Anderson v. Coca-Cola Bottlers' Association et al.
Plaintiff: Kimario Anderson and William Grimmett
Defendant: John and Jane Doe Defendants 1-30, Stephanie R. Griffin, Coca-Cola Bottlers' Association, John and Jane Doe Defendants 4-30, Coca-Cola Bottlers' Association 401(k) Savings Plan Benefit Committee, The, Ann Burton, Suzy Higginbotham, John Gould and Wendy Stone
Case Number: 2:2021cv02054
Filed: February 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Kenneth G Gale
Referring Judge: John W Lungstrum
2 Judge: Holly L Teeter
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1001 E.R.I.S.A.
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 77 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #76 Unopposed MOTION for Settlement Approval by Plaintiffs Kimario Anderson, William Grimmett (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Rose, Alexandra)
March 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 76 Unopposed MOTION for Settlement Approval by Plaintiffs Kimario Anderson, William Grimmett (Rose, Alexandra)
March 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 75 NOTICE of Withdrawal of #75 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel by Kimario Anderson. (Rose, Alexandra)
March 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 74 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Kimario Anderson (Byers, Boyd)
March 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 73 DOCKET ANNOTATION: the main document originally attached to docket entry #72 had the wrong case number. It has been blocked from public view; the correct document has been attached to that entry and is attached to this annotation for noticing purposes only. (ca)
March 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 72 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ann Burton, Coca-Cola Bottlers' Association, Coca-Cola Bottlers' Association 401(k) Savings Plan Benefit Committee, The, John and Jane Doe Defendants 4-30, John Gould, Stephanie R. Griffin, Suzy Higginbotham, Wendy Stone filed by Kimario Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(sz) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/13/2023: #3 Corrected Main Document) (ca).
March 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 71 (WITHDRAWN per #75 ) -- MOTION to Withdraw as Counsel by Plaintiff Kimario Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Byers, Boyd) Modified on 3/17/2023, see #75 . (mam)
February 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 70 STIPULATION re #69 Amended Complaint STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE PLEAD by Ann Burton, Coca-Cola Bottlers' Association, Coca-Cola Bottlers' Association 401(k) Savings Plan Benefit Committee, The, John Gould, Stephanie R. Griffin, Suzy Higginbotham, Wendy Stone. (Sgroi, Fred)
February 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 69 FOURTH AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by William Grimmett, Kimario Anderson. (Rose, Alexandra)
February 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER - For the reasons set forth on the record of the telephone conference conducted on this date, plaintiff's motion for leave to amend (Doc. # 60) is GRANTED as unopposed, and plaintiff shall file the proposed amended complaint forthwith; and plaintiff's motion for an extension (Doc. # 65), as amended in the conference, is GRANTED as unopposed, and the deadline for a motion for preliminary approval of the settlement is extended to March 31, 2023. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 2/23/2023. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.)(alh)
February 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 67 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before District Judge John W. Lungstrum: TELEPHONE CONFERENCE was held on 2/23/2023. See attached minute sheet for further details. (Court Reporter Nancy Wiss.) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) (alh)
February 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 66 NOTICE of Hearing on MOTION: #65 Unopposed MOTION for extension of time to Extend Motion Deadline will be heard during the telephone conference scheduled for 2/23/2023 at 01:30 PM before District Judge John W. Lungstrum. Parties are to call in to Telephone JWL - CONFERENCE LINE at 1-888-363-4749 and enter ACCESS CODE 2126821. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) (alh)
February 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 65 Unopposed MOTION for extension of time to Extend Motion Deadline by Plaintiff Kimario Anderson (Byers, Boyd)
February 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 64 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE by attorney W. Perry Brandt as to Ann Burton, Coca-Cola Bottlers' Association, Coca-Cola Bottlers' Association 401(k) Savings Plan Benefit Committee, The, John Gould, Stephanie R. Griffin, Suzy Higginbotham, Wendy Stone (Brandt, William)
February 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Fred L. Sgroi on behalf of Ann Burton, Coca-Cola Bottlers' Association, Coca-Cola Bottlers' Association 401(k) Savings Plan Benefit Committee, The, John Gould, Stephanie R. Griffin, Suzy Higginbotham, Wendy Stone (Sgroi, Fred)
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 62 NOTICE of Hearing: THIS IS AN OFFICIAL NOTICE FOR THIS HEARING. Telephone Conference is set for 2/23/2023 at 01:30 PM in Telephone JWL - CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749 ACCESS CODE 2126821 before District Judge John W. Lungstrum. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.)(alh)
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before District Judge John W. Lungstrum: TELEPHONE CONFERENCE was held on 2/10/2023. #56 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File was granted. Deadline to file Preliminary Approval Motion is extended to 2/24/2023. See attached minute sheet for further details. (Court Reporter Kim Greiner.) (alh)
February 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 60 MOTION for Leave to Amend Complaint re #38 Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Kimario Anderson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Byers, Boyd)
February 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 59 NOTICE of Hearing: THIS IS AN OFFICIAL NOTICE FOR THIS HEARING A Telephone Conference has been set for 2/10/2023 at 02:30 PM before District Judge John W. Lungstrum. Parties must call the CONFERENCE LINE at 1-888-363-4749 and enter the ACCESS CODE of 2126821. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) (alh)
February 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 58 RESPONSE by Defendants Ann Burton, Coca-Cola Bottlers' Association, Coca-Cola Bottlers' Association 401(k) Savings Plan Benefit Committee, The, John Gould, Stephanie R. Griffin, Suzy Higginbotham, Wendy Stone re #56 Motion for Extension of Time to Extend Motion Deadline (Brandt, William)
February 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER - Defendant is to file a response to #56 Second MOTION for extension of time filed by Kimario Anderson by 12:00pm on 2/9/2023. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 2/8/2023. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.)(alh)
February 8, 2023 Opinion or Order MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #56 Second MOTION for extension of time. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge. (tl)
February 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 56 Second MOTION for extension of time by Plaintiff Kimario Anderson (Nehrbass, Scott)
January 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting #54 Motion for Extension of Time to File Preliminary Approval Motion. The deadline to file is extended to February 10, 2023. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 1/31/2023. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) (alh)
January 27, 2023 Opinion or Order MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #54 Unopposed MOTION for extension of time to File Preliminary Approval Motion. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(ses)
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 54 Unopposed MOTION for extension of time to File Preliminary Approval Motion by Plaintiff Kimario Anderson(Rose, Alexandra) Modified on 1/30/2023 to remove referral information (sz).
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale: STATUS CONFERENCE held on 1/13/2023. The Court held a conference with the parties to discuss the current status of settlement. The parties indicated that they will file a motion for preliminary approval of the class action settlement by January 27, 2023. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (tl)
October 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 52 NOTICE of Hearing: THIS IS AN OFFICIAL NOTICE FOR THIS HEARING (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) Status Conference set for 1/13/2023 at 10:00 AM via Telephone (KGG - CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749 ACCESS CODE 5407703) before Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale. The parties may contact the Court should this conference become unnecessary. (tl)
October 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 51 NOTICE OF CANCELLED HEARING: The Post-Mediation Scheduling Conference set for 11/10/2022 at 3:00 PM is cancelled. All related deadlines are also cancelled. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (tl)
October 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 50 JOINT NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT by Ann Burton, Coca-Cola Bottlers' Association, Coca-Cola Bottlers' Association 401(k) Savings Plan Benefit Committee, The, John Gould, Stephanie R. Griffin, Suzy Higginbotham, Wendy Stone. (Brandt, William)
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 49 JOINT MEDIATION NOTICE - Mediation to be held 10/14/2022 by Ann Burton, Coca-Cola Bottlers' Association, Coca-Cola Bottlers' Association 401(k) Savings Plan Benefit Committee, The, John and Jane Doe Defendants 4-30, John Gould, Stephanie R. Griffin, Suzy Higginbotham, Wendy Stone (Brandt, William)
July 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting #47 Joint Motion to Extend Mediation Deadlines. The Court finds good cause in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b)(4) and amends the Preliminary Scheduling Order as follows: The Mediation deadline is extended to 10/21/2022. The Proposed Scheduling Order Deadline is extended to 11/3/2022. The deadline to file a Joint Mediation Notice is extended to 8/19/2022. The Post-Mediation Scheduling Conference is reset for 11/10/2022 at 03:00 PM via Telephone (KGG - CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749 ACCESS CODE 5407703) before Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 7/21/2022. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (tl)
July 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 47 Joint MOTION for extension of time to mediate by Plaintiff Kimario Anderson (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Rose, Alexandra)
July 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 46 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Scott C. Nehrbass (Nehrbass, Scott)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: This Order is being entered in conjunction with the Preliminary Scheduling Order. (ECF No. 44). Post-Mediation Scheduling Conference set for 10/25/2022 at 03:00 PM via Telephone (KGG - CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749 ACCESS CODE 5407703) before Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale. Rule 26 Planning Conference Deadline 10/4/2022. Proposed Scheduling Order Deadline 10/18/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 6/30/2022. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (tl)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 44 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER: Mediation Notice due on 8/5/2022. Mediation deadline 9/30/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 6/30/2022. (tl)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 43 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Section 9 was changed to indicate that the Court now requires parties to arrange a telephone conference with the undersigned Magistrate Judge prior to filing a discovery-related motion. The protective order was otherwise entered as proposed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 6/30/2022. (tl)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 6/30/2022. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (tl)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 6/30/2022 at 10:00 AM by Telephone (KGG - CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749 ACCESS CODE 5407703) before Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale. Rule 26 Planning Conference Deadline 6/9/2022. Report of Parties Planning Meeting deadline 6/23/2022. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 6/23/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 5/2/2022. (tl)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ANSWER to #38 Amended Complaint by Ann Burton, Coca-Cola Bottlers' Association, Coca-Cola Bottlers' Association 401(k) Savings Plan Benefit Committee, The, John and Jane Doe Defendants 4-30, John Gould, Stephanie R. Griffin, Suzy Higginbotham, Wendy Stone.(Brandt, W.)
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting #39 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #38 Third Amended Complaint. All Defendants have until May 2, 2022 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 4/12/2022. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (tl)
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #38 Third Amended Complaint by Defendants Ann Burton, Coca-Cola Bottlers' Association, Coca-Cola Bottlers' Association 401(k) Savings Plan Benefit Committee, The, John Gould, Stephanie R. Griffin, Suzy Higginbotham, Wendy Stone. (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Valentine, Cassandra)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Kimario Anderson. (Nehrbass, Scott)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part #27 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 3/30/2022. (ca)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 RESPONSE To Letter of Supplemental Authority by Defendants Ann Burton, Coca-Cola Bottlers' Association, John and Jane Doe Defendants 4-30, John Gould, Stephanie R. Griffin, Suzy Higginbotham, THE COCA-COLA BOTTLERS ASSOCIATION 401(K) SAVINGS PLAN BENEFIT COMMITTEE. (Brandt, W.)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER - Defendants shall have until 01/31/2022 to respond to #34 Notice of Supplemental Authority filed by plaintiff. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 01/26/2022. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(ses) Modified on 1/26/2022 (ses).
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by Kimario Anderson re: MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM #27 filed by Defendant Stephanie R. Griffin, Defendant Ann Burton, Defendant Coca-Cola Bottlers' Association, Defendant THE COCA-COLA BOTTLERS ASSOCIATION 401(K) SAVINGS PLAN BENEFIT COMMITTEE, Defendant John Gould, Defendant Suzy Higginbotham (Nehrbass, Scott)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 AFFIDAVIT of Supplemental Declaration of Michael P. Carey re #32 Reply to Response to Motion, by Ann Burton, Coca-Cola Bottlers' Association, John and Jane Doe Defendants 4-30, John Gould, Stephanie R. Griffin, Suzy Higginbotham, THE COCA-COLA BOTTLERS ASSOCIATION 401(K) SAVINGS PLAN BENEFIT COMMITTEE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Y)(Brandt, W.)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Defendants Ann Burton, Coca-Cola Bottlers' Association, John and Jane Doe Defendants 4-30, John Gould, Stephanie R. Griffin, Suzy Higginbotham, THE COCA-COLA BOTTLERS ASSOCIATION 401(K) SAVINGS PLAN BENEFIT COMMITTEE re: #27 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, (Brandt, W.)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Kimario Anderson re #27 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, (Nehrbass, Scott)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Pursuant to Order 22 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #27 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . Response deadline 11/15/2021 and Reply deadline 12/15/2021(ses)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: Case reassigned to District Judge John W. Lungstrum for all further proceedings. District Judge Holly L. Teeter no longer assigned to case. Signed by District Judge Holly L. Teeter on 10/19/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(md)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 AFFIDAVIT of DECLARATION OF MICHAEL P. CAREY re #27 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Ann Burton, Coca-Cola Bottlers' Association, John Gould, Stephanie R. Griffin, Suzy Higginbotham, THE COCA-COLA BOTTLERS ASSOCIATION 401(K) SAVINGS PLAN BENEFIT COMMITTEE (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W, #24 Exhibit X)(Brandt, W.)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #27 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Ann Burton, Coca-Cola Bottlers' Association, John Gould, Stephanie R. Griffin, Suzy Higginbotham, THE COCA-COLA BOTTLERS ASSOCIATION 401(K) SAVINGS PLAN BENEFIT COMMITTEE(Brandt, W.)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Ann Burton, Coca-Cola Bottlers' Association, John Gould, Stephanie R. Griffin, Suzy Higginbotham, THE COCA-COLA BOTTLERS ASSOCIATION 401(K) SAVINGS PLAN BENEFIT COMMITTEE (Brandt, W.)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Kimario Anderson. Suzy Higginbotham waiver sent on 8/2/2021, answer due 10/1/2021. (Nehrbass, Scott)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Kimario Anderson. John Gould waiver sent on 8/2/2021, answer due 10/1/2021. (Nehrbass, Scott)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Kimario Anderson. THE COCA-COLA BOTTLERS ASSOCIATION 401(K) SAVINGS PLAN BENEFIT COMMITTEE waiver sent on 8/2/2021, answer due 10/1/2021. (Nehrbass, Scott)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Kimario Anderson. Ann Burton waiver sent on 8/2/2021, answer due 10/1/2021. (Nehrbass, Scott)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 Agreed Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants shall have until October 1, 2021, to file a motion to dismiss or other response to the amended complaint. Plaintiff's response to any motion is due November 15, 2021, and any reply by Defendants is due by December 15, 2021. Signed by District Judge Holly L. Teeter on 08/06/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ses)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #20 Amended Complaint by Defendants Ann Burton, Coca-Cola Bottlers' Association, John and Jane Doe Defendants 4-30, John Gould, Stephanie R. Griffin, Suzy Higginbotham, THE COCA-COLA BOTTLERS ASSOCIATION 401(K) SAVINGS PLAN BENEFIT COMMITTEE. (Brandt, W.)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #21 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #20 Amended Complaint . The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(df)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Kimario Anderson. (Nehrbass, Scott)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #16 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint and denying as moot #14 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. In conjunction with responding to Defendants' pending motion to dismiss, Plaintiff sought leave to file an amended complaint. The requested amendment is ostensibly intended to correct deficiencies raised in the motion to dismiss. To ensure this matter is determined on its merits on a clean record, to preserve the resources of both the parties and the Court, and with a mind that leave to amend should be freely given, the Court grants Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend. Plaintiff is directed to file the amended pleading on or before July 30, 2021. Because Defendants' Motion to Dismiss is no longer directed at the operative complaint, that motion is denied without prejudice. Defendants may respond to the amended pleading within the time allowed by the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure or file any appropriate motion. Signed by District Judge Holly L. Teeter on 7/29/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (md)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #16 MOTION for Leave to Amend Complaint re #3 Amended Complaint. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge. (df)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Kimario Anderson re #14 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,,, (Nehrbass, Scott)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #16 MOTION for Leave to Amend Complaint re #3 Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Kimario Anderson(Nehrbass, Scott)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Amend Complaint re #3 Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Kimario Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Second Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit Redlined Proposed Second Amended Complaint)(Nehrbass, Scott)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Coca-Cola Bottlers' Association identifying None as corporate parent . (Brandt, W.)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum in Support by Defendants Coca-Cola Bottlers' Association, Stephanie R. Griffin, John and Jane Doe Defendants 1-30 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Michael P. Carey, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration, #4 Envelope C to Declaration, #5 Exhibit D to Declaration, #6 Exhibit E to Declaration, #7 Exhibit F to Declaration, #8 Exhibit G to Declaration, #9 Exhibit H to Declaration, #10 Exhibit I to Declaration, #11 Exhibit J to Declaration, #12 Exhibit K to Declaration, #13 Exhibit L to Declaration, #14 Exhibit M to Declaration, #15 Exhibit N to Declaration, #16 Exhibit O to Declaration, #17 Exhibit P to Declaration, #18 Exhibit Q to Declaration, #19 Exhibit R to Declaration, #20 Exhibit S to Declaration, #21 Exhibit T to Declaration)(Brandt, W.)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Ann Wrege Ferebee for Coca-Cola Bottlers' Association, Stephanie R. Griffin, and John and Jane Doe Defendants 1-30 pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 3/12/21. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (df)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting, for good cause shown, #6 Agreed Motion for Extension of Time in which the parties may complete their briefing for a Motion to Dismiss up to and including May 24, 2021, for Defendants to file their Motion to Dismiss; up to and including July 23, 2021, for Plaintiff to file his response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss; and up to and including August 23, 2021, for Defendants to file their reply in support of their Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 3/12/21. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (df)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of William Bard Brockman for Coca-Cola Bottlers' Association, Stephanie R. Griffin, and John and Jane Doe Defendants 1-30 pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 3/12/21. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (df)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Michael P. Carey for Coca-Cola Bottlers' Association, Stephanie R. Griffin, and John and Jane Doe Defendants 1-30 pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 3/12/21. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (df)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION for attorney Ann Wrege Ferebee to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5435160.) by Defendants Coca-Cola Bottlers' Association, Stephanie R. Griffin, John and Jane Doe Defendants 1-30 (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A to Affidavit)(Brandt, W.)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION for attorney W. Bard Brockman to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5435161.) by Defendants Coca-Cola Bottlers' Association, Stephanie R. Griffin, John and Jane Doe Defendants 1-30 (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Brandt, W.)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION for attorney Michael P. Carey to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5435112.) by Defendants Coca-Cola Bottlers' Association, Stephanie R. Griffin, John and Jane Doe Defendants 1-30 (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Brandt, W.)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION for extension of time (Agreed) by Defendants Coca-Cola Bottlers' Association, Stephanie R. Griffin (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Brandt, W.)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Kimario Anderson. Stephanie R. Griffin waiver sent on 3/10/2021, answer due 5/10/2021. (Musick, Nancy)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Kimario Anderson. Coca-Cola Bottlers' Association waiver sent on 3/10/2021, answer due 5/10/2021. (Musick, Nancy)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Kimario Anderson.(Nehrbass, Scott)
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order SUMMONS ISSUED as to Coca-Cola Bottlers' Association, Stephanie R. Griffin. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (lb)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Kimario Anderson. (Nehrbass, Scott)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $402, Internet Payment Receipt Number BKSDC-5398224.), filed by Kimario Anderson.(Nehrbass, Scott)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Holly L. Teeter and Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (lb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson v. Coca-Cola Bottlers' Association et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Doe Defendants 1-30
Represented By: Michael P. Carey
Represented By: William Bard Brockman
Represented By: Ann Wrege Ferebee
Represented By: W. Perry Brandt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie R. Griffin
Represented By: Michael P. Carey
Represented By: William Bard Brockman
Represented By: Ann Wrege Ferebee
Represented By: W. Perry Brandt
Represented By: Cassandra R. Valentine
Represented By: William Perry Brandt
Represented By: Fred L. Sgroi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coca-Cola Bottlers' Association
Represented By: Michael P. Carey
Represented By: William Bard Brockman
Represented By: Ann Wrege Ferebee
Represented By: W. Perry Brandt
Represented By: Cassandra R. Valentine
Represented By: Fred L. Sgroi
Represented By: William Perry Brandt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Doe Defendants 4-30
Represented By: Ann Wrege Ferebee
Represented By: Michael P. Carey
Represented By: William Perry Brandt
Represented By: William Bard Brockman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coca-Cola Bottlers' Association 401(k) Savings Plan Benefit Committee, The
Represented By: Cassandra R. Valentine
Represented By: Fred L. Sgroi
Represented By: William Perry Brandt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ann Burton
Represented By: Cassandra R. Valentine
Represented By: William Perry Brandt
Represented By: Fred L. Sgroi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suzy Higginbotham
Represented By: Cassandra R. Valentine
Represented By: Fred L. Sgroi
Represented By: William Perry Brandt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Gould
Represented By: William Perry Brandt
Represented By: Cassandra R. Valentine
Represented By: Fred L. Sgroi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Stone
Represented By: Cassandra R. Valentine
Represented By: Fred L. Sgroi
Represented By: William Perry Brandt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimario Anderson
Represented By: Scott C. Nehrbass
Represented By: Alexandra N.C. Rose
Represented By: Nancy Estelle Musick
Represented By: Boyd A. Byers
Represented By: Boyd Byers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Grimmett
Represented By: Alexandra N.C. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?