Sullivan v. Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc., The et al
Plaintiff: Scott B. Sullivan
Defendant: Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc., The, Carol Morris, Laduska Anne Haney, Zeke Delgado, Mike Fiske, Twin Cities Fire Insurance Company, Berkshire Hathaway, United States Liability Insurance Company, Concentra, Tegumsen Wakwaya, Premier Spine Care, John Ciccarelli, Amy Slesky, St. Luke's South Primary Care and Stephen Nolker
Case Number: 2:2022cv02095
Filed: March 9, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Daniel D Crabtree
Referring Judge: Angel D Mitchell
2 Judge: Kathryn H Vratil
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2022 Filing 32 PRELIMINARY RECORD ON APPEAL transmitted to 10CCA re #31 Amended Notice of Appeal. (Appeal No. 22-3118) (Attachments: #1 Preliminary Packet)(kas)
September 29, 2022 Filing 31 AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #14 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment by Scott B. Sullivan (Sullivan, Scott)
September 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 NOTICE AND ORDER: The Court recognizes that plaintiff filed an amended complaint on July 14, 2022, that purports to add ten defendants and allege additional claims for relief and damages under the "KCPA and common law." (Doc. #22.) In dismissing his original complaint on the recommendation of Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell, the Court did not consider the substance of the amended complaint because plaintiff filed it 49 days after the Court had entered judgment against him. Once judgment is entered, the filing of an amended complaint is not permissible until judgment is set aside or vacated pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 59(e) or 60(b). The Tool Box, Inc. v. Ogden City Corp., 419 F.3d 1084, 1087 (10th Cir. 2005). Because the Court has declined to set aside or vacate the judgment of dismissal, plaintiff's amended complaint is of no moment and the Court will not address it. Signed by District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil on 09/14/2022. Mailed to pro se party Scott B. Sullivan by regular mail. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.)(alh)
September 1, 2022 Filing 29 RECORD ON APPEAL retrieved by 10CCA re #14 Notice of Appeal. (Appeal No. 22-3118) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (kas)
August 30, 2022 Filing 28 DOCKET ANNOTATION: re #27 Supplemental Preliminary Record on Appeal, the incorrect pdf document was attached to the original entry and has been blocked from public view; the correct one has been attached to the entry and to this annotation for noticing purposes only. (kas)
August 30, 2022 Filing 27 SUPPLEMENTAL PRELIMINARY RECORD ON APPEAL transmitted to 10CCA Volume 1 re #14 Notice of Appeal. (Appeal No. 22-3118) (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Packet)(kas) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/30/2022: #2 Corrected Supplemental Preliminary Record Letter) (kas).
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER overruling #13 Motion to Alter Judgment; adopting #23 Report and Recommendations. Signed by District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil on 8/30/2022. Mailed to pro se party Scott B. Sullivan by regular mail. (alh)
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER: Plaintiff's Objection to Denial of Counsel (Doc. #21 ) filed July 14, 2022, is hereby OVERRULED. Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell did not abuse her discretion in denying plaintiff's request for appointment of counsel. The Court overrules plaintiff's objections for substantially the reasons stated in her Order (Doc. #19 ) filed June 30, 2022 and also the reasons well stated by Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz in her order filed August 8, 2022, in a related case, Sullivan v. WorkMarket, Case No. 22-cv-2017-KHV-RES (Doc. 52 ). Signed by District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil on 8/30/2022. Mailed to pro se party Scott B. Sullivan by regular mail. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) (alh)
August 4, 2022 Filing 24 OBJECTION to #23 Report and Recommendations UNDER RULE 59(e) by Plaintiff Scott B. Sullivan(Sullivan, Scott)
July 21, 2022 Filing 23 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending Scott B. Sullivan's MOTION to Amend the Judgment Under Rule 59(e) #13 be denied. Objections to R&R due by 8/4/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on July 21, 2022. Mailed to pro se party Scott B. Sullivan by regular and certified mail; Certified Tracking Number: 7010 2780 0003 1928 0956. (mls)
July 14, 2022 Filing 22 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Scott B. Sullivan.(Sullivan, Scott)
July 14, 2022 Filing 21 Objection to Order of Magistrate Judge re #19 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff Scott B. Sullivan(Sullivan, Scott)
July 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER REFERRING MOTION. The Court hereby refers to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell, for report and recommendation, plaintiff's #13 Motion To Amend The Judgment Under Rule 59(e). Signed by District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil on 7/11/2022. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(as)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER denying #18 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 6/30/2022. (mam)
June 28, 2022 Filing 18 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff Scott B. Sullivan (referred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell) (Sullivan, Scott)
June 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER of 10CCA abating #14 Notice of Appeal filed by Scott B. Sullivan. When the dispositive order is entered by the district court, the clerk of the district court is directed to supplement the preliminary record in accordance with 10th Cir. R. 3.2(B). (Appeal No. 22-3118) (kas)
June 27, 2022 Filing 16 APPEAL DOCKETED in 10CCA on 6/27/2022 and assigned Appeal No. 22-3118 re #14 Notice of Appeal, filed by Scott B. Sullivan. (kas)
June 27, 2022 Filing 15 PRELIMINARY RECORD ON APPEAL transmitted to 10CCA re #14 Notice of Appeal. (Attachments: #1 Preliminary Packet)(kas)
June 27, 2022 APPEAL FEE STATUS: filing fee not paid re: #14 Notice of Appeal, on behalf of Plaintiff Scott B. Sullivan. Filer granted IFP status on 3/17/2022. (THIS IS A TEXT ONLY ENTRY-NO DOCUMENT IS ASSOCIATED WITH THIS TRANSACTION) (kas)
June 25, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #11 Order on Report and Recommendations,, Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, #12 Judgment by Plaintiff Scott B. Sullivan. (Sullivan, Scott)
June 23, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION to Alter Judgment by Plaintiff Scott B. Sullivan (Sullivan, Scott)
May 26, 2022 Filing 12 JUDGMENT. Signed by deputy clerk on 5/26/2022. (hw)
May 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #6 Report and Recommendations; overruling as moot #9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response And request for additional relief filed by Scott B. Sullivan. Plaintiff's complaint is dismissed for failure to state a claim on which relief can be granted. Signed by District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil on 5/26/2022. (hw)
May 4, 2022 Filing 10 OBJECTION to #6 Report and Recommendations by Plaintiff Scott B. Sullivan(Sullivan, Scott)
May 3, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Complaint filed by Scott B. Sullivan And request for additional relief by Plaintiff Scott B. Sullivan (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A with Attachments)(Sullivan, Scott) Modified on 5/3/2022 to remove repeated word (ca).
May 3, 2022 Filing 8 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Plaintiff Scott B. Sullivan is a registered pro se participant with ECF notifications only. (gw) Modified on 5/3/2022; Mr. Sullivan also has e-filing privileges. (gw).
May 3, 2022 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Complaint filed by Scott B. Sullivan And request for additional relief. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(ht)
April 25, 2022 Filing 7 CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT returned re #6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS addressed to Scott B. Sullivan. (kas)
April 20, 2022 Filing 6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Complaint filed by Scott B. Sullivan. Objections to R&R due by 5/4/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 4/20/2022. Mailed to pro se party Scott B. Sullivan by regular and certified mail; Certified Tracking Number: 7018 0680 0001 8173 8790.(kas)
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 plaintiff Scott B. Sullivan's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The U.S. Marshals Service shall withhold service on the defendants until further order of the court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 3/17/22. Mailed to pro se party Scott B. Sullivan by regular mail. (kks)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: Case reassigned to District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil for all further proceedings. District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree no longer assigned to case. Signed by deputy clerk on 03/14/2022. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(mig)
March 9, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis NOTE - Access to document is restricted pursuant to the courts privacy policy by Plaintiff Scott B. Sullivan. (referred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(lb)
March 9, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Scott B. Sullivan. (lb)
March 9, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (No Summons Issued) with trial location of Kansas City, filed by Scott B. Sullivan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(lb)
March 9, 2022 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree and Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (lb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sullivan v. Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc., The et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott B. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc., The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laduska Anne Haney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zeke Delgado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Fiske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Twin Cities Fire Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Berkshire Hathaway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Liability Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Concentra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tegumsen Wakwaya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Premier Spine Care
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Ciccarelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Slesky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Luke's South Primary Care
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Nolker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?