Ikona et al v. AHC of Overland Park, LLC
Plaintiff: Lucy B. Ikona and Roggie B. Etuka
Defendant: AHC of Overland Park, LLC and AHC of Overland Park, LLC an Idaho limited liability company doing business as Advanced Health Care of Overland Park
Case Number: 2:2021cv02130
Filed: March 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: John W Broomes
Referring Judge: Teresa J James
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2021 Filing 17 ANSWER to #13 Amended Complaint by AHC of Overland Park, LLC.(Niceswanger, Brian)
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 6/10/2021 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James. To join the call, counsel shall dial CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749 and enter ACCESS CODE 4901386. Rule 26 Planning Conference Deadline 5/20/2021. Report of Parties Planning Meeting and Rule 26 Initial Disclosures due 6/3/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 4/29/21. (ct)
April 28, 2021 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by AHC of Overland Park, LLC identifying New AHC Holding, LLC as corporate parent . (Niceswanger, Brian)
April 28, 2021 Filing 14 ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint by AHC of Overland Park, LLC.(Niceswanger, Brian)
April 27, 2021 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT (Second) against AHC of Overland Park, LLC, filed by Lucy B. Ikona, Roggie B. Etuka.(Klawuhn, Philip)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #9 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Amend. Plaintiffs seek leave to amend only to properly allege the citizenship of the parties for purposes of establishing diversity jurisdiction. The Court finds good cause to allow Plaintiffs to file their Second Amended Complaint, and directs Plaintiffs to do so on or before April 30, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 4/26/21. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ct)
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: The court determines, based on Doc. 8, that Plaintiffs have shown a factual basis for their allegations of diversity of citizenship under 28 U.S.C. 1332(a), and have thus shown cause why the action should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Entered by District Judge John W. Broomes on 04/20/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(jmr)
April 15, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Lucy B. Ikona, Roggie B. Etuka upon AHC of Overland Park, LLC served on 4/8/2021, answer due 4/29/2021 (Klawuhn, Philip)
April 12, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Amend Complaint re #4 Amended Complaint by Plaintiffs Roggie B. Etuka, Lucy B. Ikona (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amended Complaint Plaintiffs' Proposed Second Amended Complaint)(Klawuhn, Philip)
April 12, 2021 Filing 8 RESPONSE re #5 Order to Show Cause, by Plaintiffs Lucy B. Ikona, Roggie B. Etuka(Klawuhn, Philip)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Show Cause Order. Response deadline continued to 4/12/2021. Entered by District Judge John W. Broomes on 04/05/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jmr)
April 2, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #5 Order to Show Cause, by Plaintiffs Roggie B. Etuka, Lucy B. Ikona (Klawuhn, Philip)
April 2, 2021 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #5 Order to Show Cause. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge. (ts)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Plaintiffs must show good cause in writing to District Judge John W. Broomes, on or before April 2, 2021, why the Court should not dismiss this action for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 3/19/21. (ct)
March 18, 2021 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT of Plaintiffs against AHC of Overland Park, LLC, filed by Lucy B. Ikona, Roggie B. Etuka.(Klawuhn, Philip)
March 18, 2021 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiffs Roggie B. Etuka, Lucy B. Ikona - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Klawuhn, Philip)
March 18, 2021 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge John W. Broomes and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (lb)
March 18, 2021 SUMMONS ISSUED as to AHC of Overland Park, LLC. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (lb)
March 17, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiffs Roggie B. Etuka, Lucy B. Ikona. (Klawuhn, Philip)
March 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $402, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5439198.), filed by Lucy B. Ikona, Roggie B. Etuka.(Klawuhn, Philip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ikona et al v. AHC of Overland Park, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucy B. Ikona
Represented By: Philip A. Klawuhn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roggie B. Etuka
Represented By: Philip A. Klawuhn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AHC of Overland Park, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AHC of Overland Park, LLC an Idaho limited liability company doing business as Advanced Health Care of Overland Park
Represented By: Stephanie A. Preut
Represented By: Brian J. Niceswanger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?