Dubuc v. Cox Communications Kansas, L.L.C.
Plaintiff: Julie Dubuc
Defendant: Cox Communications Kansas, L.L.C.
Case Number: 2:2021cv02041
Filed: January 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Eric F Melgren
Referring Judge: James P O'Hara
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 53 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendant's First Supplemental Rule 26 Disclosures by Cox Communications Kansas, L.L.C. (Sheffield, Robert)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 52 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of First Supplemental Disclosure of Information Under Federal Rule 26(a)(1) by Julie Dubuc. (Kingston, Kristi)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 51 NOTICE by Plaintiff Julie Dubuc of taking deposition of Brenda Fish Dodson and Nancy Murphy on October 5, 2021 and October 6, 2021 (Kingston, Kristi)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 50 NOTICE by Defendant Cox Communications Kansas, L.L.C. of taking deposition of Plaintiff Julie Dubuc on September 14, 2021 (Sheffield, Robert)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by Defendant Cox Communications Kansas, L.L.C. re #39 MOTION to Compel (Sheffield, Robert)
September 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER denying #42 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 9/5/2021. (srj)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara: STATUS CONFERENCE held on 9/2/2021. (Zoom recording.) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ss)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Plaintiff Julie Dubuc re: #42 Motion for Protective Order (Kingston, Kristi)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by Defendant Cox Communications Kansas, L.L.C. re #42 MOTION for Protective Order (Sheffield, Robert)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 44 SEALED EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #42 MOTION for Protective Order by Plaintiff Julie Dubuc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kingston, Kristi)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting #41 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. Counsel directed to file forthwith requested document(s) with an event from the SEALED DOCUMENTS category. The clerk shall grant access to sealed document(s) to counsel of record. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 8/30/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (amh)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MOTION for Protective Order by Plaintiff Julie Dubuc (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Compliance, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Kingston, Kristi)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Unopposed SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Exhibit A to Plaintiff's Motion for Protective Order by Plaintiff Julie Dubuc (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kingston, Kristi)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER: the parties have contacted the court requesting a conference about whether plaintiff must appear for her deposition in person or whether she may insist on a deposition via video conference. Plaintiff is directed to file a motion for a protective order, with supporting brief, by the end of today. Any response is due August 31, 2021. And reply is due September 1, 2021. The principal briefs are limited to 5 pages, and the reply brief is limited to 2 pages. The court will conduct a hearing on the motion via ZOOM on September 2, 2021, at 11:00 a.m. An invitation to the zoom hearing will be sent separately. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 8/30/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(amh)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MOTION to Compel by Plaintiff Julie Dubuc (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Compliance, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5)(Kingston, Kristi)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting #37 unopposed motion for extension of time until August 25, 2021, for plaintiff to file a motion to compel related to her first set of interrogatories and document requests. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 8/18/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (amh)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Third MOTION for extension of time to file Motion to Compel by Plaintiff Julie Dubuc (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Kingston, Kristi)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 RESPONSE by Defendant Cox Communications Kansas, L.L.C. re #28 Motion for Reconsideration Opposition (Sheffield, Robert)
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #34 unopposed motion for extension of time until August 18, 2021, for plaintiff to file a motion to compel related to her first set of interrogatories and document requests. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 8/11/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (amh)
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Second MOTION for extension of time to File Motion to Compel by Plaintiff Julie Dubuc (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Kingston, Kristi)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #32 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. The clerk shall grant access to sealed document(s) to counsel of record. Pro hac vice attorneys must obtain sealed documents from local counsel. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 8/10/2021. (sz) Modified on 8/10/2021 -- Exhibit 1 was already filed at #28 -1, it does not need to be refiled. (mam)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Second SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by Plaintiff Julie Dubuc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Kingston, Kristi)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's First Supplemental Responses to Defendant's First Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents by Julie Dubuc. (Kingston, Kristi)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #32 Second SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal . The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(ss)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER denying #29 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. Counsel is directed to Judge Melgren's requirements for filing documents under seal as contained on the District Court's home page: http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 8/3/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (sn)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by Plaintiff Julie Dubuc (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Kingston, Kristi)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MOTION for Reconsideration re #22 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Plaintiff Julie Dubuc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Kingston, Kristi)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #28 MOTION for Reconsideration re #22 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(ss)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 JOINT MEDIATION NOTICE - Mediation to be held October 7, 2021 by Cox Communications Kansas, L.L.C. (Sheffield, Robert)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #25 defendant's unopposed motion for extension. Defendant shall file any motion to compel plaintiff's discovery responses by August 11, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 7/20/21. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jc)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Unopposed MOTION for extension of time for Filing Discovery Motion by Defendant Cox Communications Kansas, L.L.C. (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Sheffield, Robert)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #23 unopposed motion for extension of time until August 11, 2021, for plaintiff to file a motion to compel related to her first set of interrogatories and document requests. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 7/20/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (amh)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Unopposed MOTION for extension of time to File Motion to Compel by Plaintiff Julie Dubuc (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Kingston, Kristi)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting #4 Motion to Dismiss Count II of Plaintiff's Complaint for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 7/16/2021. (cm)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara: STATUS CONFERENCE held on 7/13/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ss)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MEDIATION MINUTE ORDER - As discussed during today's telephonic status conference with counsel, the 10/15/21 mediation deadline in the scheduling order (ECF No. 16) remains in effect. By 7/27/21, the parties must jointly file a notice confirming whom they've retained as their private mediator, along with firmly scheduled date, time, and place of the mediation. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 7/13/21. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(O'Hara, James)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE of Hearing: THIS IS AN OFFICIAL NOTICE FOR THIS HEARING (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) Status Conference set for 7/13/2021 at 11:00 AM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara. All parties participating in this phone conference are directed to dial the conference center line 888-363-4749, using access code 8914911 to join the conference.(ss)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Responses to Defendant's First Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents and Plaintiff's Privilege Log by Julie Dubuc. (Kingston, Kristi)
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Discovery and Privilege Log by Cox Communications Kansas, L.L.C. (Sheffield, Robert)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING ORDER: Mediation Notice or Confidential Settlement Report Due to Magistrate Judge on 7/9/2021. Mediation deadline 10/15/2021. Discovery deadline 1/14/2022. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 1/24/2022. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/7/2022 at 9:00 AM in KC Courtroom 223 (JPO) before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara. Dispositive motion deadline 3/1/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 5/17/2021. (ss)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 5/17/2021.(AT&T conference line.) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ss)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendant's First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff and Defendant's First Request for Production of Documents to Plaintiff by Cox Communications Kansas, L.L.C.. (Sheffield, Robert)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures by Cox Communications Kansas, L.L.C.. (Sheffield, Robert)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures of Information Under Federal Rule 26(a)(1), Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories to Defendant, and Plaintiff's First Request for Production of Documents to Defendant by Julie Dubuc. (Kingston, Kristi)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Defendant Cox Communications Kansas, L.L.C. re: #4 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Sheffield, Robert)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. The court finds good cause to enter the order submitted by the parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 4/30/21. (jc)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by Plaintiff Julie Dubuc re #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Count II of Plaintiff's Complaint (Kingston, Kristi)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 5/17/2021 at 9:00 AM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara. Report of Parties Planning Meeting deadline 5/6/2021. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 5/6/2021. All parties and counsel participating in this phone conference are directed to dial the conference center line 888-363-4749, using access code 8914911 to join the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 3/30/2021. (ss)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cox Communications Kansas, L.L.C. identifying Cox Communications, Inc. as corporate parent . (Sheffield, Robert)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Cox Communications Kansas, L.L.C..(Sheffield, Robert)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Count II of Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendant Cox Communications Kansas, L.L.C.(Sheffield, Robert)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Count II of Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendant Cox Communications Kansas, L.L.C. (Sheffield, Robert)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Julie Dubuc waiver sent on 1/28/2021, answer due 3/29/2021. (Kingston, Kristi) Modified on 2/26/2021 to add answer date (kas).
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Julie Dubuc. (Kingston, Kristi)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $402, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5394745.), filed by Julie Dubuc.(Kingston, Kristi)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order SUMMONS ISSUED as to Cox Communications Kansas, L.L.C.. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (lb)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Eric F. Melgren and Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (lb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dubuc v. Cox Communications Kansas, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cox Communications Kansas, L.L.C.
Represented By: Bonnie Birdsell
Represented By: Robert A. Sheffield
Represented By: Bonnie Gail Birdsell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Dubuc
Represented By: Kristi L. Kingston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?