Arnold v. CNH Industrial America LLC
Plaintiff: Reece Arnold
Defendant: CNH Industrial America LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv02341
Filed: August 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Gwynne E Birzer
Referring Judge: Daniel D Crabtree
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER REGARDING POTENTIAL FOR JUDICIAL DISQUALIFICATION. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 9/16/2021. (hw)
September 16, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE Concerning Potential Judicial Disqualification. See Notice for details. (hw)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of David J. Taylor for Reece Arnold pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 9/15/21. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ala)
September 15, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION for attorney David J. Taylor to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5587936.) by Plaintiff Reece Arnold (referred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer) (Kennedy, Court)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 11/22/2021 at 11:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer. Participants shall dial into the conference call at 888-363-4749, enter access code 9686294#, and follow the prompts to join the call. Report of Parties Planning Conference and Rule 26 Initial Disclosures due 11/15/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 9/14/21. (ala)
September 13, 2021 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CNH Industrial America LLC identifying Case New Holland Industrial, Inc. as corporate parent . (Edwards, Patrick)
September 13, 2021 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint by CNH Industrial America LLC.(Edwards, Patrick)
August 27, 2021 Filing 12 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 9/14/2021 for Defendant CNH Industrial America LLC to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 8/27/2021. (lb)
August 27, 2021 Filing 11 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Patrick A. Edwards on behalf of CNH Industrial America LLC. (Edwards, Patrick)
August 26, 2021 Filing 10 SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE re #4 Order to Show Cause, by Plaintiff Reece Arnold(Kennedy, Court)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF CORRECTION. In the Court's prior orders 8 , #4 , the undersigned neglected to address the citizenship of the members of the Defendant LLC. Because a limited liability company takes the citizenship of all its members, Plaintiff must allege that no member of the Defendant LLC is a citizen of the same state as Plaintiff. (See, e.g., CU Capital Mkt. Sols., LLC v. Olden Lane Sec., LLC, No. 18-2597-DDC-KGG, 2019 WL 2612940, at *2 (D. Kan. June 26, 2019). Therefore, Plaintiff is required to supplement his Response #7 to the Show Cause Order no later than 8/30/21. Any requirement to amend the pleading remains stayed pending Defendant's response to the Complaint. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 8/20/21. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(adc)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER. On review of Plaintiff's Response #7 to the Order to Show Cause #4 , the Court finds Plaintiff has shown good cause for this matter to continue. Plaintiff's filing of an amended Complaint to address the jurisdictional pleading deficiencies is postponed until such time as Defendant has entered this case, to avoid the time and expense of additional service. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 8/19/21. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(adc)
August 18, 2021 Filing 7 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Reece Arnold re #4 Order to Show Cause, (Kennedy, Court)
August 13, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Reece Arnold upon CNH Industrial America LLC served on 8/10/2021, answer due 8/31/2021. (hw)
August 13, 2021 Filing 5 (PLEASE DISREGARD - SEE DE #6 FOR CORRECT FILING) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Return of Service for Certified Mail upon Defendant CNH Industrial Americal, LLC by Reece Arnold re #1 Complaint (attorney). (Kennedy, Court) Modified on 8/13/2021 (hw).
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Plaintiff Reece Arnold is directed to show cause within 14 days why the Court should not recommend dismissal of this matter for lack of subject matter jurisdiction under 28 U.S.C. 1332. Show Cause Response due by 8/19/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 8/5/21. (adc)
August 5, 2021 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree and Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (lb)
August 5, 2021 SUMMONS ISSUED as to CNH Industrial America LLC. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (lb)
August 4, 2021 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Reece Arnold - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Kennedy, Court)
August 4, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Reece Arnold. (Kennedy, Court)
August 4, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $402, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5552912.), filed by Reece Arnold. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kennedy, Court)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arnold v. CNH Industrial America LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reece Arnold
Represented By: Court T. Kennedy
Represented By: David J. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CNH Industrial America LLC
Represented By: Patrick A. Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?