Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation v. Poulsen et al
Plaintiff: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, as Receiver for Ericson State Bank and Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Defendant: Cory Poulsen, Lyndsy Poulsen, Unknown Spouse, if any, of Cory Poulsen, Unknown Spouse, if any, of Lyndsy Poulsen, Department of Treasury Internal Revenue Service, Mastin Associates, LLC, Bonnie Schwarzenholz, Orilla McCabe, DH Plumbing, LLC, Kansas Department for Children and Families, John Doe (Tenant/Occupant), Jane Doe (Tenant/Occupant), Unknown Spouse, United States Department of The Treasury, Internal Revenue Service, John Doe and Jane Doe
Case Number: 2:2021cv02375
Filed: August 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Gwynne E Birzer
Referring Judge: Toby Crouse
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2021 Filing 21 SUMMONS RETURNED UNEXECUTED by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as to Unknown Spouse(of Cory Poulsen). (Othmer, Aaron)
October 19, 2021 Filing 20 SUMMONS RETURNED UNEXECUTED by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as to Cory Poulsen. (Othmer, Aaron)
October 19, 2021 ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED as to Cory Poulsen. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (lb)
October 19, 2021 ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED as to Unknown Spouse (of Cory Poulsen). (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (lb)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant Lyndsy Poulsen's deadline to answer or otherwise respond is extended up to and including 11/9/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 10/7/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (kf)
October 7, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendant Lyndsy Poulsen (referred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer) (McFarland, Mark)
September 30, 2021 Filing 17 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation upon Orilla McCabe served on 9/22/2021, answer due 10/13/2021 Return of Service of Orilla McCabe (Othmer, Aaron)
September 27, 2021 Filing 16 SUMMONS RETURNED UNEXECUTED -- No Service/Vacant by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as to Jane Doe (Othmer, Aaron) Modified text to reflect summons unexecuted on 9/28/2021 (msb)
September 27, 2021 Filing 15 SUMMONS RETURNED UNEXECUTED -- No Service/Vacant by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as to John Doe(Othmer, Aaron) Modified text to reflect summons unexecuted on 9/28/2021 (msb).
September 21, 2021 Filing 14 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Residential Service to Lyndsy Poulsen by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation upon Unknown Spouse(of Lyndsy Poulsen) served on 9/19/2021, answer due 10/12/2021 Return of Service of Unknown Spouse, if any, of Lyndsy Poulsen (Othmer, Aaron)
September 21, 2021 Filing 13 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation upon Lyndsy Poulsen served on 9/19/2021, answer due 10/12/2021 Return of Service of Lyndsy Poulsen (Othmer, Aaron)
September 20, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation upon DH Plumbing, LLC served on 9/18/2021, answer due 10/12/2021 Return of Service of DH Plumbing; Served to Dustin Herr (Othmer, Aaron)
September 20, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation upon Bonnie Schwarzenholz served on 9/19/2021, answer due 10/12/2021 Return of Service of Bonnie Schwarzenholz (Othmer, Aaron)
September 20, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Jane Weller Assistant Attorney General by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation upon Kansas Department for Children and Families served on 9/17/2021, answer due 10/8/2021 Return of Service of Kansas Department of Children and Families (Othmer, Aaron)
September 16, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Agent by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation upon Kansas Department for Children and Families served on 8/31/2021, answer due 9/21/2021 Return of Service of Kansas Department of Children and Families (Othmer, Aaron)
September 13, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation upon Mastin Associates, LLC served on 8/31/2021, answer due 9/21/2021 Mastin Associates, LLC, The Corporation Company, Inc. 112 SW 7th St., Suite 3C, Topeka, KS 66603 (Othmer, Aaron)
September 13, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Returned Executed -- served by Certified Mail on 9/2/2021 United States Department of The Treasury, Internal Revenue Service served on 9/2/2021, answer due 11/1/2021. Summons served on United States Attorney. IRS 5111 Main Justice Bldg., 10th & Constitution NW, Washington, DC 20530 (Othmer, Aaron)
September 13, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Returned Executed -- served by Certified Mail on 9/1/2021 United States Department of The Treasury, Internal Revenue Service served on 9/1/2021, answer due 11/1/2021. Summons served on United States Attorney. IRS 1111 Constitution Ave, NW Washington, DC 20224 (Othmer, Aaron)
September 13, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Returned Executed -- served by Certified Mail on 8/30/2021 United States Department of The Treasury, Internal Revenue Service served on 8/30/2021, answer due 10/29/2021. Summons served on United States Attorney. Return of Service of Summons of IRS Attorney General, 500 State Ave., Suite 360, Kansas City, KS 66101 (Othmer, Aaron)
September 1, 2021 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Servicemembers Civil Relief Act of 2003 by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. (Othmer, Aaron)
August 27, 2021 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Othmer, Aaron)
August 27, 2021 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Toby Crouse and Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (lb)
August 27, 2021 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Designation of place of trial is missing. The filing party/attorney is directed to correct the deficiency immediately.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (lb)
August 27, 2021 SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Department of The Treasury, Internal Revenue Service, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (issued to Attorney for service) (lb)
August 27, 2021 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bonnie Schwarzenholz, DH Plumbing, LLC, Jane Doe, John Doe, Kansas Department for Children and Families, Mastin Associates, LLC, Orilla McCabe, Cory Poulsen, Lyndsy Poulsen, Unknown Spouse(of Cory Poulsen), Unknown Spouse(of Lyndsy Poulsen). (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (lb)
August 26, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. (Othmer, Aaron)
August 26, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $402, Internet Payment Receipt Number BKSDC-5573866.), filed by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-H)(Othmer, Aaron)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation v. Poulsen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, as Receiver for Ericson State Bank
Represented By: Thomas James Fritzlen, Jr.
Represented By: Aaron Othmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Thomas James Fritzlen, Jr.
Represented By: Aaron Othmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cory Poulsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lyndsy Poulsen
Represented By: Mark E. McFarland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Spouse, if any, of Cory Poulsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Spouse, if any, of Lyndsy Poulsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Treasury Internal Revenue Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mastin Associates, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bonnie Schwarzenholz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orilla McCabe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DH Plumbing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kansas Department for Children and Families
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe (Tenant/Occupant)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe (Tenant/Occupant)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Spouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of The Treasury, Internal Revenue Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?