Kesters Merchandising Display International, Inc. v. SurfaceQuest, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Kesters Merchandising Display International, Inc.
Defendant: SurfaceQuest, Inc., SurfaceQuest Chicago and Engineered Group, LLC doing business as SQ Orlando
Case Number: 2:2021cv02300
Filed: July 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Gwynne E Birzer
Referring Judge: John W Broomes
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Kesters Merchandising Display International, Inc. upon Engineered Group, LLC served on 8/2/2021, answer due 8/23/2021 Corrected Notice (Stumph-Turner, Megan)
August 18, 2021 Filing 7 ***PLEASE DISREGARD. INCORRECT FILING. PLEASE SEE DE #8 FOR CORRECT FILING.*** SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal by Kesters Merchandising Display International, Inc. upon Engineered Group, LLC served on 7/29/2021, answer due 8/19/2021 (Stumph-Turner, Megan) Modified on 8/18/2021. (lb)
July 22, 2021 Filing 6 AO FORM 120: REPORT on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Unregistered Trademark)(Stumph-Turner, Megan)
July 22, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Kesters Merchandising Display International, Inc. upon SurfaceQuest Chicago served on 7/13/2021, answer due 8/3/2021 (Stumph-Turner, Megan)
July 8, 2021 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Kesters Merchandising Display International, Inc. identifying None as corporate parent . (Kreamer, James)
July 8, 2021 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Kesters Merchandising Display International, Inc. - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Kreamer, James)
July 8, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Kesters Merchandising Display International, Inc.. (Kreamer, James)
July 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $402, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5531480.), filed by Kesters Merchandising Display International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Screen Capture, #2 Exhibit B - Screen Capture, #3 Exhibit C - Screen Capture)(Kreamer, James)
July 8, 2021 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge John W. Broomes and Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (kas)
July 8, 2021 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Engineered Group, LLC, SurfaceQuest Chicago, SurfaceQuest, Inc. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (lb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kesters Merchandising Display International, Inc. v. SurfaceQuest, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kesters Merchandising Display International, Inc.
Represented By: Megan R. Stumph-Turner
Represented By: James Scott Kreamer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SurfaceQuest, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SurfaceQuest Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Engineered Group, LLC doing business as SQ Orlando
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?