Willdan Energy Solutions v. Millig LLC et al
Plaintiff: Willdan Energy Solutions
Defendant: Millig LLC, Kevin M. Player, Justin T. Burwinkle, Aaron Tilden, Lauren K. (Donley) Bromley, Douglas Riat, Devin D. Malone, Scott D. McVey and Lauren K. Donley Bromley
Case Number: 2:2021cv02187
Filed: April 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Toby Crouse
Referring Judge: Teresa J James
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Plaintiff is hereby required, on or before July 9, 2021, to either (1) move for entry of default and when default has been entered, file a motion for default judgment as to defendant Douglas Riat pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 55 and D. Kan. Rule 77.2 (a)(6), or (2) show good cause in writing to the Honorable Toby Crouse, United States District Judge, why this case should not be dismissed, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b), as to defendant Douglas Riat, for lack of prosecution. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 6/18/2021. (ts)
June 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 INITIAL ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 8/12/2021 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James. COUNSEL AND PRO SE PARTIES WHO WILL PARTICIPATE MUST DIAL 888-363-4749 and enter Access Code 4901386 to join the conference. Rule 26 Planning Conference deadline 7/22/2021. Completed Report of Parties' Planning Conference and Rule 26 Initial Disclosures deadline 8/5/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 6/18/2021. (ts)
June 18, 2021 Filing 38 AMENDED ANSWER to #1 Complaint (attorney), #35 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim , Amended COUNTERCLAIM against Willdan Energy Solutions by Lauren K. Donley Bromley. (Weimer, Ross)
June 18, 2021 Filing 37 Plaintiff/Counterclaim Defendant Willdan's ANSWER to #35 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim Defendant/Counterclaim Plaintiff Donley's Counterclaims by Willdan Energy Solutions.(Rayl, Melody)
June 2, 2021 Filing 36 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of all alleged Proprietary and Trade Secret Information (as defined by the May 19, 2021 Order (Dkt. 27)) in hard-copy format and within Defendants possession, custody, or control by Lauren K. (Donley) Bromley, Justin T. Burwinkle, Devin D. Malone, Scott D. McVey, Millig LLC, Kevin M. Player, Aaron Tilden. (Weimer, Ross)
June 1, 2021 Filing 35 ANSWER to Complaint AND COUNTERCLAIM against Willdan Energy Solutions by Lauren K. (Donley) Bromley. (Weimer, Ross)
May 28, 2021 Filing 34 ANSWER to Complaint by Justin T. Burwinkle.(Weimer, Ross)
May 28, 2021 Filing 33 ANSWER to Complaint by Aaron Tilden.(Weimer, Ross)
May 28, 2021 Filing 32 ANSWER to Complaint by Devin D. Malone.(Weimer, Ross)
May 28, 2021 Filing 31 ANSWER to Complaint by Kevin M. Player.(Weimer, Ross)
May 28, 2021 Filing 30 ***PLEASE DISREGARD. SEE DE #35 FOR CORRECT FILING.*** ANSWER to Complaint by Lauren K. (Donley) Bromley.(Weimer, Ross) Modified on 6/1/2021 (ca).
May 28, 2021 Filing 29 ANSWER to Complaint by Scott D. McVey.(Weimer, Ross)
May 28, 2021 Filing 28 ANSWER to Complaint by Millig LLC.(Weimer, Ross)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and [19.1] Temporary Restraining Order. See ORDER for details. Signed by District Judge Toby Crouse on 5/19/2021. (ctv)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER finding as moot #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Willdan Energy Solutions. Signed by District Judge Toby Crouse on 5/18/21. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ta)
May 18, 2021 Filing 25 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before District Judge Toby Crouse: MOTION HEARING held on 5/18/2021 re #19 Joint Motion for Entry of Stipulated Preliminary Injunction filed by Willdan Energy Solutions. The Court will take the Motion, Doc. #19 , under advisement. (Court Reporter Sherry Harris.) (ta)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #21 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendants Millig LLC, Scott D. McVey, Lauren K. (Donley) Bromley, Devin D. Malone, Justin T. Burwinkle, Aaron Tilden and Kevin M. Player are hereby granted an extension of time, to and including May 28, 2021, in which to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's #1 Verified Complaint for Damages and Injunctive Relief. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 5/14/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ts)
May 14, 2021 Filing 23 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Eric E. Packel on behalf of Lauren K. (Donley) Bromley, Justin T. Burwinkle, Devin D. Malone, Scott D. McVey, Millig LLC, Kevin M. Player, Aaron Tilden (Packel, Eric)
May 14, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE of Hearing: THIS IS AN OFFICIAL NOTICE FOR THIS HEARING related to Doc. #19 Joint Motion for Entry of Stipulated Preliminary Injunction. Motion Hearing set for 5/18/2021 at 11:00 AM in Topeka Courtroom 401 (TC) before District Judge Toby Crouse.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ta)
May 14, 2021 Filing 21 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (attorney), by Defendants Lauren K. (Donley) Bromley, Justin T. Burwinkle, Devin D. Malone, Scott D. McVey, Millig LLC, Kevin M. Player, Aaron Tilden (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Weimer, Ross)
May 14, 2021 Filing 20 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Millig LLC identifying None as corporate parent . (Weimer, Ross)
May 12, 2021 Filing 19 JOINT MOTION FOR ENTRY OF A STIPULATED PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Plaintiff Willdan Energy Solutions, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 -- Stipulated Preliminary Injunction)(Rayl, Melody) Modified on 5/12/2021 -- Exhibit 1 restricted. Pursuant to D.Kan. Rule 5.4.4(e), proposed orders should be emailed directly to chambers and should not to be filed on CM/ECF. (mam)
May 6, 2021 Filing 18 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Willdan Energy Solutions upon Devin D. Malone served on 5/5/2021, answer due 5/26/2021 (Rayl, Melody)
April 29, 2021 Filing 17 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Willdan Energy Solutions upon Aaron Tilden served on 4/28/2021, answer due 5/19/2021 (Rayl, Melody)
April 27, 2021 Filing 16 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Willdan Energy Solutions upon Lauren K. (Donley) Bromley served on 4/26/2021, answer due 5/17/2021 (Rayl, Melody)
April 26, 2021 Filing 15 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Willdan Energy Solutions upon Kevin M. Player served on 4/24/2021, answer due 5/17/2021. (Rayl, Melody)
April 26, 2021 Filing 14 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Willdan Energy Solutions upon Justin T. Burwinkle served on 4/25/2021, answer due 5/17/2021. (Rayl, Melody)
April 26, 2021 Filing 13 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Willdan Energy Solutions upon Douglas Riat served on 4/23/2021, answer due 5/14/2021. (Rayl, Melody)
April 26, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal by Willdan Energy Solutions upon Scott D. McVey served on 4/23/2021, answer due 5/14/2021. (Rayl, Melody)
April 26, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Willdan Energy Solutions upon Millig LLC served on 4/23/2021, answer due 5/14/2021. (Rayl, Melody)
April 26, 2021 Filing 10 (DISREGARD, see #12 for the corrected filing) -- RETURN OF SERVICE of subpoena filed by Plaintiff Willdan Energy Solutions executed upon Scott McVey on 4/23/21 by Personal Service. (Rayl, Melody) Modified on 4/27/2021, wrong event used. (mam)
April 26, 2021 Filing 9 (DISREGARD, see #15 for the corrected filing) -- RETURN OF SERVICE of subpoena filed by Plaintiff Willdan Energy Solutions executed upon Kevin Player on 4/23/21 by Personal Service. (Rayl, Melody) Modified on 4/27/2021, wrong event used. (mam)
April 26, 2021 Filing 8 (DISREGARD, see #14 for the corrected filing) -- RETURN OF SERVICE of subpoena filed by Plaintiff Willdan Energy Solutions executed upon Justin Burwinkle on 4/23/21 by Personal Service. (Rayl, Melody) Modified on 4/27/2021, wrong event used. (mam)
April 26, 2021 Filing 7 (DISREGARD, see #13 for the corrected filing) -- RETURN OF SERVICE of subpoena filed by Plaintiff Willdan Energy Solutions executed upon Douglas Riat on 4/23/21 by Personal Service. (Rayl, Melody) Modified on 4/27/2021, wrong event used. (mam)
April 26, 2021 Filing 6 (DISREGARD, see #11 for the corrected filing) -- RETURN OF SERVICE of subpoena filed by Plaintiff Willdan Energy Solutions executed upon Millig LLC on 4/23/21 by Personal Service. (Rayl, Melody) Modified on 4/27/2021, wrong event used. (mam)
April 26, 2021 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Willdan Energy Solutions identifying Willdan Group, Inc. as corporate parent . (Brown, Laura)
April 23, 2021 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #3 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Willdan Energy Solutions. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Nikunj Parikh)(Rayl, Melody)
April 23, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Willdan Energy Solutions. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Information Sheet for TRO) (Rayl, Melody) Added Motion for Preliminary Injunction on 4/23/2021. (mam)
April 23, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Willdan Energy Solutions. (Rayl, Melody)
April 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City (Filing fee $402, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5470375.), filed by Willdan Energy Solutions. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Scott McVey Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Policy Agreements, #3 Exhibit C - Demand Letters, #4 Exhibit D - Response to Demand)(Rayl, Melody)
April 23, 2021 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Lauren K. (Donley) Bromley, Justin T. Burwinkle, Devin D. Malone, Scott D. McVey, Millig LLC, Kevin M. Player, Douglas Riat, Aaron Tilden. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (lb)
April 23, 2021 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Toby Crouse and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (lb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Willdan Energy Solutions v. Millig LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Millig LLC
Represented By: Eric E. Packel
Represented By: Ross T. Weimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin M. Player
Represented By: Eric E. Packel
Represented By: Ross T. Weimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin T. Burwinkle
Represented By: Eric E. Packel
Represented By: Ross T. Weimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Tilden
Represented By: Eric E. Packel
Represented By: Ross T. Weimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lauren K. (Donley) Bromley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas Riat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Devin D. Malone
Represented By: Eric E. Packel
Represented By: Ross T. Weimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott D. McVey
Represented By: Eric E. Packel
Represented By: Ross T. Weimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lauren K. Donley Bromley
Represented By: Eric E. Packel
Represented By: Ross T. Weimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willdan Energy Solutions
Represented By: Melody Lorrain Rayl
Represented By: Laura B. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?