Braden v. Optum RX, Inc. et al.
Plaintiff: Jennifer Braden
Defendant: Optum RX, Inc., Optum Services, Inc. and United Healthcare Services, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv02046
Filed: January 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Gwynne E Birzer
Referring Judge: Toby Crouse
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 451
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Optum RX, Inc., Optum Services, Inc., United Healthcare Services, Inc. identifying UnitedHealth Group, Incorporated as corporate parent . (Stubbs, Kara)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Sandra L. Jezierski for Defendants pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 3/24/2031. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (kf)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 REQUEST for Oral Argument on Its Joint Motion to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Optum RX, Inc., Optum Services, Inc., United Healthcare Services, Inc. (Stubbs, Kara)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #10 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendants Optum RX, Inc., Optum Services, Inc., United Healthcare Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Stubbs, Kara)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendants Optum RX, Inc., Optum Services, Inc., United Healthcare Services, Inc. (Stubbs, Kara). Added MOTION to Dismiss on 3/24/2021 (msb).
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Allyson Petersen Francis for Defendants pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 3/23/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (kf)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION for attorney Sandra L. Jezierski to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5442758.) by Defendants Optum RX, Inc., Optum Services, Inc., United Healthcare Services, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 ECF Registration Form)(Stubbs, Kara)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION for attorney Allyson Petersen Francis to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5442755.) by Defendants Optum RX, Inc., Optum Services, Inc., United Healthcare Services, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 ECF Registration Form)(Stubbs, Kara)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 3/23/2021 for Defendants United Healthcare Services, Inc., Optum Services, Inc., Optum RX, Inc. to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 3/9/2021. (lb)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Jennifer Braden upon United Healthcare Services, Inc. served on 2/16/2021, answer due 3/9/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Evidence of Service on United Healthcare Services, Inc.)(Rickley, Kathryn)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Jennifer Braden upon Optum Services, Inc. served on 2/16/2021, answer due 3/9/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Evidence of Service on Optum Services, Inc.)(Rickley, Kathryn)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Jennifer Braden upon Optum RX, Inc. served on 2/16/2021, answer due 3/9/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Evidence of Service on Optum RX, Inc.)(Rickley, Kathryn)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order SUMMONS ISSUED as to Optum RX, Inc., Optum Services, Inc., United Healthcare Services, Inc. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (lb)
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Toby Crouse and Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (lb)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Jennifer Braden. (Rickley, Kathryn)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $402, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5396237.), filed by Jennifer Braden. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A - Charge of Discrimination, #2 Ex. B - Amended Charge, #3 Ex. C- EEOC RTS)(Rickley, Kathryn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Braden v. Optum RX, Inc. et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Optum RX, Inc.
Represented By: Allyson Petersen Francis
Represented By: Sandra L. Jezierski
Represented By: Kara Trouslot Stubbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Optum Services, Inc.
Represented By: Allyson Petersen Francis
Represented By: Sandra L. Jezierski
Represented By: Kara Trouslot Stubbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Healthcare Services, Inc.
Represented By: Allyson Petersen Francis
Represented By: Sandra L. Jezierski
Represented By: Kara Trouslot Stubbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Braden
Represented By: Kathryn J. Starrett Rickley
Represented By: Matthew Edward Osman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?