Cincinnati Specialty Underwriters Insurance Company, The v. Domain at City Center, LLC, The et al
Plaintiff: Cincinnati Specialty Underwriters Insurance Company, The
Defendant: Domain at City Center, LLC, The, Town & Country Sheet Metal, Inc. and Haren & Laughlin Construction Company, Inc.
Petitioner: Employers Mutual Casualty Company
Case Number: 2:2021cv02349
Filed: August 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Toby Crouse
Referring Judge: Angel D Mitchell
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2021 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Domain at City Center, LLC, The. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (lb)
September 30, 2021 Filing 19 SUMMONS RETURNED UNEXECUTED by Cincinnati Specialty Underwriters Insurance Company, The as to Domain at City Center, LLC, The. (Brown, Michael)
September 28, 2021 Filing 18 INTERVENOR COMPLAINT , filed by Employers Mutual Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Release, #3 Exhibit C - 2014 EMC Policies, #4 Exhibit D - 2015 EMC Policies, #5 Exhibit E - 2016 EMC Policies, #6 Exhibit F - 2017 EMC Policies, #7 Exhibit G - 2018 EMC Policies, #8 Exhibit H - Cincinnati Excess Policy, #9 Exhibit I - Letter)(Assouad, Jean-Paul)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMORANDUM ORDER granting #13 Motion to Intervene. Employers Mutual Casualty Company shall file its Complaint in Intervention (ECF 14-1) as a separate docket entry in this case within two business days from the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 9/28/2021. (bh)
September 21, 2021 Filing 16 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Isaac William Straub on behalf of Employers Mutual Casualty Company. (Straub, Isaac)
September 13, 2021 Filing 15 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Cincinnati Specialty Underwriters Insurance Company, The upon Town & Country Sheet Metal, Inc. c/o Vince Wohletz, Resident Agent (Brown, Michael)
September 9, 2021 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #13 MOTION to Intervene by Movant Employers Mutual Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - EMC's Complaint in Intervention)(Assouad, Jean-Paul) Modified role type. (kao)
September 9, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION to Intervene by Movant Employers Mutual Casualty Company (referred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell). (Assouad, Jean-Paul) Modified role type. (kao)
September 9, 2021 Filing 12 Town & Country Sheetmetal Inc's ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint by Town & Country Sheet Metal, Inc..(Griffin, Stephen)
September 9, 2021 Filing 11 Town & Country Sheetmetal Inc's ANSWER to Complaint by Town & Country Sheet Metal, Inc..(Griffin, Stephen)
September 1, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Cincinnati Specialty Underwriters Insurance Company, The upon Haren & Laughlin Construction Company, Inc. served on 8/19/2021, answer due 9/9/2021 (Brown, Michael)
September 1, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Cincinnati Specialty Underwriters Insurance Company, The upon Town & Country Sheet Metal, Inc. served on 8/19/2021, answer due 9/9/2021 (Brown, Michael)
August 20, 2021 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cincinnati Specialty Underwriters Insurance Company, identifying Cincinnati Financial Corporation as corporate parent (Brown, Michael)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re #4 Notice and Order to Show Cause. The court has reviewed plaintiff's response (ECF 6) to the August 16 order to show cause and the First Amended Complaint for Declaratory Judgment (ECF 5). Plaintiff now alleges that defendant The Domain at City Center, LLC's members are Kansas citizens. The court finds that plaintiff's jurisdictional allegations are now sufficient at this procedural juncture, and therefore the court will not recommend dismissal for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 8/20/21. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ks)
August 19, 2021 Filing 6 RESPONSE re #4 Order to Show Cause, by Plaintiff Cincinnati Specialty Underwriters Insurance Company, The(Brown, Michael)
August 19, 2021 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against All Defendants, filed by Cincinnati Specialty Underwriters Insurance Company, The.(Brown, Michael)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Plaintiff must show cause in writing by August 30, 2021 why the court should not recommend that the district judge dismiss this case without prejudice for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. See text of order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 8/16/21. (ks)
August 13, 2021 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Domain at City Center, LLC, The, Haren & Laughlin Construction Company, Inc., Town & Country Sheet Metal, Inc. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (lb)
August 11, 2021 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Cincinnati Specialty Underwriters Insurance Company, The - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Brown, Michael)
August 10, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Cincinnati Specialty Underwriters Insurance Company, The. (Brown, Michael)
August 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $402, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5556849.), filed by Cincinnati Specialty Underwriters Insurance Company, The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Brown, Michael)
August 10, 2021 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Toby Crouse and Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (lb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cincinnati Specialty Underwriters Insurance Company, The v. Domain at City Center, LLC, The et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cincinnati Specialty Underwriters Insurance Company, The
Represented By: Bryan Ross Kelly
Represented By: Michael L. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Domain at City Center, LLC, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town & Country Sheet Metal, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen Owen Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Haren & Laughlin Construction Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Employers Mutual Casualty Company
Represented By: Isaac William Straub
Represented By: Jean-Paul Assouad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?