Kincaid v. CBOCS, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Matt Kincaid and Matt C. Kincaid
Defendant: CBOCS, Inc, A Tennessee Corporation d/b/a Cracker Barrel Old Country Store, Inc., Brian Frye, CBOCS, Inc. a Tennessee corporation doing business as Cracker Barrel Old Country Store, Inc. and Brian L. Frye
Case Number: 2:2022cv02144
Filed: April 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Kenneth G Gale
Referring Judge: Eric F Melgren
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Plaintiff Matt C. Kincaid re: #12 Motion to Remand (Accurso, Louis)
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Stay Case. After reviewing the parties' submissions, the Court finds good cause to grant the motion to stay. The scheduling conference is canceled and all deadlines set in the initial order are vacated. The Court will, if necessary, enter a revised initial order after the rulings on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 6) and Plaintiff's Motion to Remand. (Doc. 12). Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 5/16/2022. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (tl)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Defendants CBOCS, Inc., Brian L. Frye re: #6 Motion to Dismiss Party Brian Frye. (NOTE this is a refiling of Doc #15 to file using correct event). (ca)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Joint MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by Defendants CBOCS, Inc., Brian L. Frye re #12 MOTION to Remand (Buchanan, David)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by Defendants CBOCS, Inc., Brian L. Frye re #13 MOTION to Stay Case re #12 MOTION to Remand Suggestions in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Stay (Buchanan, David)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 REPLY to #14 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, #7 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #6 MOTION to Dismiss Party Brian Frye by Defendants CBOCS, Inc., Brian L. Frye. (Buchanan, David)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by Plaintiff Matt C. Kincaid re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Party Brian Frye (Accurso, Louis)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION to Stay Case re #12 MOTION to Remand by Plaintiff Matt C. Kincaid (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Accurso, Louis)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION to Remand by Plaintiff Matt C. Kincaid (Accurso, Louis)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 6/16/2022 at 02:00 PM by Telephone (KGG - CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749 ACCESS CODE 5407703) before Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale. Rule 26 Planning Conference Deadline 5/20/2022. Report of Parties Planning Meeting deadline 6/6/2022. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 6/6/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 4/29/2022. (tl)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by CBOCS, Inc. (Buchanan, David)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by Brian L. Frye.(Buchanan, David)
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Taylor L. Connolly on behalf of All Defendants. (Connolly, Taylor)
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #6 MOTION to Dismiss Party Brian Frye. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge. (df)
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to Chief District Judge Eric F. Melgren and Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (lb)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #6 MOTION to Dismiss Party Brian Frye by Defendants CBOCS, Inc., Brian Frye. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Buchanan, David)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss Party Brian Frye by Defendants CBOCS, Inc., Brian Frye. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Buchanan, David)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Proof of Service by CBOCS, Inc., Brian Frye (Buchanan, David)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CBOCS, Inc. identifying None as corporate parent (Buchanan, David)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendants CBOCS, Inc., Brian Frye - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Buchanan, David)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendants CBOCS, Inc., Brian Frye. (Buchanan, David)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Johnson County, Kansas, case number 22CV01292 Trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $402, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5760455.), filed by Brian Frye, CBOCS, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Buchanan, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kincaid v. CBOCS, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matt Kincaid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matt C. Kincaid
Represented By: Louis C. Accurso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBOCS, Inc, A Tennessee Corporation d/b/a Cracker Barrel Old Country Store, Inc.
Represented By: David R. Buchanan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Frye
Represented By: David R. Buchanan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBOCS, Inc. a Tennessee corporation doing business as Cracker Barrel Old Country Store, Inc.
Represented By: Taylor L. Connolly
Represented By: David R. Buchanan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian L. Frye
Represented By: Taylor L. Connolly
Represented By: David R. Buchanan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?