Lindsay v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Plaintiff: Kevin Lindsay
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Interested Party: Social Security Regional Administrator
Case Number: 2:2021cv02212
Filed: May 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Daniel D Crabtree
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Returned Executed - served by Certified Mail (USM 285) on 5/24/2021. Summons served on United States Attorney General. (lb)
June 2, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Returned Executed - served by Certified Mail (USM 285) on 5/19/2021. Summons served on Office of the Regional Counsel. (lb)
May 19, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Returned Executed - served by Personal Service (USM 285) Social Security Administration, Commissioner of served on 5/17/2021, answer due 7/16/2021. Summons served on United States Attorney. (lb)
May 14, 2021 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Social Security Administration, Commissioner of, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (issued to US Marshal (USM 285) for service) (lb)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to File Complaint In Forma Pauperis. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 5/12/2021. (kas)
May 7, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to proceed in forma pauperis NOTE Access to document is restricted pursuant to the Courts privacy policy. by Plaintiff Kevin Lindsay (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Driskill, Roger) Modified event type and docket text on 5/13/2021 (kas).
May 7, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Kevin Lindsay. (Driskill, Roger)
May 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City, filed by Kevin Lindsay.(Driskill, Roger)
May 7, 2021 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (lb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lindsay v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Lindsay
Represented By: Kyle Henry Sciolaro
Represented By: Roger M. Driskill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Regional Administrator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?