Gilmore v. Beveridge et al
Plaintiff: Jennifer Gilmore
Defendant: Joe Beveridge, Brent Kiger and Jim McMullen
Case Number: 2:2022cv02032
Filed: January 23, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Gwynne E Birzer
Referring Judge: Toby Crouse
2 Judge: Rachel E Schwartz
3 Judge: Holly L Teeter
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by Plaintiff Jennifer Gilmore re #12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Attachments: #1 Ex Norton Letter)(Baker, Linus)
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Telephonic Hearing: THIS IS AN OFFICIAL NOTICE FOR THIS HEARING Status Conference is set for 4/15/2022 at 09:45 AM via CONFERENCE LINE 1-877-411-9748 ACCESS CODE 6895973 before District Judge Holly L. Teeter. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (md)
March 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Brent Kiger (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, BOARD POLICY BCBI, #2 Exhibit B, GILMORE SIGNED PUBLIC PARTICIPATION REGISTRATION CARD, #3 Exhibit C, EMAIL CORRESPONDENCE)(Norris, Michael)
March 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Brent Kiger (Norris, Michael)
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Hearing: THIS IS AN OFFICIAL NOTICE FOR THIS HEARING : Motion Hearing re: #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction is set for 4/27/2022 at 09:00 AM in KC Courtroom 463 (HLT) before District Judge Holly L. Teeter. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (md)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer no longer assigned to case. Signed by deputy clerk on 3/7/22. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(cs)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order SUMMONS ISSUED as to Brent Kiger, Jim McMullen. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (lb)
February 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Plaintiff Jennifer Gilmore re: #5 Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Baker, Linus)
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order SUMMONS ISSUED as to Joe Beveridge, in his official capacity. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (lb)
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 RESPONSE by Defendant Joe Beveridge re #5 Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, BOARD POLICY BCBI, #2 Exhibit B, GILMORE SIGNED PUBLIC PARTICIPATION REGISTRATION CARD, #3 Exhibit C, GILMORE EMAILS)(Norris, Michael)
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Joe Beveridge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, BOARD POLICY BCBI, #2 Exhibit B, GILMORE SIGNED PUBLIC PARTICIPATION REGISTRATION CARD)(Norris, Michael)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Jennifer Gilmore (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Ex A & B)(Baker, Linus)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Jennifer Gilmore (Baker, Linus)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: Case reassigned to District Judge Holly L. Teeter for all further proceedings. District Judge Toby Crouse no longer assigned to case. Signed by District Judge Toby Crouse on 1/25/22. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(ta)
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order SUMMONS ISSUED as to Joe Beveridge. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (lb)
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Toby Crouse and Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (lb)
January 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Jennifer Gilmore - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Baker, Linus)
January 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Jennifer Gilmore. (Baker, Linus)
January 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $402, Internet Payment Receipt Number BKSDC-5690881.), filed by Jennifer Gilmore.(Baker, Linus)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gilmore v. Beveridge et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Gilmore
Represented By: Linus L. Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Beveridge
Represented By: Emily Tung
Represented By: Michael G. Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brent Kiger
Represented By: Michael G. Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim McMullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?