Casey et al v. Chuck Reid, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Michael Casey and Arlene Casey
Defendant: Phoenix Renovation and Restoration, Inc. and Chuck Reid, LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv02234
Filed: May 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: James P O'Hara
Referring Judge: Holly L Teeter
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2021 Filing 40 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL by Arlene Casey, Michael Casey. (Hill, Michael)
July 20, 2021 ***Civil Case Terminated per #40 Stipulation of Dismissal.(kas)
June 28, 2021 Filing 39 RESPONSE re #38 Order to Show Cause, by Defendant Phoenix Renovation and Restoration, Inc.(Blumreich, Craig)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. The parties are directed to show cause why their right to enforce a forum-selection clause trumps 28 U.S.C. 1441(b)(2) and why the case shouldn't be remanded to Kansas state court under the principles of removal diversity jurisdiction. The parties are directed to submit a response to this order by June 28, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 6/14/21. (jc)
June 11, 2021 Filing 37 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Michael Hill on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Hill, Michael)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 INITIAL ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 7/21/2021 at 9:00 AM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara. Rule 26 Planning Conference Deadline 7/6/2021. Report of Parties Planning Meeting deadline and Rule 26 Initial Disclosures deadline 7/12/2021. All parties and counsel participating in this phone conference are directed to dial the conference center line 888-363-4749, using access code 8914911 to join the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 6/10/2021. (ss) Modified on 6/11/2021 to update text to match Order (jal).
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER. On May 21, 2021, the Court ordered Defendant Phoenix Renovation and Restoration, Inc. to show cause why this case should not be dismissed for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction #31 . Defendant Phoenix Renovation and Restoration, Inc. initially responded and provided additional information about Defendant Chuck Reid, LLC #32 . The Court then issued a second show-cause order (Doc. 33) because the response did not address the citizenship of Defendant Phoenix Renovation and Restoration, Inc. Defendant Phoenix Renovation and Restoration, Inc. has now responded #34 and has adequately identified the citizenship of all parties, which are diverse under 28 U.S.C. 1332. Based on the information provided, the Court finds that Defendant Phoenix Renovation and Restoration, Inc. has satisfied its burden to show why this case should not be dismissed for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. Signed by District Judge Holly L. Teeter on 6/10/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(md)
June 9, 2021 Filing 34 RESPONSE re #33 Order to Show Cause, by Defendant Phoenix Renovation and Restoration, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Eric Hugunin)(Blumreich, Craig)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - The Court orders Defendant Phoenix Renovation and Restoration, Inc. SHOW CAUSE in writing on or before June 14, 2021, why this case should not be remanded to state court for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. Signed by District Judge Holly L. Teeter on 6/7/2021. (md)
June 4, 2021 Filing 32 RESPONSE re #31 Order to Show Cause, by Defendant Phoenix Renovation and Restoration, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Chuck Reid)(Blumreich, Craig)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Defendant Phoenix Renovation and Restoration, Inc. SHOW CAUSE in writing on or before June 4, 2021, why this case should not be remanded to state court for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. Signed by District Judge Holly L. Teeter on 5/21/2021. (md)
May 21, 2021 Filing 30 Letter from the clerk to counsel regarding pro hac vice requirements. (kas)
May 21, 2021 Filing 29 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Missouri Western; Case Number 4:20-cv-00954. Electronic file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (kas)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE: Defendant Phoenix Renovation and Restoration, Inc.'s Motion to Transfer Due to Improper Venue (Doc. #2) is GRANTED. It is further, ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court is directed to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the District of Kansas. Signed on May 17, 2021 by Magistrate Judge Lajuana M. Counts. (Chorny, Traci) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 5/21/2021.]
May 2, 2021 Filing 27 STIPULATION re #2 MOTION to reassign/transfer case Due to Improper Venue by Arlene Casey, Michael Casey. (Related document(s) #2 ) (Hill, Michael) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 5/21/2021.]
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORAL ORDER lifting the stay on briefing and ruling as to Defendant Phoenix Renovation and Restoration, Inc.'s Motion to Transfer Due to Improper Venue (Doc. #2 ). Plaintiffs' responsive brief is due on or before May 6, 2021. Defendants' reply briefs is due ten days after Plaintiffs' responsive brief is filed. Signed on April 9, 2021 by Magistrate Judge Lajuana M. Counts. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Clinton, Erica) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 5/21/2021.]
March 30, 2021 Filing 25 NOTICE of appearance by Michael Hill on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attorney Michael Hill added to party Arlene Casey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Hill added to party Michael Casey(pty:pla))(Hill, Michael) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 5/21/2021.]
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #22 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Craig C. Blumreich for Phoenix Renovation and Restoration, Inc. allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Berner, Crystal) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 5/21/2021.]
March 17, 2021 Filing 23 AFFIDAVIT re #22 Motion to allow Craig C. Blumreich to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-7335237) by Phoenix Renovation and Restoration, Inc.. (Related document(s) #22 ) (Rackers, Christopher) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 5/21/2021.]
March 17, 2021 Filing 22 Motion to allow Craig C. Blumreich to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-7335237) filed by Christopher P. Rackers on behalf of Phoenix Renovation and Restoration, Inc.. (Rackers, Christopher) (Main Document 22 replaced using proper form on 3/17/2021) (Berner, Crystal). [Transferred from Missouri Western on 5/21/2021.]
March 1, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE of Magistrate Judge Assignment Returned by Arlene Casey, Michael Casey, Chuck Reid, LLC, Phoenix Renovation and Restoration, Inc.. Jurisdiction by magistrate judge accepted. ALL PARTIES HAVE CONSENTED. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent, #2 Magistrate Consent)(Melvin, Greg) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 5/21/2021.]
March 1, 2021 SECOND NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNMENT as to defendant Chuck Reid, LLC: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge assignment. Click # here for instructions. Form due by 3/12/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Melvin, Greg) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 5/21/2021.]
January 27, 2021 Filing 20 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS of Defendant Cuck Reid, LLC filed by John Michael Graham, Jr on behalf of Defendant Chuck Reid, LLC.(Graham, John) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 5/21/2021.]
January 27, 2021 NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNMENT as to defendant Chuck Reid, LLC: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge assignment. Click # here for instructions. Form due by 2/17/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Melvin, Greg) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 5/21/2021.]
January 26, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of appearance by John Michael Graham, Jr on behalf of Chuck Reid, LLC (Graham, John) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 5/21/2021.]
January 26, 2021 Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand on behalf of Chuck Reid, LLC.(Attorney John Michael Graham, Jr added to party Chuck Reid, LLC(pty:dft))(Graham, John) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 5/21/2021.]
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TRIAL ORDER, Signed on January 25, 2021 by Magistrate Judge Lajuana M. Counts. Jury Trial set for 4/4/2022 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6E, Kansas City (LMC) before Magistrate Judge Lajuana M. Counts (*please note this is set to last approximately 3 days*). Pretrial Conference set for 3/28/2022 01:30 PM Courtroom 6E, Kansas City (LMC) before Magistrate Judge Lajuana M. Counts. Proposed Jury Instructions, Proposed Voir Dire, and Proposed Exhibit and Witness Lists due by 3/7/2022. See order for additional deadlines. (Chorny, Traci) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 5/21/2021.]
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORAL ORDER The Court hereby adopts the parties' proposed Discovery Schedule found in section B of Doc. #15 . Discovery shall close on October 31, 2021. All dispositive motions shall be filed on or before December 15, 2021. See the Discovery Schedule found in section B of Doc. #15 for additional deadlines. Signed on January 25, 2021 by Magistrate Judge Lajuana M. Counts. (Clinton, Erica) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 5/21/2021.]
January 21, 2021 Filing 15 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by Phoenix Renovation and Restoration, Inc.. (Rackers, Christopher) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 5/21/2021.]
January 11, 2021 Filing 14 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Michael Casey, Arlene Casey. Chuck Reid, LLC served on 1/4/2021, answer due 1/25/2021. (Zmijewski, Daniel) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 5/21/2021.]
December 29, 2020 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Chuck Reid, LLC. (Woods, Gloria) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 5/21/2021.]
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORAL ORDER granting #11 Joint Motion for Stay of Ruling. The briefing and ruling on Defendant Phoenix Renovation and Restoration, Inc.'s Motion to Transfer Due to Improper Venue (Doc. #2 ) is stayed pending mediation. The parties shall inform the Court of the date of the mediation once it is scheduled. Signed on December 22, 2020 by Magistrate Judge Lajuana M. Counts. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Clinton, Erica) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 5/21/2021.]
December 21, 2020 Filing 11 Joint MOTION to stay OF RULING filed by Christopher P. Rackers on behalf of Phoenix Renovation and Restoration, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 1/4/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Rackers, Christopher) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 5/21/2021.]
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORAL ORDER granting #9 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time and Suggestions in Support. Plaintiffs Michael and Arlene Casey's response to Defendant Phoenix's Motion to Transfer Due to Improper Venue is due on or before 1/4/2021. Signed on December 18, 2020 by Magistrate Judge Lajuana M. Counts. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Clinton, Erica) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 5/21/2021.]
December 17, 2020 Filing 9 Consent MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply as to #2 MOTION to reassign/transfer case Due to Improper Venue filed by Daniel R. Zmijewski on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 12/31/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #2 ) (Zmijewski, Daniel) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 5/21/2021.]
December 4, 2020 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Christopher P. Rackers on behalf of Defendant Phoenix Renovation and Restoration, Inc..(Rackers, Christopher) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 5/21/2021.]
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due on or before 1/25/2021. Rule 26 conference due by 1/11/2021. The parties are directed to review and comply with the Notice of Pretrial Procedures. Signed on December 4, 2020 by Magistrate Judge Lajuana M. Counts. (Clinton, Erica) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 5/21/2021.]
December 3, 2020 Filing 6 CONSENT to Mediation by Phoenix Renovation and Restoration, Inc.(Rackers, Christopher) Modified on 12/4/2020: Document deleted. Consent form sent to case processor who handles notice of magistrate assignments. NEF regenerated. (Melvin, Greg) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 5/21/2021.]
December 3, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to Program Director. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 5/21/2021.]
December 3, 2020 Filing 4 Defendant Phoenix Renovation and Restoration, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand on behalf of Phoenix Renovation and Restoration, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Rackers, Christopher) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 5/21/2021.]
December 3, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of filing Notice To Plaintiff of Removal by Phoenix Renovation and Restoration, Inc. (Rackers, Christopher) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 5/21/2021.]
December 3, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to reassign/transfer case Due to Improper Venue filed by Christopher P. Rackers on behalf of Phoenix Renovation and Restoration, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 12/17/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Rackers, Christopher) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 5/21/2021.]
December 3, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Jackson County, case number 2016-CV18541, filed by Christopher P. Rackers on behalf of Phoenix Renovation and Restoration, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMOWDC-7170060. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Rackers, Christopher) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/3/2020: #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Woods, Gloria). Modified on 5/10/2021 attachment 1 replaced at the request of counsel. NEF regenerated to all parties. (Kern, Kendra). [Transferred from Missouri Western on 5/21/2021.]
December 3, 2020 NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE ASSIGNMENT as to all parties: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge assignment. Click # here for instructions. Form due by 12/24/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Woods, Gloria) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 5/21/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Casey et al v. Chuck Reid, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Casey
Represented By: Daniel R. Zmijewski
Represented By: Michael Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arlene Casey
Represented By: Daniel R. Zmijewski
Represented By: Michael Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phoenix Renovation and Restoration, Inc.
Represented By: Craig C. Blumreich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chuck Reid, LLC
Represented By: John M. Graham, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?