Countryman-Roswurm v. Wichita State University et al
Plaintiff: Karen Countryman-Roswurm
Defendant: Wichita State University, Richard Muma, Kyoung Lee, Andrew Hippisley, Fred Besthorn and Kaye Monk-Morgan
Case Number: 2:2021cv02489
Filed: October 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Daniel D Crabtree
Referring Judge: James P O'Hara
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting, for good cause shown, #4 motion for extension of time until January 18, 2022, for defendants to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 12/10/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (amh)
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (attorney), by Defendant Wichita State University (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Loring, Martin)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: Case reassigned to District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree for all further proceedings. District Judge Holly L. Teeter no longer assigned to case. Signed by District Judge Holly L. Teeter on 10/26/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(md)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Holly L. Teeter and Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (lb)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Karen Countryman-Roswurm. (Myers, Katherine)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $402, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5619291.), filed by Karen Countryman-Roswurm. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Myers, Katherine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Countryman-Roswurm v. Wichita State University et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Countryman-Roswurm
Represented By: Katherine Elizabeth Myers
Represented By: M. Kathryn Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wichita State University
Represented By: Martin M. Loring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Muma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyoung Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Hippisley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fred Besthorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaye Monk-Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?