Cash Today LLC et al v. MTE LLC et al
Plaintiff: Cash Today LLC and MoneyBox ATM Nevada LLC
Defendant: MTE LLC, MTE Platinum Cash LLC and Michael W. Tyler, Sr.
Case Number: 2:2021cv02360
Filed: August 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Eric F Melgren
Referring Judge: James P O'Hara
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2021 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint by MTE LLC, Michael W. Tyler, Sr..(Stuart, Daniel)
September 24, 2021 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by MTE LLC identifying None as corporate parent . (Stuart, Daniel)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INITIAL ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 10/25/2021 at 11:00 AM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara. Report of Parties Planning Meeting deadline 10/13/2021. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 10/13/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 9/16/21. All parties and counsel participating in this phone conference are directed to dial the conference center line 888-363-4749, using access code 8914911 to join the conference. (ss)
September 13, 2021 Filing 9 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 10/4/2021 for Defendant MTE LLC to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 9/13/2021. (lb)
September 13, 2021 Filing 8 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 9/27/2021 for Defendant Michael W. Tyler, Sr. to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 9/13/2021. (lb)
September 13, 2021 Filing 7 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Daniel E. Stuart on behalf of All Defendants (Stuart, Daniel)
September 1, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Cash Today LLC, MoneyBox ATM Nevada LLC upon MTE LLC served on 8/29/2021, answer due 9/20/2021 (Hammeke, Robert)
August 30, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Cash Today LLC, MoneyBox ATM Nevada LLC upon Michael W. Tyler, Sr. served on 8/21/2021, answer due 9/13/2021 (Hammeke, Robert)
August 20, 2021 SUMMONS ISSUED as to MTE LLC and Michael W. Tyler, Sr. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (kas)
August 19, 2021 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cash Today LLC, MoneyBox ATM Nevada LLC identifying None as corporate parent (Hammeke, Robert)
August 19, 2021 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiffs Cash Today LLC, MoneyBox ATM Nevada LLC - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Hammeke, Robert)
August 19, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiffs Cash Today LLC, MoneyBox ATM Nevada LLC. (Hammeke, Robert)
August 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $402, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5566357.), filed by Cash Today LLC, MoneyBox ATM Nevada LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Hammeke, Robert)
August 19, 2021 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Eric F. Melgren and Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (lb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cash Today LLC et al v. MTE LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MTE LLC
Represented By: Charles A. Edgeller
Represented By: Daniel E. Stuart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MTE Platinum Cash LLC
Represented By: Charles A. Edgeller
Represented By: Daniel E. Stuart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael W. Tyler, Sr.
Represented By: Charles A. Edgeller
Represented By: Daniel E. Stuart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cash Today LLC
Represented By: Robert A. Hammeke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MoneyBox ATM Nevada LLC
Represented By: Robert A. Hammeke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?