Roberts et al v. TransAm Trucking, Inc.
Plaintiff: John Curtis, Reginald Bradley, David Coleman, Terrence Colvin-Williams, Kirk Roberts and Carl McRoberts, Jr.
Defendant: TransAm Trucking, Inc. and Olathe Noble Equipment Leasing, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv02073
Filed: February 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Gwynne E Birzer
Referring Judge: John W Broomes
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 Defendant TransAm Trucking, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. TransAm Trucking, Inc. shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' First Amended Class and Collective Action Complaint on or before Monday, May 24, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 4/7/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ala)
April 2, 2021 Filing 21 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #17 Amended Complaint by Defendant TransAm Trucking, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer) (Johnson, Shannon)
April 2, 2021 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Carl McRoberts, Jr., Terrence Colvin-Williams, John Curtis, Reginald Bradley, Kirk Roberts, David Coleman. Olathe Noble Equipment Leasing, Inc. waiver sent on 3/25/2021, answer due 5/24/2021. (Donelon, Brendan)
March 31, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN by Roberto Texeira (Donelon, Brendan)
March 29, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN by Manuel Cuevas & Jonathan Moore (Donelon, Brendan)
March 24, 2021 Filing 17 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Olathe Noble Equipment Leasing, Inc., TransAm Trucking, Inc., filed by Carl McRoberts, Jr., Terrence Colvin-Williams, John Curtis, Reginald Bradley, Kirk Roberts, David Coleman.(Donelon, Brendan)
March 15, 2021 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint Defendant TransAm Trucking, Inc.'s Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiffs' Class and Collective Action Complaint by TransAm Trucking, Inc..(Johnson, Shannon)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #11 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. TransAm Trucking, Inc. answer now due 3/15/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 3/8/21. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ala)
March 5, 2021 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by TransAm Trucking, Inc. identifying Jacobson Holdings, Inc. as corporate parent . (Johnson, Shannon)
March 5, 2021 Filing 13 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Curry P. Sexton on behalf of TransAm Trucking, Inc.. (Sexton, Curry)
March 5, 2021 Filing 12 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Gregory B. Whiston on behalf of TransAm Trucking, Inc.. (Whiston, Gregory)
March 5, 2021 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant TransAm Trucking, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer) (Johnson, Shannon)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #3 #4 #5 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Brant Casavant, Hillary Schwab and Rachel Smit for Reginald Bradley, David Coleman, Terrence Colvin-Williams, John Curtis, Carl McRoberts, Jr. and Kirk Roberts pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 2/22/21. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ala)
February 22, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Carl McRoberts, Jr., Kirk Roberts, Reginald Bradley, Terrence Colvin-Williams, John Curtis, David Coleman upon TransAm Trucking, Inc. served on 2/12/2021, answer due 3/5/2021 (Donelon, Brendan)
February 17, 2021 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC FILING REGISTRATION FORM of Rachel Smit re motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #5 by Plaintiffs Reginald Bradley, David Coleman, Terrence Colvin-Williams, John Curtis, Carl McRoberts, Jr., Kirk Roberts. (gw)
February 17, 2021 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC FILING REGISTRATION FORM of Hillary Schwab re motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #4 by Plaintiffs Reginald Bradley, David Coleman, Terrence Colvin-Williams, John Curtis, Carl McRoberts, Jr., Kirk Roberts. (gw)
February 17, 2021 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC FILING REGISTRATION FORM of Brant Casavant re motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #3 by Plaintiffs Reginald Bradley, David Coleman, Terrence Colvin-Williams, John Curtis, Carl McRoberts, Jr., Kirk Roberts.(gw)
February 16, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for attorney Rachel Smit to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5411401.) by Plaintiffs Reginald Bradley, David Coleman, Terrence Colvin-Williams, John Curtis, Carl McRoberts, Jr., Kirk Roberts (referred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer) (Donelon, Brendan)
February 16, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for attorney Hillary Schwab to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5411395.) by Plaintiffs Reginald Bradley, David Coleman, Terrence Colvin-Williams, John Curtis, Carl McRoberts, Jr., Kirk Roberts (referred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer) (Donelon, Brendan)
February 16, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for attorney Brant Casavant to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5411379.) by Plaintiffs Reginald Bradley, David Coleman, Terrence Colvin-Williams, John Curtis, Carl McRoberts, Jr., Kirk Roberts (referred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer) (Donelon, Brendan)
February 10, 2021 SUMMONS ISSUED as to TransAm Trucking, Inc. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (lb)
February 10, 2021 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge John W. Broomes and Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (lb)
February 10, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiffs Reginald Bradley, David Coleman, Terrence Colvin-Williams, John Curtis, Carl McRoberts, Jr., Kirk Roberts. (Donelon, Brendan)
February 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $402, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5407230.), filed by Carl McRoberts, Jr., Kirk Roberts, Reginald Bradley, Terrence Colvin-Williams, John Curtis, David Coleman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Consent to Join Forms)(Donelon, Brendan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roberts et al v. TransAm Trucking, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Curtis
Represented By: Brendan J. Donelon
Represented By: Hillary Schwab
Represented By: Brant Casavant
Represented By: Rachel Smit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reginald Bradley
Represented By: Brendan J. Donelon
Represented By: Hillary Schwab
Represented By: Brant Casavant
Represented By: Rachel Smit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Coleman
Represented By: Brendan J. Donelon
Represented By: Hillary Schwab
Represented By: Brant Casavant
Represented By: Rachel Smit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrence Colvin-Williams
Represented By: Brendan J. Donelon
Represented By: Hillary Schwab
Represented By: Brant Casavant
Represented By: Rachel Smit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kirk Roberts
Represented By: Brendan J. Donelon
Represented By: Hillary Schwab
Represented By: Brant Casavant
Represented By: Rachel Smit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl McRoberts, Jr.
Represented By: Brendan J. Donelon
Represented By: Hillary Schwab
Represented By: Brant Casavant
Represented By: Rachel Smit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TransAm Trucking, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory B. Whiston
Represented By: Shannon Cohorst Johnson
Represented By: Curry P. Sexton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Olathe Noble Equipment Leasing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?