Bragg et al v. Big Heart Pet Brands, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Patti Tuck and Clinton G. Bragg, Jr.
Defendant: Big Heart Pet Brands, Inc., ESIS Inc., Gallagher Bassett Services, Inc. and Indemnity Insurance Company of North America
Case Number: 2:2021cv02047
Filed: January 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: James P O'Hara
Referring Judge: Kathryn H Vratil
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2021 Filing 26 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Clinton G. Bragg, Jr, Patti Tuck re #22 Motion to Dismiss (Fincher, Roger)
March 17, 2021 Filing 25 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Clinton G. Bragg, Jr, Patti Tuck re #18 Motion to Dismiss Party (Fincher, Roger)
March 12, 2021 Filing 24 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Defendant Gallagher Bassett Services, Inc. re #6 Motion to Dismiss. (Bowles, Byron) Modified on 3/12/2021 to re-title, filed under the wrong event. (mam)
March 11, 2021 Filing 23 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #22 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Big Heart Pet Brands, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Petition)(Goodnight, Frank)
March 11, 2021 Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Big Heart Pet Brands, Inc. (Goodnight, Frank)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 INITIAL ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 4/22/2021 at 1:30 PM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara. Report of Parties Planning Meeting deadline 4/14/2021. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 4/14/2021. All parties and counsel participating in this phone conference are directed to dial the conference center line 888-363-4749, using access code 8914911 to join the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 3/5/2021. (ss)
February 26, 2021 Filing 20 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Clinton G. Bragg, Jr, Patti Tuck re #6 Motion to Dismiss (Fincher, Roger)
February 24, 2021 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #18 MOTION to Dismiss Party Indemnity Insurance Company of North America by Defendant Indemnity Insurance Company of North America(Bowles, Byron)
February 24, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss Party Indemnity Insurance Company of North America by Defendant Indemnity Insurance Company of North America (Bowles, Byron)
February 19, 2021 Filing 17 Joint MOTION to Dismiss ESIS by Defendant ESIS Inc. (Bowles, Byron)
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #10 defendant Big Heart Pet Brands, Inc.'s unopposed motion for extension. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint by March 11, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 2/5/21. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jc)
February 5, 2021 Filing 15 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Gallagher Bassett Services, Inc. served 1/15/2021 by certified mail. (Fincher, Roger) Modified on 2/8/2021 to include the defendant and the date served.
February 5, 2021 Filing 14 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- ESIS Inc. served 1/22/2021 by certified mail. (Fincher, Roger) Modified on 2/8/2021 to include the defendant and the date served. (mam)
February 5, 2021 Filing 13 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Big Heart Pet Brands, Inc. served 1/19/2021 by certified mail. (Fincher, Roger) Modified on 2/8/2021 to include the defendant and the date served. (mam)
February 5, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- ESIS Inc. served 1/22/2021 by certified mail. (Fincher, Roger) Modified on 2/8/2021 to include the defendant and the date served. (mam)
February 5, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Gallagher Bassett Services, Inc. served 1/15/2021 by certified mail. (Fincher, Roger) Modified on 2/8/2021 to include the defendant and the date served. (mam)
February 5, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant Big Heart Pet Brands, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Goodnight, Frank)
February 5, 2021 Filing 9 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Frank Jason Goodnight on behalf of Big Heart Pet Brands, Inc. (Goodnight, Frank)
February 5, 2021 Filing 8 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 2/19/2021 for Defendant ESIS Inc. to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 2/5/2021. (lb)
February 5, 2021 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #6 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Gallagher Bassett Services, Inc.(Bowles, Byron)
February 5, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Gallagher Bassett Services, Inc. (Bowles, Byron)
January 29, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Gallagher Bassett Services, Inc. of Notice of Filing Notice of Removal (Bowles, Byron)
January 29, 2021 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil and Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (lb)
January 29, 2021 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Gallagher Bassett Services, Inc. identifying Arthur J. Gallagher and Company as corporate parent . (Bowles, Byron)
January 29, 2021 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendant Gallagher Bassett Services, Inc. - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Bowles, Byron)
January 29, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendant Gallagher Bassett Services, Inc. (Bowles, Byron)
January 29, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Douglas County, case number 2020-CV-000352 Trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $402, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5396642.), filed by Gallagher Bassett Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court File)(Bowles, Byron)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bragg et al v. Big Heart Pet Brands, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Big Heart Pet Brands, Inc.
Represented By: Frank Jason Goodnight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ESIS Inc.
Represented By: Spencer Low
Represented By: Byron A. Bowles, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gallagher Bassett Services, Inc.
Represented By: Spencer Low
Represented By: Byron A. Bowles, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indemnity Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: Byron A. Bowles, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patti Tuck
Represented By: Roger Fincher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clinton G. Bragg, Jr.
Represented By: Roger Fincher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?