Dustech, LLC v. Compass Minerals Ogden, Inc.
Plaintiff: Dustech, LLC
Defendant: Compass Minerals Ogden Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv02199
Filed: April 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Daniel D Crabtree
Referring Judge: Kenneth G Gale
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2021 Filing 16 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Sara Fevurly on behalf of Compass Minerals Ogden Inc. (Fevurly, Sara)
June 28, 2021 Filing 15 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey J. Simon on behalf of Compass Minerals Ogden Inc. (Simon, Jeffrey)
June 21, 2021 Filing 14 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Dustech, LLC upon Compass Minerals Ogden Inc. served on 6/14/2021, answer due 7/6/2021 via Service on Registered Agent (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Confer, Christopher)
June 21, 2021 Filing 13 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Dustech, LLC upon Compass Minerals Ogden Inc. served on 6/10/2021, answer due 7/1/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Confer, Christopher)
June 9, 2021 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Compass Minerals Ogden Inc. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (kas)
June 2, 2021 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Compass Minerals Ogden Inc., filed by Dustech, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Amended Complaint, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E - Amended Complaint, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F - Amended Complaint, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G - Amended Complaint)(Confer, Christopher)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting, for good cause shown, #9 Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint. Amended pleading shall be filed, in form attached to motion, on or before June 7, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 5/24/21. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (df)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER re #8 Response to Order to show Cause filed by Dustech, LLC. On May 12, 2021, the District Court ordered Plaintiff to show cause why the court should not dismiss this action for lack of subject matter jurisdiction because the Amended Complaint fails to establish that diversity of citizenship exists. Doc. 5. Plaintiff filed a Response (Doc. 8). The Response sufficiently establishes the citizenship of the parties in this case. The court finds Plaintiff now has alleged facts sufficient to establish diversity jurisdiction pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1332. Plaintiff thus has shown good cause why the court should not dismiss this action for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 5/24/21. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(df)
May 21, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Amend Complaint re #1 Complaint (attorney), , MOTION for Leave to Amend Complaint re #1 Complaint (attorney), ( Response deadline 6/4/2021) by Plaintiff Dustech, LLC (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Confer, Christopher)
May 21, 2021 Filing 8 RESPONSE re #5 Order to Show Cause, by Plaintiff Dustech, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Confer, Christopher)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Garrison M. Cohen for Dustech, LLC pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 5/18/21. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (df)
May 18, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for attorney Garrison M. Cohen to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5490735.) by Plaintiff Dustech, LLC (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Attachments: #1 Pro Hac Vice Registration)(Confer, Christopher)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE AND TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - plaintiff must show good cause in writing, on or before May 24, 2021, why the court should not dismiss this action for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 5/12/2021. (ca)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Daniel J. Fleming as counsel for Dustech, LLC pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 4/30/21. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (aw)
April 30, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for attorney Daniel J. Fleming to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5475901.) by Plaintiff Dustech, LLC (Confer, Christopher)
April 30, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Dustech, LLC. (Confer, Christopher)
April 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $402, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5475842.), filed by Dustech, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A, #2 Ex. B, #3 Ex. C, #4 Ex. D, #5 Ex. E, #6 Ex. F)(Confer, Christopher)
April 30, 2021 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree and Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (lb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dustech, LLC v. Compass Minerals Ogden, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dustech, LLC
Represented By: Stephanie Woltkamp
Represented By: Daniel J. Fleming
Represented By: Christopher Charles Confer
Represented By: Garrison M. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Compass Minerals Ogden Inc.
Represented By: Sara Fevurly
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?