Farr v. Curry et al
Plaintiff: Joan E. Farr
Defendant: Christine Curry, Kansas Legal Services, Inc. and Rebecca Hesse
Case Number: 2:2022cv02120
Filed: March 30, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Daniel D Crabtree
Referring Judge: Kenneth G Gale
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 19, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER. The court grants plaintiff's request (Doc. #24 ) to continue the In Court Hearing set for 5/26/2022 at 11:00AM in KC Courtroom 476 (DDC) before District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree. The court continues the In Court Hearing to 6/30/2022 at 11:00 AM in KC Courtroom 476 (DDC) before District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree. The court will hear plaintiff's Application for Clerk's Entry of Default (Doc. #14 ) and Objection to Designation of Place of Trial/Request for Change of Venue (Doc. #25 ). Plaintiff must present her evidence and reasoning explaining the basis for her accusation raised in both filings that someone has manipulated the filing date of defendant's entry of appearance. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 05/16/2022. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mig)
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 RESPONSE to #26 Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to #25 Plaintiff's Objection to #17 Designation of Place of Trial/Request for Change of Venue by Plaintiff Joan E. Farr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H) (mam)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by Defendants Christine Curry, Rebecca Hesse, Kansas Legal Services, Inc. re #25 MOTION to Change Venue (Finnerty, Timothy)
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Plaintiff's Objection to #17 Designation of Place of Trial/MOTION for Change of Venue by Plaintiff Joan E. Farr. (heo)
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 RESPONSE to #22 Memorandum and Order; MOTION to Continue In Court Hearing (titled, "Plaintiff's Response to the Court's Memorandum and Order/Motion for Extension of Time") by Plaintiff Joan E. Farr (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (heo)
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 REPLY to #14 Application for Clerks Entry of Default by Plaintiff Joan E. Farr. (heo)
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #25 MOTION to Change Venue, #24 MOTION to Continue In Court Hearing. The motions will be resolved by the District Judge. (df)
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. Plaintiff must appear personally for an In Court Hearing set for 5/26/2022 at 11:00 AM in KC Courtroom 476 (DDC) before District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree. Plaintiff must present her evidence and reasoning explaining the basis for her accusation that someone has manipulated the filing date of defendant's entry of appearance. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 5/10/2022. (mam)
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 RESPONSE to #14 Application for Clerks Entry of Default by Defendants Christine Curry, Rebecca Hesse, Kansas Legal Services, Inc.. (Finnerty, Timothy)
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Christine Curry.(Finnerty, Timothy)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 6/16/2022 at 11:00 AM in Wichita Room 403 (KGG) before Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale. Rule 26 Planning Conference Deadline 5/26/2022. Report of Parties Planning Meeting deadline 6/7/2022. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 6/7/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 5/5/22. (df)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Kansas Legal Services, Inc. identifying None as corporate parent . (Finnerty, Timothy)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendants Christine Curry, Rebecca Hesse, Kansas Legal Services, Inc. - trial to be held in Wichita. (Finnerty, Timothy)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Rebecca Hesse, Kansas Legal Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Redacted Final Order for Protection from Stalking)(Finnerty, Timothy)
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER denying #13 Motion to Strike #9 Entry of Appearance. This Order is entered without prejudice as to the currently pending #14 Application for Clerk's Entry of Default Judgment. Issues relating to default will be determined by the District Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 5/4/22. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (df)
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 APPLICATION FOR CLERKS ENTRY OF DEFAULT by Joan E. Farr. (ca)
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION to Strike #9 Entry of Appearance by Plaintiff Joan E. Farr. (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (ca)
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 OBJECTION to #9 Entry of Appearance by Joan E. Farr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(ca)
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Plaintiff Joan E. Farr is a registered pro se participant with ECF notifications only. (gw)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 5/6/2022 for Defendant Christine Curry to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 4/21/2022. Mailed to pro se party Joan E. Farr by regular mail. (lb)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE OF LIMITED ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Timothy J. Finnerty on behalf of Christine Curry. (Finnerty, Timothy) Modified on 4/21/2022 to change the title. (mam)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF DOCKET TEXT MODIFICATION by Deputy Clerk re #9 Entry of Appearance: This is a limited entry of appearance. (mam)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 5/6/2022 for Defendants Rebecca Hesse, Kansas Legal Services, Inc. to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 4/20/2022.Mailed to pro se party Joan E. Farr by regular mail. (lb)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Timothy J. Finnerty on behalf of Rebecca Hesse, Kansas Legal Services, Inc. (Finnerty, Timothy)
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Joan E. Farr of summons and complaint on each of the defendants in this matter. (ca)
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Joan E. Farr upon Rebecca Hesse served on 4/1/2022, answer due 4/22/2022. (ca)
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Joan E. Farr upon Kansas Legal Services, Inc. served on 4/1/2022, answer due 4/22/2022. (ca)
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Joan E. Farr upon Christine Curry served on 4/1/2022, answer due 4/22/2022. (ca)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Joan E. Farr. (lb)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City, filed by Joan E. Farr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (lb)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order SUMMONS ISSUED as to Christine Curry, Rebecca Hesse, Kansas Legal Services, Inc. (Returned to plaintiff for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (lb)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order FILING FEE PAID: in the amount of $ 402, receipt number W4631027831. (lb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Farr v. Curry et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joan E. Farr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christine Curry
Represented By: Timothy J. Finnerty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kansas Legal Services, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy J. Finnerty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca Hesse
Represented By: Timothy J. Finnerty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?