersigned U.S. Magistrate Judge recommends that Plaintiff's complaint and this case be DISMISSED for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(i)-(ii). Objections to R&R due 12/7/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 11/23/2020. Mailed to pro se party Charmane Smith by regular mail. (ct)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, but the U.S. Marshals Service is directed to withhold service of summons and the complaint pending further order of the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 11/23/2020. Mailed to pro se party Charmane Smith by regular mail (ct)
November 16, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff Charmane Smith (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (ca)
November 16, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis NOTE - Access to document is restricted pursuant to the courts privacy policy. by Plaintiff Charmane Smith (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(ca)
November 16, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Charmane Smith. (ca)
November 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (No Summons Issued) with trial location of Kansas City, filed by Charmane Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Envelope)(ca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Valu Merchandisers, Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valu Merchandisers, Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charmane Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?