Beteselassie et al v. Porcelana Corona de Mexico, S.A. de C.V.
Plaintiff: Bethlehem Gelaw and Nebiyu Beteselassie
Defendant: Porcelana Corona de Mexico, S.A. de C.V., Vortens J.J.R., INC. and Sanitarios Lamosa S.A. de C.V.
Case Number: 2:2021cv02153
Filed: March 31, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Teresa J James
Referring Judge: Kathryn H Vratil
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jonathan M. Soper for Nebiyu Beteselassie and Bethlehem Gelaw pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 5/17/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (kas)
May 14, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for attorney Jonathan M. Soper to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5488520.) by Plaintiffs Nebiyu Beteselassie, Bethlehem Gelaw (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 ECF Registration Form PVH Registration Form for Jonathan M. Soper)(Kilgore, Michael)
April 1, 2021 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Porcelana Corona de Mexico, S.A. de C.V. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (lb)
March 31, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiffs Nebiyu Beteselassie, Bethlehem Gelaw. (Kilgore, Michael)
March 31, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $402, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5449906.), filed by Nebiyu Beteselassie, Bethlehem Gelaw.(Kilgore, Michael)
March 31, 2021 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (lb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beteselassie et al v. Porcelana Corona de Mexico, S.A. de C.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Porcelana Corona de Mexico, S.A. de C.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vortens J.J.R., INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanitarios Lamosa S.A. de C.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bethlehem Gelaw
Represented By: Michael S. Kilgore
Represented By: Jonathan M. Soper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nebiyu Beteselassie
Represented By: Michael S. Kilgore
Represented By: Jonathan M. Soper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?