Chedester v. Basehor, Kansas, City of et al
Plaintiff: Rachel Chedester
Defendant: Basehor, Kansas, City of, Midwest Sports Productions LLC and National Youth Sports Sanctioning Organization, LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv02250
Filed: June 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Daniel D Crabtree
Referring Judge: Teresa J James
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2021 Filing 25 RESPONSE to #18 Answer to Amended Complaint Response to and Affirmative Avoidance of Defendant City of Basehor KS' Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Rachel Chedester. (Van Erem, Elizabeth)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING:Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 9/7/2021 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James. To join the call, counsel shall dial CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749 and enter ACCESS CODE 4901386. Rule 26 Planning Conference Deadline 8/17/2021. Report of Parties Planning Meeting and Rule 26 Initial Disclosures are due 8/31/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 7/26/21. (ct)
July 22, 2021 Filing 23 ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint by Midwest Sports Productions LLC.(Palmer, Brian)
July 22, 2021 Filing 22 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Brian L. Palmer on behalf of Midwest Sports Productions LLC. (Palmer, Brian)
July 22, 2021 Filing 21 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Diane Hastings Lewis on behalf of Midwest Sports Productions LLC. (Lewis, Diane)
July 8, 2021 Filing 20 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Rachel Chedester upon National Youth Sports Sanctioning Organization, LLC served on 6/27/2021, answer due 7/19/2021 Amended Complaint (Van Erem, Elizabeth)
July 8, 2021 Filing 19 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Rachel Chedester upon National Youth Sports Sanctioning Organization, LLC served on 6/27/2021, answer due 7/19/2021 Amended Petition Subsequently filed (Van Erem, Elizabeth)
July 7, 2021 Filing 18 ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint by Basehor, Kansas, City of.(Stewart, Michelle)
July 7, 2021 Filing 17 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Michelle R. Stewart on behalf of Basehor, Kansas, City of (Stewart, Michelle)
June 30, 2021 Filing 16 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal by Rachel Chedester upon Midwest Sports Productions LLC served on 6/18/2021, answer due 7/22/2021 21 Days after service is 07/09/2021 (Van Erem, Elizabeth)
June 30, 2021 Filing 15 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal by Rachel Chedester upon Midwest Sports Productions LLC served on 6/9/2021, answer due 6/30/2021 Amended Petition Subsequently filed (Van Erem, Elizabeth)
June 30, 2021 Filing 14 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal by Rachel Chedester upon Basehor, Kansas, City of served on 6/18/2021, answer due 7/9/2021 (Van Erem, Elizabeth)
June 30, 2021 Filing 13 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal by Rachel Chedester upon Basehor, Kansas, City of served on 6/4/2021, answer due 6/25/2021 Amended Petition Subsequently filed (Van Erem, Elizabeth)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Defendant Midwest Sports Productions LLC's unopposed motion for extension of time to answer Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. Defendant shall have until July 22, 2021 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 6/28/21. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ct)
June 24, 2021 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #7 Amended Complaint by Defendant Midwest Sports Productions LLC (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Heidrick, Jay)
June 24, 2021 Filing 10 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Elizabeth Marden on behalf of Midwest Sports Productions LLC. (Marden, Elizabeth)
June 24, 2021 Filing 9 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Jay E. Heidrick on behalf of Midwest Sports Productions LLC. (Heidrick, Jay)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - It is therefore Ordered by the Court plaintiff has complied with the court's Show Cause Order (Doc. 3) by showing good cause why the court shouldn't dismiss this case for lack of subject matter jurisdiction under 28 U.S.C. 1332. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 6/23/2021. (hw)
June 11, 2021 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT Plaintiff's First Amended Civil Complaint against All Defendants, filed by Rachel Chedester.(Van Erem, Elizabeth)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER finding as moot #5 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint. Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15(a)(1) allows a party to amend her complaint once as a matter of course within (A) 21 days after serving it, or (B) if the pleading is one to which a responsive pleading is required, 21 days after service of a responsive pleading or 21 days after service of a motion under Rule 12(b), (e), or (f), whichever is earlier. No Defendant has filed a responsive pleading and Plaintiff filed her Complaint on June 1, 2021 (and has not yet filed a return of service), so Plaintiff is entitled to file her Amended Complaint as a matter of course and does not need leave of court to do so. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 6/11/21. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ct)
June 11, 2021 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Basehor, Kansas, City of, Midwest Sports Productions LLC, and National Youth Sports Sanctioning Organization, LLC. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (kas)
June 8, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Amend Complaint re #1 Complaint (attorney) Van Erem, Elizabeth by Plaintiff Rachel Chedester (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Plaintiff's First Amended Civil Complaint)(Van Erem, Elizabeth)
June 7, 2021 Filing 4 RESPONSE re #3 Order to Show Cause, by Plaintiff Rachel Chedester(Van Erem, Elizabeth)
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Plaintiff must show good cause in writing to District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree, on or before June 11, 2021, why the Court should not dismiss this action for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 6/2/21. (ct)
June 1, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Rachel Chedester. (Van Erem, Elizabeth)
June 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $402, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5501543.), filed by Rachel Chedester.(Van Erem, Elizabeth)
June 1, 2021 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Basehor, Kansas, City of, Midwest Sports Productions LLC, National Youth Sports Sanctioning Organization, LLC. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (lb)
June 1, 2021 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (lb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chedester v. Basehor, Kansas, City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Basehor, Kansas, City of
Represented By: Michelle R. Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midwest Sports Productions LLC
Represented By: Brian L. Palmer
Represented By: Diane Hastings Lewis
Represented By: Elizabeth Marden
Represented By: Jay E. Heidrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Youth Sports Sanctioning Organization, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Chedester
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Van Erem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?