Bedivere Insurance Company v. Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Bedivere Insurance Company formerly doing business as OneBeacon Insurance Company
Defendant: Allied World Surplus Lines Insurance Company, Darwin Select Insurance Company, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas Incorporated and Blue Cross Blue Shield Association
Petitioner: Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Arizona Incorporated
Consolidated Plaintiff: Allied World Specialty Insurance Company and Darwin National Assurance Company
Case Number: 2:2020mc00208
Filed: September 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Daniel D Crabtree
Referring Judge: James P O'Hara
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2020 ***Civil Case Terminated.(hw)
September 17, 2020 Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER - at the direction of Judge James P. O'Hara, this case is terminated and the motion and all related documents will be refiled in case 18-2371, as this issue is a part of that case. Please see case 18-2371 for all further flings related to this matter. Signed by deputy clerk on 9/17/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(hw)
September 17, 2020 Filing 17 Letter from the clerk to counsel regarding pro hac vice requirements. (hw)
September 17, 2020 Filing 16 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:20-mc-00043. Electronic file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (hw)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED granting the Stipulation to Transfer Subpoena-Related Motions to District of Kansas Pursuant to Rule 45(f) (Doc. #12 ). IT IS FUTHER ORDERED that the above-captioned matter shall be transferred to the United States District Court for the District of Kansas. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED directing the Clerk of the Court to close this matter. Signed by Judge Michael T Liburdi on 9/16/2020. (LAD) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/17/2020.]
September 15, 2020 Remark: Out of state attorneys Brendan M Quinn, Brent N Coverdale, James D Griffin and John L Mullen removed as counsel of record for noncompliance with admission procedures; party or parties represented by other admitted counsel. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/17/2020.]
September 14, 2020 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Jared Kyle LeBeau, Richard Randal Crispen on behalf of Plaintiff Bedivere Insurance Company. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/17/2020.]
September 14, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #13 Corporate Disclosure Statement. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. Additionally, document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(1) - Forms of Papers. Please note for future filings; Attorney filing information must be typed in upper left corner. Please correct future pleadings. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DXD) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/17/2020.]
September 14, 2020 Filing 13 *Corporate Disclosure Statement by Allied World Specialty Insurance Company. (Harper, Christopher) *Modified to correct event/filer and indicate document not in compliance with Local Rule; attorney noticed on 9/15/2020 (DXD/(LAD). [Transferred from Arizona on 9/17/2020.]
September 14, 2020 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Justine M Casey on behalf of Plaintiff Bedivere Insurance Company. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/17/2020.]
September 11, 2020 Filing 12 STIPULATION to Transfer Subpoena-Related Motions to District of Kansas pursuant to Rule 45(f) by Bedivere Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Meyer, Cassandra) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/17/2020.]
September 11, 2020 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bedivere Insurance Company. (Meyer, Cassandra) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/17/2020.]
September 11, 2020 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Christopher Michael Harper on behalf of Counter Defendant Allied World Specialty Insurance Company, Consol Plaintiff Allied World Specialty Insurance Company, Defendant Allied World Surplus Lines Insurance Company. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/17/2020.]
September 1, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Errata re: #4 MOTION to Quash Subpoena MOTION for Protective Order by Movant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Arizona Incorporated.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Tolman, Shelley) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/17/2020.]
September 1, 2020 Filing 9 * NOTICE of Errata re #4 Motion by Counter Claimant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas Incorporated, Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas Incorporated, Consol Third Party Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas Incorporated.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Tolman, Shelley) * Modified to add docket linkage on 9/2/2020 (LAD). [Transferred from Arizona on 9/17/2020.]
September 1, 2020 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Dan J Hofmeister, Jr, Kevin D Tessier on behalf of Movant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Arizona Incorporated, Counter Claimant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas Incorporated, Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas Incorporated, Consol Third Party Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas Incorporated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/17/2020.]
August 31, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Allied World Specialty Insurance Company, Allied World Surplus Lines Insurance Company, Bedivere Insurance Company. (REK) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/17/2020.]
August 28, 2020 Filing 7 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-18615681. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Michael T. Liburdi for a ruling on: #1 Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas Incorporated's Motion to Quash Subpoena Duces Tecum and Motion for Protective Order and #4 Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Arizona Incorporated's Motion to Quash Non-Party Subpoena and Motion for Protective Order. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: MC-20-00043-PHX-MTL. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (REK) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/17/2020.]
August 28, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Arizona Incorporated. (submitted by Shelley Tolman) (REK) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/17/2020.]
August 28, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE/Certification by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Arizona Incorporated re: #4 MOTION to Quash Non-Party Subpoena MOTION for Protective Order. (submitted by Shelley Tolman) (REK) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/17/2020.]
August 28, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Quash Non-Party Subpoena, MOTION for Protective Order by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Arizona Incorporated. (submitted by Shelley Tolman) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (REK) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/17/2020.]
August 28, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas Incorporated. (submitted by Shelley Tolman) (REK) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/17/2020.]
August 28, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE/Certification of Counsel by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas Incorporated re: #1 MOTION to Quash MOTION for Protective Order. (submitted by Shelley Tolman) (REK) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/17/2020.]
August 28, 2020 Filing 1 Miscellaneous Case Opening Regarding: Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas Incorporated's Motion to Quash Subpoena Duces Tecum - FRCVP 45 and MOTION for Protective Order. Case Opening Fee Received: $47.00 receipt number 0970-18615681 filed by Defendant/Counter-Plaintiff Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas Incorporated. (submitted by Shelley Tolman) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (REK). [Transferred from Arizona on 9/17/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bedivere Insurance Company v. Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Allied World Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher M. Harper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Darwin National Assurance Company
Represented By: Christopher M. Harper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied World Surplus Lines Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher M. Harper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darwin Select Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher M. Harper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Cross Blue Shield Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Arizona Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bedivere Insurance Company formerly doing business as OneBeacon Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?