Wake 10, LLC v. McNaughton, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Wake 10, LLC
Defendant: McNaughton, Inc. and Patrick McNaughton
Case Number: 2:2021cv02257
Filed: June 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: John W Broomes
Referring Judge: Teresa J James
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2021 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Patrick McNaughton, McNaughton, Inc.(Patton, Thomas)
July 29, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM ( Response deadline 8/19/2021) by Defendants Patrick McNaughton, McNaughton, Inc. (Patton, Thomas)
July 29, 2021 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by McNaughton, Inc. identifying None as corporate parent . (Patton, Thomas)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint. Defendants McNaughton, Inc. and Patrick McNaughton are hereby granted an extension until July 29, 2021 in which to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's #1 Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 6/25/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ts)
June 25, 2021 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendants Patrick McNaughton, McNaughton, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Patton, Thomas)
June 25, 2021 Filing 5 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Thomas Merrill Patton on behalf of Patrick McNaughton, McNaughton, Inc. (Patton, Thomas)
June 4, 2021 Filing 4 AO FORM 120: REPORT on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Ashworth, Benjamin)
June 4, 2021 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Wake 10, LLC - trial to be held in Kansas City. (McInnes, Jack)
June 4, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Wake 10, LLC. (McInnes, Jack)
June 4, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City (Filing fee $402, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5504297.), filed by Wake 10, LLC. (McInnes, Jack)
June 4, 2021 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Patrick McNaughton and McNaughton, Inc. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (kas)
June 4, 2021 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge John W. Broomes and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (kas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wake 10, LLC v. McNaughton, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wake 10, LLC
Represented By: Jack D. McInnes
Represented By: Benjamin Darwin Ashworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McNaughton, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Merrill Patton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick McNaughton
Represented By: Thomas Merrill Patton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?