Starr Homes, LLC v. Schlup, et al.
Plaintiff: Starr Homes, LLC
Defendant: Allen Schlup, Carson Development, Inc., Jeffery B. DeGasperi, Amanda Schlup, Michael B. Falbe, Bob D. Campbell and Company and DeGasperi & Associates Architecture, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv02031
Filed: January 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Gwynne E Birzer
Referring Judge: Eric F Melgren
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2021 Filing 26 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Plaintiff Starr Homes, LLC re: #11 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Gerry Starr Declaration, #2 Exhibit B: Byron Sawyer Report)(Kernell, James)
March 15, 2021 Filing 25 ANSWER to Complaint by Allen Schlup, Amanda Schlup.(Mustoe, Steven)
March 15, 2021 Filing 24 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Carson Development, Inc. identifying None as corporate parent . (Fagan, Brennan)
March 15, 2021 Filing 23 ANSWER to Complaint by Carson Development, Inc.(Fagan, Brennan)
March 8, 2021 Filing 22 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by DeGasperi & Associates Architecture, Inc. identifying none as corporate parent . (Snow, Kenton)
March 5, 2021 Filing 21 ANSWER to Complaint by Jeffery B. DeGasperi, DeGasperi & Associates Architecture, Inc..(Snow, Kenton)
March 4, 2021 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by Defendants Carson Development, Inc., Allen Schlup, Amanda Schlup re #11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Mustoe, Steven)
February 16, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Hearing: THIS IS AN OFFICIAL NOTICE FOR THIS HEARING (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 3/25/2021 at 01:30 PM in Video Conference - Zoom before District Judge Eric F. Melgren. Zoom instructions will be emailed to counsel at a later date.(cm)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Carson Development, Inc. answer due 3/15/2021. Carson Development response to Motion for Preliminary Injunction is due 3/4/2021. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 2/11/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (cm)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Allen Schlup answer due 3/15/2021; Amanda Schlup answer due 3/15/2021. Allen Schlup and Amanda Schlup response to Motion for Preliminary Injunction is due 3/4/2021. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 2/11/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (cm)
February 11, 2021 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #1 Complaint (attorney), by Defendant Carson Development, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer) (Fagan, Brennan)
February 11, 2021 Filing 15 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Brennan P. Fagan and Jason B. Prier on behalf of Carson Development, Inc.. (Fagan, Brennan).
February 11, 2021 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #1 Complaint (attorney), by Defendants Allen Schlup, Amanda Schlup (referred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer) (Mustoe, Steven)
February 11, 2021 Filing 13 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Steven H. Mustoe on behalf of Allen Schlup, Amanda Schlup. (Mustoe, Steven)
February 11, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Response deadline 3/4/2021.(cm)
February 10, 2021 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint by Bob D. Campbell and Company, Michael B. Falbe.(Jackson, Marty)
February 1, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Starr Homes, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Copyright Reg VA 2-215-855, #2 Exhibit B: Copyright Reg VA 2-215-856, #3 Exhibit C: Tech Dwgs - 2016 Home of Distinction, #4 Exhibit D: Tech Dwgs - Schlup Home, #5 Exhibit E: Tech Dwgs Overlays, #6 Exhibit F: Screenshot - KC Homes & Style, #7 Exhibit G: Screenshot - Starr Homes website)(Kernell, James)
February 1, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Starr Homes, LLC upon Carson Development, Inc. served on 1/21/2021, answer due 2/11/2021 (Kernell, James)
February 1, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Starr Homes, LLC upon Michael B. Falbe served on 1/21/2021, answer due 2/11/2021 (Kernell, James)
February 1, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Starr Homes, LLC upon Bob D. Campbell and Company served on 1/25/2021, answer due 2/16/2021 (Kernell, James)
February 1, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Starr Homes, LLC upon DeGasperi & Associates Architecture, Inc. served on 1/21/2021, answer due 2/11/2021 (Kernell, James)
February 1, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Starr Homes, LLC upon Jeffery B. DeGasperi served on 1/21/2021, answer due 2/11/2021 (Kernell, James)
February 1, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Starr Homes, LLC upon Amanda Schlup served on 1/21/2021, answer due 2/11/2021 (Kernell, James)
February 1, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Starr Homes, LLC upon Allen Schlup served on 1/21/2021, answer due 2/11/2021 (Kernell, James)
January 20, 2021 Filing 3 AO FORM 121: REPORT on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright. (Kernell, James)
January 20, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Starr Homes, LLC. (Kernell, James)
January 20, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $402, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5387978.), filed by Starr Homes, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Copyright Reg No VA 2-215-855, #2 Exhibit B: Copyright Reg No VA 2-215-856, #3 Exhibit C: Technical Drawings, 2016 Home of Distinction, #4 Exhibit D: Technical Drawings, Schlup Home, #5 Exhibit E: Overlay of Technical Drawings)(Kernell, James)
January 20, 2021 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Eric F. Melgren and Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (lb)
January 20, 2021 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bob D. Campbell and Company, Carson Development, Inc., Jeffery B. DeGasperi, DeGasperi & Associates Architecture, Inc., Michael B. Falbe, Allen Schlup, Amanda Schlup. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (lb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Starr Homes, LLC v. Schlup, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allen Schlup
Represented By: Steven H. Mustoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carson Development, Inc.
Represented By: Jason B. Prier
Represented By: Brennan P. Fagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffery B. DeGasperi
Represented By: Philip D. Albrecht
Represented By: Kenton E. Snow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amanda Schlup
Represented By: Steven H. Mustoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael B. Falbe
Represented By: Marty T. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bob D. Campbell and Company
Represented By: Marty T. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DeGasperi & Associates Architecture, Inc.
Represented By: Philip D. Albrecht
Represented By: Kenton E. Snow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Starr Homes, LLC
Represented By: James J. Kernell
Represented By: Kyle D. Donnelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?