BHCMC, LLC et al v. Pom of Kansas, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Boyd Gaming Corporation, Kansas Entertainment, LLC and BHCMC, LLC
Defendant: 34th State Games, LLC, Pom of Kansas, LLC and SC. & N., Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv02609
Filed: December 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Daniel D Crabtree
Referring Judge: Angel D Mitchell
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Their Response and Opposition to #8 MOTION to Remand. Response deadline extended to 2/8/2021. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 01/13/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mig)
January 13, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #8 MOTION to Remand by Defendants 34th State Games, LLC, Pom of Kansas, LLC, SC. & N., Inc. (Hamilton, Thomas)
January 13, 2021 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #8 MOTION to Remand. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge. (ks)
January 4, 2021 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #8 MOTION to Remand by Plaintiffs BHCMC, LLC, Boyd Gaming Corporation, Kansas Entertainment, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Limoli, Matthew)
January 4, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand by Plaintiffs BHCMC, LLC, Boyd Gaming Corporation, Kansas Entertainment, LLC (Limoli, Matthew)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants POM of Kansas, LLC, 34th State Games, LLC, and SC. & N., Inc.'s stated desire to conserve resources in view of plaintiffs' anticipated motion to remand this case to state court establishes good cause for the requested extension. If the court denies plaintiffs' forthcoming motion to remand, defendants must file their answer(s) or otherwise respond to plaintiffs' First Amended Petition for Damages within 7 days of the court's order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 12/11/20. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ks)
December 11, 2020 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Other Responsive Pleading by Defendants 34th State Games, LLC, Pom of Kansas, LLC, SC. & N., Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell) (Hamilton, Thomas)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell for all further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 12/7/20. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(aw)
December 7, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED personal service as to SC. & N., Inc. on 11/11/2020. (FILED IN WYANDOTTE COUNTY DISTRICT COURT ON 11/13/2020; See DE #1 for original filing.) (ca)
December 7, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED as to Pom of Kansas, LLC. on 11/6/2020. (FILED IN WYANDOTTE COUNTY DISTRICT COURT ON 11/06/2020; See DE #1 for original filing.) (ca)
December 7, 2020 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree and Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
December 4, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Removal by 34th State Games, LLC, Pom of Kansas, LLC, SC. & N., Inc.. (Duggan, John)
December 4, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Wyandotte County, case number 2020-CV-000633 Trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $402, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5341902.), filed by Pom of Kansas, LLC, 34th State Games, LLC.(Duggan, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BHCMC, LLC et al v. Pom of Kansas, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Boyd Gaming Corporation
Represented By: John M. Edgar
Represented By: Matthew J. Limoli
Represented By: Ryan J. Loehr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kansas Entertainment, LLC
Represented By: John M. Edgar
Represented By: Matthew J. Limoli
Represented By: Ryan J. Loehr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BHCMC, LLC
Represented By: John M. Edgar
Represented By: Matthew J. Limoli
Represented By: Ryan J. Loehr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 34th State Games, LLC
Represented By: John M. Duggan
Represented By: Dustin Rucinski
Represented By: Thomas J. Hamilton, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pom of Kansas, LLC
Represented By: John M. Duggan
Represented By: Dustin Rucinski
Represented By: Thomas J. Hamilton, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SC. & N., Inc.
Represented By: Thomas J. Hamilton, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?