Carpenters Pension Trust Fund of Kansas City et al v. Drywall, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Donald E. Greenwell, III, Carpenters Pension Trust Fund of Kansas City, Carpenters' Joint Training Fund of St. Louis, Carpenters' Heath and Welfare Trust Fund of St. Louis, Albert L Bond, Carpenters Vacation Trust Fund of St. Louis, St. Louis- Kansas City Carpenters Regional Annuity Fund, Virgil W Kloth, St. Louis - Kansas City Carpenters Regional Council, Brian Murphy and Carpenters' Health and Welfare Trust Fund of St. Louis
Defendant: Drywall, Inc. and Robert L Knoblauch
Case Number: 2:2021cv02172
Filed: April 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Gwynne E Birzer
Referring Judge: Eric F Melgren
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2021 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #15 MOTION for Default Judgment for Robert Knoblauch by Plaintiffs Albert L Bond, Carpenters Pension Trust Fund of Kansas City, Carpenters Vacation Trust Fund of St. Louis, Carpenters' Health and Welfare Trust Fund of St. Louis, Carpenters' Joint Training Fund of St. Louis, Donald E. Greenwell, III, Virgil W Kloth, Brian Murphy, St. Louis - Kansas City Carpenters Regional Council, St. Louis- Kansas City Carpenters Regional Annuity Fund (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Schuster, Aaron)
June 10, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION for Default Judgment for Robert Knoblauch by Plaintiffs Albert L Bond, Carpenters Pension Trust Fund of Kansas City, Carpenters Vacation Trust Fund of St. Louis, Carpenters' Health and Welfare Trust Fund of St. Louis, Carpenters' Joint Training Fund of St. Louis, Donald E. Greenwell, III, Virgil W Kloth, Brian Murphy, St. Louis - Kansas City Carpenters Regional Council, St. Louis- Kansas City Carpenters Regional Annuity Fund (Schuster, Aaron)
June 10, 2021 Filing 14 CLERKS ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Robert L Knoblauch. Signed by deputy clerk on 6/10/2021.Mailed to pro se party Robert Knoblauch by regular mail to address as listed on the Complaint (3701 W. Dora, Wichita) and on Doc. 12 Summons Returned Executed (2419 Eastridge Court, Goddard).(cm)
June 9, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Default Judgment by Clerk of the Court by Plaintiffs Albert L Bond, Carpenters Pension Trust Fund of Kansas City, Carpenters Vacation Trust Fund of St. Louis, Carpenters' Health and Welfare Trust Fund of St. Louis, Carpenters' Joint Training Fund of St. Louis, Donald E. Greenwell, III, Virgil W Kloth, Brian Murphy, St. Louis - Kansas City Carpenters Regional Council, St. Louis- Kansas City Carpenters Regional Annuity Fund (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Schuster, Aaron)
June 8, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by St. Louis - Kansas City Carpenters Regional Council, Carpenters' Health and Welfare Trust Fund of St. Louis, Albert L Bond, Virgil W Kloth, St. Louis- Kansas City Carpenters Regional Annuity Fund, Donald E. Greenwell, III, Carpenters Pension Trust Fund of Kansas City, Carpenters Vacation Trust Fund of St. Louis, Brian Murphy, Carpenters' Joint Training Fund of St. Louis upon Robert L Knoblauch served on 5/18/2021, answer due 6/8/2021 (Schuster, Aaron)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Default Judgment as to Drywall, Inc. See Order for details. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 5/27/2021. (mam)
May 26, 2021 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #9 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court by Plaintiffs Albert L Bond, Carpenters Pension Trust Fund of Kansas City, Carpenters Vacation Trust Fund of St. Louis, Carpenters' Health and Welfare Trust Fund of St. Louis, Carpenters' Joint Training Fund of St. Louis, Donald E. Greenwell, III, Virgil W Kloth, Brian Murphy, St. Louis - Kansas City Carpenters Regional Council, St. Louis- Kansas City Carpenters Regional Annuity Fund (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Schuster, Aaron)
May 26, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court by Plaintiffs Albert L Bond, Carpenters Pension Trust Fund of Kansas City, Carpenters Vacation Trust Fund of St. Louis, Carpenters' Health and Welfare Trust Fund of St. Louis, Carpenters' Joint Training Fund of St. Louis, Donald E. Greenwell, III, Virgil W Kloth, Brian Murphy, St. Louis - Kansas City Carpenters Regional Council, St. Louis- Kansas City Carpenters Regional Annuity Fund (Schuster, Aaron)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Clerk's Entry Default Judgment. Signed by deputy clerk on 5/25/2021.Mailed to pro se party United States Corporation Agents, Inc. by regular mail at address listed on DE 3. (cm)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER finding as moot #4 Motion for Default Judgment. Upon entry of clerk's entry of default, counsel can resubmit the motion for default judgment. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 5/17/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (cm)
May 14, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Default Judgment by Clerk of the Court by Plaintiffs Albert L Bond, Carpenters Pension Trust Fund of Kansas City, Carpenters Vacation Trust Fund of St. Louis, Carpenters' Health and Welfare Trust Fund of St. Louis, Carpenters' Joint Training Fund of St. Louis, Donald E. Greenwell, III, Virgil W Kloth, Brian Murphy, St. Louis - Kansas City Carpenters Regional Council, St. Louis- Kansas City Carpenters Regional Annuity Fund (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Schuster, Aaron)
May 14, 2021 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #4 MOTION for Default Judgment by Plaintiffs Albert L Bond, Carpenters Pension Trust Fund of Kansas City, Carpenters Vacation Trust Fund of St. Louis, Carpenters' Health and Welfare Trust Fund of St. Louis, Carpenters' Joint Training Fund of St. Louis, Donald E. Greenwell, III, Virgil W Kloth, Brian Murphy, St. Louis - Kansas City Carpenters Regional Council, St. Louis- Kansas City Carpenters Regional Annuity Fund (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Schuster, Aaron)
May 14, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Default Judgment by Plaintiffs Albert L Bond, Carpenters Pension Trust Fund of Kansas City, Carpenters Vacation Trust Fund of St. Louis, Carpenters' Health and Welfare Trust Fund of St. Louis, Carpenters' Joint Training Fund of St. Louis, Donald E. Greenwell, III, Virgil W Kloth, Brian Murphy, St. Louis - Kansas City Carpenters Regional Council, St. Louis- Kansas City Carpenters Regional Annuity Fund (Schuster, Aaron)
May 11, 2021 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Robert L Knoblauch. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (lb)
April 27, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by St. Louis - Kansas City Carpenters Regional Council, Carpenters' Health and Welfare Trust Fund of St. Louis, Albert L Bond, Virgil W Kloth, St. Louis- Kansas City Carpenters Regional Annuity Fund, Donald E. Greenwell, III, Carpenters Pension Trust Fund of Kansas City, Carpenters Vacation Trust Fund of St. Louis, Brian Murphy, Carpenters' Joint Training Fund of St. Louis upon Drywall, Inc. served on 4/20/2021, answer due 5/11/2021 (Smith, Ryan)
April 15, 2021 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Drywall, Inc. and Robert L Knoblauch. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (kas)
April 14, 2021 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Eric F. Melgren and Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (lb)
April 14, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiffs Albert L Bond, Carpenters Pension Trust Fund of Kansas City, Carpenters Vacation Trust Fund of St. Louis, a Trust Fund, Carpenters' Health and Welfare Trust Fund of St. Louis, a Trust Fund, Carpenters' Joint Training Fund of St. Louis, a Trust Fund, Donald E. Greenwell, III, Virgil W Kloth, Brian Murphy, St. Louis - Kansas City Regional Council, St. Louis- Kansas City Carpenters Regional Annuity Fund, a Trust Fund. (Schuster, Aaron)
April 14, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $402, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5462437.), filed by St. Louis - Kansas City Regional Council, Carpenters' Health and Welfare Trust Fund of St. Louis, a Trust Fund, Albert L Bond, Virgil W Kloth, St. Louis- Kansas City Carpenters Regional Annuity Fund, a Trust Fund, Donald E. Greenwell, III, Carpenters Pension Trust Fund of Kansas City, Carpenters Vacation Trust Fund of St. Louis, a Trust Fund, Brian Murphy, Carpenters' Joint Training Fund of St. Louis, a Trust Fund.(Schuster, Aaron)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carpenters Pension Trust Fund of Kansas City et al v. Drywall, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald E. Greenwell, III
Represented By: Ryan D. Smith
Represented By: Mark A. Kistler
Represented By: Aaron D. Schuster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carpenters Pension Trust Fund of Kansas City
Represented By: Ryan D. Smith
Represented By: Mark A. Kistler
Represented By: Aaron D. Schuster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carpenters' Joint Training Fund of St. Louis
Represented By: Ryan D. Smith
Represented By: Mark A. Kistler
Represented By: Aaron D. Schuster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carpenters' Heath and Welfare Trust Fund of St. Louis
Represented By: Ryan D. Smith
Represented By: Mark A. Kistler
Represented By: Aaron D. Schuster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert L Bond
Represented By: Ryan D. Smith
Represented By: Mark A. Kistler
Represented By: Aaron D. Schuster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carpenters Vacation Trust Fund of St. Louis
Represented By: Ryan D. Smith
Represented By: Mark A. Kistler
Represented By: Aaron D. Schuster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St. Louis- Kansas City Carpenters Regional Annuity Fund
Represented By: Ryan D. Smith
Represented By: Mark A. Kistler
Represented By: Aaron D. Schuster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virgil W Kloth
Represented By: Ryan D. Smith
Represented By: Mark A. Kistler
Represented By: Aaron D. Schuster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St. Louis - Kansas City Carpenters Regional Council
Represented By: Ryan D. Smith
Represented By: Mark A. Kistler
Represented By: Aaron D. Schuster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Murphy
Represented By: Ryan D. Smith
Represented By: Mark A. Kistler
Represented By: Aaron D. Schuster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carpenters' Health and Welfare Trust Fund of St. Louis
Represented By: Ryan D. Smith
Represented By: Mark A. Kistler
Represented By: Aaron D. Schuster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Drywall, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert L Knoblauch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?