Alpha Industries, Inc. v. Alpha Clothing Co. LLC et al
Plaintiff: Alpha Industries, Inc.
Defendant: Alpha Clothing Co. LLC and Ryan Tanner Mueller
Case Number: 2:2021cv02302
Filed: July 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Gwynne E Birzer
Referring Judge: Kathryn H Vratil
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 44
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting #53 Joint Motion to Stay Deadlines. Defendants' answer deadline is extended to 9/11/21. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 8/12/21. (adc)
August 12, 2021 Filing 53 Joint MOTION to Stay Deadlines Proceedings by Defendants Alpha Clothing Co. LLC, Ryan Tanner Mueller (referred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer) (Winter, Milton)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting #51 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. All Defendants' Answer deadline extended to 8/13/21. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 8/9/21. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (adc)
August 4, 2021 Filing 51 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Defendants Alpha Clothing Co. LLC, Ryan Tanner Mueller (referred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer) (Winter, Milton)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting #49 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Joel G. MacMull for Alpha Industries, Inc. pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 8/4/21. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ala)
August 3, 2021 Filing 49 MOTION for attorney Joel G. MacMull to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5551358.) by Plaintiff Alpha Industries, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 ECF Registration Form)(Gilman, Stacey)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER. On 6/30/21 the Southern District of New York granted Defendants' motion to transfer this matter to the District of Kansas #43 . Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12, Defendants' Answer deadline was 14 days following this decision, 7/14/21. Although no answer(s) have been filed to date, the Court acknowledges following transfer, the parties were provided a letter on 7/9/21 outlining the necessity of local counsel. Therefore, due to this lag created by the transfer, the Court finds excusable neglect on the part of Defendants and good cause for extension of the Answer deadline. Due to recent retention of local counsel by all parties, the Court expects this matter to move forward expeditiously and establishes a deadline of 8/6/21 for all Defendants to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 7/19/21. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(adc)
July 16, 2021 Filing 47 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Carson M. Hinderks on behalf of Alpha Industries, Inc.. (Hinderks, Carson)
July 16, 2021 Filing 46 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Stacey R. Gilman on behalf of Alpha Industries, Inc.. (Gilman, Stacey)
July 9, 2021 Filing 45 Letter from the clerk to counsel regarding pro hac vice requirements. (heo)
July 8, 2021 Filing 44 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:21-cv-00087. Electronic case file and docket sheet received. (heo)
June 30, 2021 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of District of Kansas.(ate) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/8/2021.]
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 OPINION AND ORDER re: #20 MOTION to Transfer Case . filed by Alpha Clothing Co. LLC. For the reasons set forth above, the Court GRANTS Defendants' motion to transfer this case to the District of Kansas. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion at docket entry 20. The Clerk of Court is further directed to transfer this case in its entirety to the United States District Court for the District of Kansas. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 6/30/2021) (ate) Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing. [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/8/2021.]
April 30, 2021 Filing 42 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #20 MOTION to Transfer Case . . Document filed by Alpha Clothing Co. LLC, Ryan Tanner Mueller..(Rea, Jeffrey) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/8/2021.]
April 16, 2021 Filing 41 LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Joel G. MacMull dated April 16, 2021 re: Request for Oral Argument in Connection with Defendants' Motion to Transfer. Document filed by Alpha Industries, Inc...(MacMull, Joel) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/8/2021.]
April 16, 2021 Filing 40 DECLARATION of Joel G. MacMull in Opposition re: #20 MOTION to Transfer Case .. Document filed by Alpha Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2).(MacMull, Joel) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/8/2021.]
April 16, 2021 Filing 39 DECLARATION of Anthony Yarborough in Opposition re: #20 MOTION to Transfer Case .. Document filed by Alpha Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7).(MacMull, Joel) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/8/2021.]
April 16, 2021 Filing 38 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #20 MOTION to Transfer Case . . Document filed by Alpha Industries, Inc...(MacMull, Joel) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/8/2021.]
April 5, 2021 Filing 37 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 3/11/21 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days....(McGuirk, Kelly) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/8/2021.]
April 5, 2021 Filing 36 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 3/11/2021 before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kristen Carannante, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/26/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/6/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/6/2021..(McGuirk, Kelly) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/8/2021.]
April 5, 2021 Filing 35 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Milton S. Winter on behalf of Alpha Clothing Co. LLC, Ryan Tanner Mueller..(Winter, Milton) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/8/2021.]
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MEMO ENDORSEMENT re: #32 Letter filed by Alpha Clothing Co. LLC, Ryan Tanner Mueller. ENDORSEMENT: The Court is in receipt of Plaintiff's March 31, 2021 letter requesting that the Court order the parties to meet and confer (Dkt. #31), and Defendants' April 1, 2021 letter in opposition (Dkt. #32). Defendants correctly observe that the Court has not required the parties to prepare a proposed Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order at this time. And having carefully considered the parties' letters, the Court remains unconvinced that discovery or a Rule 26(f) conference need take place prior to the Court's resolution of the pending motion. Plaintiff's request is accordingly DENIED. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate Plaintiff's letter motion at docket entry 31. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 4/2/2021) (nb) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/8/2021.]
April 1, 2021 Filing 33 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey Joseph Rea on behalf of Alpha Clothing Co. LLC, Ryan Tanner Mueller..(Rea, Jeffrey) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/8/2021.]
April 1, 2021 Filing 32 LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Jeffrey J. Rea dated April 1, 2021 re: Response to ECF #31. Document filed by Alpha Clothing Co. LLC, Ryan Tanner Mueller..(Rea, Jeffrey) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/8/2021.]
March 31, 2021 Filing 31 PRE-CONFERENCE STATEMENT in Support of Plaintiff's Relief Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 37(f). Document filed by Alpha Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1).(MacMull, Joel) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/8/2021.]
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #29 Motion for Milton Shipman Winter, IV to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 3/31/2021) (nb) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/8/2021.]
March 30, 2021 Filing 29 MOTION for Milton Shipman Winter, IV to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24323633. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Alpha Clothing Co. LLC, Ryan Tanner Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Milton Shipman Winter, IV, #2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Rea, Jeffrey) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/8/2021.]
March 30, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #29 MOTION for Milton Shipman Winter, IV to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24323633. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/8/2021.]
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER: In light of the responsive briefing scheduled on Defendants' pending motion to transfer the venue of this action (see Dkt. #20, 27), the initial pretrial conference scheduled for April 1, 2021, is hereby ADJOURNED sine die. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 3/15/2021) (nb) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/8/2021.]
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER: On February 26, 2021, a Clerk's Certificate of Default was entered as to Defendants in this matter (see Dkt. #19), but no default judgment followed. Defendants subsequently filed several submissions on the docket (see Dkt. #20-21, 23), including a motion to transfer the venue of this action (Dkt. #20), and appeared for a conference on March 11, 2021. After hearing the parties' positions on whether default should be granted or vacated, and considering the "widely accepted" factors used by courts in this Circuit in determining whether to relieve a party from default, see Enron Oil Corp. v. Diakuhara, 10 F.3d 90, 96 (2d Cir. 1993), the Court directs the Clerk of Court to vacate the Certificate of Default entered in favor of Plaintiff at docket entry 19. The Court understands that counsel for Defendants will promptly file a notice of appearance. Separately, the Court schedules the responsive briefing to Defendants' motion to transfer the venue of this action as follows: Plaintiff's opposition brief is due on or before April 16, 2021, and any reply from Defendants is due on or before April 30, 2021. SO ORDERED., Responses due by 4/16/2021, Replies due by 4/30/2021. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 3/12/2021) (rj) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/8/2021.]
March 12, 2021 Filing 26 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey Joseph Rea on behalf of Alpha Clothing Co. LLC, Ryan Tanner Mueller..(Rea, Jeffrey) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/8/2021.]
March 11, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Katherine Polk Failla: Pre-Motion Conference held on 3/11/2021. Attorney Joel Geoffrey MacMull representing Plaintiff present. Attorney Jeffrey Joseph Rea representing Defendants present. The Court sua sponte vacates the Clerk's Certificate of Default, and sets the following briefing schedule on the motion to transfer venue: Opposition is due by 4/16/2021; and Reply is due by 4/30/2021. (Court Reporter Kristen Carannante) (tn) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/8/2021.]
March 9, 2021 Filing 25 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Court Order served on Alpha Clothing Co. LLC et al. on March 8, 2021. Service was accepted by Jeffrey Rea, Attorney of Record. Document filed by Alpha Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A).(MacMull, Joel) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/8/2021.]
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MEMO ENDORSEMENT re: #23 Letter filed by Alpha Clothing Co. LLC. ENDORSEMENT: The Court is in receipt of Defendant's motion to transfer the venue of this action (Dkt. #20), and the parties' March 8, 2021 letters (Dkt. #22, 23). The parties are hereby ORDERED to appear for a telephone conference on March 11, 2021, at 3:00 p.m. The Court will address the issues raised by the parties' submissions at that time. The dial-in information is as follows: At 3:00 p.m., the parties shall call (888) 363-4749 and enter access code 5123533. Please note, the conference will not be available prior to 3:00 p.m., (Telephone Conference set for 3/11/2021 at 03:00 PM before Judge Katherine Polk Failla.) (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 3/8/2021) (nb) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/8/2021.]
March 8, 2021 Filing 23 LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Jeffrey J. Rea dated March 8, 2021 re: Response to ECF #22. Document filed by Alpha Clothing Co. LLC..(Rea, Jeffrey) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/8/2021.]
March 8, 2021 Filing 22 LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Joel G. MacMull dated March 8, 2021 re: Request for Court Conference. Document filed by Alpha Industries, Inc...(MacMull, Joel) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/8/2021.]
March 5, 2021 Filing 21 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Alpha Clothing Co. LLC..(Rea, Jeffrey) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/8/2021.]
March 5, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION to Transfer Case . Document filed by Alpha Clothing Co. LLC. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to MOL, #3 Affidavit Declaration of Ryan Mueller in Support of Motion, #4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Rea, Jeffrey) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/8/2021.]
February 26, 2021 Filing 19 Vacated as per Judges Order dated 3/12/2021, Doc. # 27 CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT as to Alpha Clothing Co. LLC and Ryan Tanner Mueller.(km) Modified on 3/12/2021 (rj). [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/8/2021.]
February 25, 2021 Filing 18 PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT. Document filed by Alpha Industries, Inc...(MacMull, Joel) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). Modified on 2/26/2021 (km). [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/8/2021.]
February 25, 2021 Filing 17 DECLARATION of Joel G. MacMull in Support re: #16 Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default. Document filed by Alpha Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Request for Default).(MacMull, Joel) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/8/2021.]
February 25, 2021 Filing 16 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT. Document filed by Alpha Industries, Inc.(MacMull, Joel) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). Modified on 2/25/2021 (dt). [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/8/2021.]
February 25, 2021 Filing 15 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT. Document filed by Alpha Industries, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Joel MacMull in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order).(MacMull, Joel) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). Modified on 2/25/2021 (dt). [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/8/2021.]
February 25, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Joel MacMull to RE-FILE Document #15 Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default. ERROR(S): Documents have to be filed separately. File the Clerk's Certificate of Default, then separately file the Declaration with the request as an attachment using the event type Declaration in Support of a Non-Motion found under the event list Other Answers. (dt) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/8/2021.]
February 25, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT: Notice to Attorney Joel MacMull. RE-FILE Document No. #16 Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the proposed clerk's certificate of default lists the wrong name(s) for the party(ies) who was/were served (Defendant's Name); Name of the Person that was personally served, cross out personally and add through waiver of service, by e-mail to Attorney's name. Re-file the document using the event type Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default found under the event list Proposed Orders - select the correct filer/filers - attach the correct PDF that - lists the correct filed date of the complaint, lists the correct name(s) of the party(ies) who was/were served, lists the correct date the party(ies) was/were served, lists the correct filed date of the proof of service. (dt)[Transferred from New York Southern on 7/8/2021.]
January 25, 2021 Filing 14 MEMO ENDORSEMENT re: #13 Letter filed by Alpha Industries, Inc. ENDORSEMENT: The Court is in receipt of Defendant's January 22, 2021 letter regarding its waiver of service filed on January 21, 2021 (Dkt. #11-12), as well as Plaintiff's January 25, 2021 response (Dkt. #13). The Court agrees with Plaintiff's understanding of the requirements of Rule 4(d) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Moreover, the Court understands the correspondence enclosed in Plaintiff's January 20, 2021 letter to represent an agreement by Defendant's counsel to accept service, as distinguished from a waiver of service. (Dkt. #9-1). However, on this record, the Court will allow Defendant to respond to the Complaint on or before February 22, 2021. Additionally, the Court observes that Defendant's counsel has not yet filed a Notice of Appearance, and advises that they do so., Alpha Clothing Co. LLC answer due 2/22/2021; Ryan Tanner Mueller answer due 2/22/2021. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 1/25/2021) (nb) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/8/2021.]
January 25, 2021 Filing 13 LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Joel G. MacMull dated January 25, 2021 re: Defendants' Time to Respond to the Complaint. Document filed by Alpha Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1).(MacMull, Joel) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/8/2021.]
January 22, 2021 Filing 12 LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Jeffrey J. Rea dated January 22, 2021 re: waiver of service of summons. Document filed by Alpha Clothing Co. LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Docket Sheet).(Rea, Jeffrey) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/8/2021.]
January 21, 2021 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. All Defendants. Document filed by Alpha Clothing Co. LLC..(Rea, Jeffrey) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/8/2021.]
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on April 1, 2021, at 11:00 a.m. The conference will be held telephonically. At the scheduled date and time, the parties are to call (888) 363-4749 and enter access code 5123533, and as further set forth in this Order. So ordered. (Initial Conference set for 4/1/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge Katherine Polk Failla). (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 1/20/2021) (rjm) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/8/2021.]
January 20, 2021 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Alpha Clothing Co. LLC served on 1/13/2021, answer due 2/3/2021; Ryan Tanner Mueller served on 1/13/2021, answer due 2/3/2021. Service was accepted by Mit Winter, Counsel to Defendants. Document filed by Alpha Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1).(MacMull, Joel) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/8/2021.]
January 15, 2021 Filing 8 AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 15 U.S.C. 1116, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following trademark(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)..(pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/8/2021.]
January 15, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Joel Geoffrey MacMull to RE-FILE Document No. #7 Request for Issuance of Summons, #6 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the date field on the offical A.O. Summons form was completed by the attorney. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/8/2021.]
January 13, 2021 Filing 7 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Ryan "Tanner" Mueller, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Alpha Industries, Inc...(MacMull, Joel) Modified on 1/15/2021 (sj). [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/8/2021.]
January 13, 2021 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Alpha Clothing Co. LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Alpha Industries, Inc..(MacMull, Joel) Modified on 1/15/2021 (sj). [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/8/2021.]
January 13, 2021 Filing 5 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Alpha Industries, Inc...(MacMull, Joel) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/8/2021.]
January 13, 2021 Filing 4 AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review..(MacMull, Joel) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/8/2021.]
January 13, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(MacMull, Joel) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/8/2021.]
January 6, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Joel Geoffrey MacMull. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Albany. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (dnh) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/8/2021.]
January 6, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Joel Geoffrey MacMull. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Alpha Clothing Co. LLC, Mueller Tanner Ryan, Alpha Industries, Inc.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party role was entered incorrectly; party text was omitted. (dnh) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/8/2021.]
January 6, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Joel Geoffrey MacMull to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the form used for the civil cover sheet is not the S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet form dated October 1, 2020;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated October 1, 2020. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated October 1, 2020 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (dnh) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/8/2021.]
January 6, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO SUBMIT AO 120 FORM PATENT/TRADEMARK. Notice to Attorney Joel Geoffrey MacMull to submit a completed AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark to court for review. Use the event type AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark - Notice of Submission by Attorney found under the event list Other Documents. (dnh) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/8/2021.]
January 6, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (dnh) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/8/2021.]
January 6, 2021 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (dnh) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/8/2021.]
January 6, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(dnh) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/8/2021.]
January 5, 2021 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(MacMull, Joel) Modified on 1/6/2021 (dnh). [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/8/2021.]
January 5, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alpha Clothing Co. LLC, Mueller Tanner Ryan. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-23364555)Document filed by Alpha Industries, Inc...(MacMull, Joel) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/8/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alpha Industries, Inc. v. Alpha Clothing Co. LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alpha Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Carson M. Hinderks
Represented By: Joel G. MacMull
Represented By: Stacey R. Gilman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alpha Clothing Co. LLC
Represented By: Milton Shipman Winter, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Tanner Mueller
Represented By: Milton Shipman Winter, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?