Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. 5th Street Bar & Grill, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Defendant: 5th Street Bar & Grill, LLC doing business as 5th Street Bar & Grill, Bruce A. Mullen and Kyle M. Mullen
Case Number: 2:2022cv02106
Filed: March 16, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Angel D Mitchell
Referring Judge: Holly L Teeter
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 6/1/2022 at 09:00 AM by Telephone ADM - CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749 ACCESS CODE 3977627 before Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell. Rule 26 Planning Conference Deadline 5/11/2022. Report of Parties Planning Meeting deadline 5/25/2022. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 5/25/2022. Proposed Scheduling Order Deadline 5/25/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 4/29/2022. (ht)
April 28, 2022 Filing 14 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Alex Matthews on behalf of 5th Street Bar & Grill, LLC, Bruce A. Mullen, Kyle M. Mullen (Matthews, Alex)
April 28, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE by attorney David S. Brake as to 5th Street Bar & Grill, LLC, Bruce A. Mullen, Kyle M. Mullen (Brazen, Clifford)
April 28, 2022 Filing 12 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Megan J. Redmond on behalf of 5th Street Bar & Grill, LLC, Bruce A. Mullen, Kyle M. Mullen (Redmond, Megan)
April 28, 2022 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by 5th Street Bar & Grill, LLC, Bruce A. Mullen, Kyle M. Mullen identifying None as corporate parent . (Brazen, Clifford)
April 28, 2022 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by 5th Street Bar & Grill, LLC, Bruce A. Mullen, Kyle M. Mullen. (Brazen, Clifford)
April 13, 2022 Filing 9 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 4/28/2022 for Defendants Kyle M. Mullen, Bruce A. Mullen, 5th Street Bar & Grill, LLC to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 4/13/2022. (lb)
April 13, 2022 Filing 8 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by David S. Brake on behalf of All Defendants. (Brake, David)
April 11, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- PERSONAL SERVICE by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. upon Bruce A. Mullen served on 4/5/2022, answer due 4/26/2022 FILED (Bozarth, Raymond)
April 11, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- PERSONAL SERVICE by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. upon Kyle M. Mullen served on 4/5/2022, answer due 4/26/2022 FILED (Bozarth, Raymond)
April 7, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. upon 5th Street Bar & Grill, LLC served on 3/24/2022, answer due 4/14/2022 (Bozarth, Raymond)
March 17, 2022 Filing 4 AO FORM 121: REPORT on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright. (Bozarth, Raymond)
March 17, 2022 SUMMONS ISSUED as to 5th Street Bar & Grill, LLC, Bruce A. Mullen, and Kyle M. Mullen. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (kas)
March 16, 2022 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Bozarth, Raymond)
March 16, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. (Bozarth, Raymond)
March 16, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City (Filing fee $402, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5737354.), filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. (Bozarth, Raymond)
March 16, 2022 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Holly L. Teeter and Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (lb)
March 16, 2022 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - AO 121 form is missing. The filing party/attorney is directed to correct the deficiency immediately.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (lb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. 5th Street Bar & Grill, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Represented By: Raymond Paul Bozarth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 5th Street Bar & Grill, LLC doing business as 5th Street Bar & Grill
Represented By: Alex Matthews
Represented By: Clifford T. Brazen
Represented By: Megan J. Redmond
Represented By: David S. Brake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce A. Mullen
Represented By: Alex Matthews
Represented By: Clifford T. Brazen
Represented By: Megan J. Redmond
Represented By: David S. Brake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyle M. Mullen
Represented By: Alex Matthews
Represented By: Clifford T. Brazen
Represented By: Megan J. Redmond
Represented By: David S. Brake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?