Ballou et al v. United Parcel Service, Inc.
Plaintiff: David Goodnight, Jeremy Flynn, Matthew Spinnato, Jerry Porchia, Michael Ballou, Cesar Ricano, Dana Moye and Henry Martinez
Defendant: United Parcel Service, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv02640
Filed: December 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: John W Broomes
Referring Judge: Teresa J James
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER RESCHEDULING STATUS CONFERENCE: At the informal request of Plaintiffs, the Court reschedules the Status Conference set for 2/24/21 for 2/26/2021 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James. To join the conference, counsel should dial CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749 and input ACCESS CODE 4901386. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 2/11/21. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ct)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SETTING TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE: Status Conference set for 2/24/2021 at 11:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James. At this time, the Court sets this case for a Status Conference in lieu of a Scheduling Conference, in light of the pending Motion to Dismiss. Counsel should call CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749 and enter ACCESS CODE 4901386 to join the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 2/9/21. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ct)
February 4, 2021 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by Plaintiffs Michael Ballou, Jeremy Flynn, David Goodnight, Henry Martinez, Dana Moye, Jerry Porchia, Cesar Ricano, Matthew Spinnato re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Kuhl, Albert)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . Response deadline 2/4/2021. Entered by District Judge John W. Broomes on 01/21/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jmr)
January 21, 2021 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #8 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Plaintiffs Michael Ballou, Jeremy Flynn, David Goodnight, Henry Martinez, Dana Moye, Jerry Porchia, Cesar Ricano, Matthew Spinnato (Kuhl, Albert)
January 21, 2021 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #8 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge. (ct)
January 5, 2021 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant United Parcel Service, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Summers, Curtis)
January 5, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant United Parcel Service, Inc. (Summers, Curtis)
December 18, 2020 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by United Parcel Service, Inc. identifying United Parcel Service, Inc. (Delaware) as corporate parent . (Summers, Curtis)
December 18, 2020 Filing 5 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 1/7/2021 for Defendant United Parcel Service, Inc. to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 12/18/2020. (ca)
December 17, 2020 Filing 4 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendant United Parcel Service, Inc. - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Summers, Curtis)
December 17, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- by FedEx upon United Parcel Service, Inc. on 11/17/2020 (FILED IN JOHNSON COUNTY DISTRICT COURT ON 12/2/2020; SEE DE #1 FOR ORIGINAL FILING.) (ca)
December 17, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendant United Parcel Service, Inc.. (Summers, Curtis)
December 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Johnson County, Kansas, case number 20CV03806 Trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $402, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5356972.), filed by United Parcel Service, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Summers, Curtis)
December 17, 2020 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Designation of place of trial is missing. The filing party/attorney is directed to correct the deficiency immediately.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
December 17, 2020 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge John W. Broomes and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ballou et al v. United Parcel Service, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Goodnight
Represented By: Albert F. Kuhl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Flynn
Represented By: Albert F. Kuhl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Spinnato
Represented By: Albert F. Kuhl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Porchia
Represented By: Albert F. Kuhl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Ballou
Represented By: Albert F. Kuhl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cesar Ricano
Represented By: Albert F. Kuhl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dana Moye
Represented By: Albert F. Kuhl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry Martinez
Represented By: Albert F. Kuhl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Parcel Service, Inc.
Represented By: Curtis R. Summers
Represented By: Bonnie Birdsell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?