Nowak v. Hart
Plaintiff: Christine K. Nowak
Defendant: Brian J. Hart
Case Number: 2:2020cv02636
Filed: December 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Gwynne E Birzer
Referring Judge: Eric F Melgren
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting #8 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint. Defendant's answer due 3/15/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 2/11/2021. Mailed to pro se party Brian J. Hart, 1205 Banana River Drive, Indian Harbour Beach, FL 32937 by regular mail. (kf)
January 27, 2021 Filing 9 OBJECTION(S) to #8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (attorney) by Christine K. Nowak. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Haupt, Robert)
January 22, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Defendant Brian J. Hart. (referred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer) (Attachments: #1 Letter)(ca)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Brian J. Hart shall answer or otherwise plead on or before 1/22/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 1/12/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ala)
January 12, 2021 NOTICE Re: Pro Se Mailing. Document 7 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, mailed to Brian J. Hart 1205 Banana River Drive Indian Harbour Beach, FL 32937 on 1/12/2021 by regular mail. (sz)
January 11, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Defendant Brian J. Hart (referred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer) (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ca)
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Rhett M. Buchmiller for Christine K. Nowak pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 12/29/20. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ala)
December 23, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for attorney Rhett M. Buchmiller to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5364047.) by Plaintiff Christine K. Nowak (referred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Rhett M. Buchmiller, #2 ECF Registration Form)(Haupt, Robert)
December 15, 2020 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Christine K. Nowak - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Haupt, Robert)
December 15, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Christine K. Nowak. (Haupt, Robert)
December 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $402, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5353772.), filed by Christine K. Nowak.(Haupt, Robert)
December 15, 2020 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Brian J. Hart. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)
December 15, 2020 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Eric F. Melgren and Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nowak v. Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine K. Nowak
Represented By: Robert J. Haupt
Represented By: Rhett M. Buchmiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian J. Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?