Donahue v. YRC, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Alvin R. Donahue
Defendant: YRC Worldwide, Inc., YRC, Inc. doing business as YRC Freight, YRC Regional Transportation, Inc. and YRC Enterprise Services, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv02648
Filed: December 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Toby Crouse
Referring Judge: Angel D Mitchell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by YRC Enterprise Services, Inc., YRC Regional Transportation, Inc., YRC Worldwide, Inc., YRC, Inc..(Hilker, Christi)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Responsive Pleading Out of Time. Defendants YRC Enterprise Services, Inc., YRC Regional Transportation, Inc., YRC Worldwide, Inc., and YRC, Inc. must file their answer(s) or otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint on or before February 18, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 2/3/21. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ks)
February 2, 2021 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION FOR LEAVE to File Responsive Pleading Out of Time by Defendants YRC Enterprise Services, Inc., YRC Regional Transportation, Inc., YRC Worldwide, Inc., YRC, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell) (Fowler, Amy)
January 12, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Alvin R. Donahue upon YRC Worldwide, Inc. served on 12/30/2020, answer due 1/20/2021 (Smith, Eric)
January 12, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Alvin R. Donahue upon YRC Regional Transportation, Inc. served on 12/30/2020, answer due 1/20/2021 (Smith, Eric)
January 12, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Alvin R. Donahue upon YRC, Inc. served on 12/30/2020, answer due 1/20/2021 (Smith, Eric)
January 12, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Alvin R. Donahue upon YRC Enterprise Services, Inc. served on 12/30/2020, answer due 1/20/2021 (Smith, Eric)
December 28, 2020 SUMMONS ISSUED as to YRC Enterprise Services, Inc., YRC Regional Transportation, Inc., YRC Worldwide, Inc., YRC, Inc. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)
December 22, 2020 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Toby Crouse and Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
December 22, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Alvin R. Donahue. (Smith, Eric)
December 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $402, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5361583.), filed by Alvin R. Donahue. (Attachments: #1 Ex A, #2 Ex B)(Smith, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Donahue v. YRC, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YRC Worldwide, Inc.
Represented By: Christi Jean Hilker
Represented By: Amy M. Fowler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YRC, Inc. doing business as YRC Freight
Represented By: Christi Jean Hilker
Represented By: Amy M. Fowler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YRC Regional Transportation, Inc.
Represented By: Christi Jean Hilker
Represented By: Amy M. Fowler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YRC Enterprise Services, Inc.
Represented By: Christi Jean Hilker
Represented By: Amy M. Fowler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alvin R. Donahue
Represented By: Athena M. Dickson
Represented By: Rik N. Siro
Represented By: Eric W. Smith
Represented By: Ryan P. McEnaney
Represented By: Raymond Dake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?