Merrill v. Napier et al
Plaintiff: A M and Lisa Merrill
Defendant: Monica Naper, Jamie Bolin, The Works Salon, L'Oreal USA Inc, Matrix, Monica Napier, Jamie Bolin doing business as The Works Salon & Boutique and L'Oreal USA, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2022cv02225
Filed: June 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Teresa J James
Referring Judge: Holly L Teeter
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2022 Filing 19 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Reiley E. Pankratz on behalf of L'Oreal USA, Inc.. (Pankratz, Reiley)
July 28, 2022 Filing 18 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME for Defendants L'Oreal USA, Inc., Matrix to answer or otherwise plead. Answer now due 8/16/2022. Signed by deputy clerk on 7/28/2022. (ca) Modified on 7/29/2022 to include new answer date in docket text (kas).
July 28, 2022 Filing 17 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Heather S. Esau Zerger on behalf of L'Oreal USA, Inc.. (Esau Zerger, Heather)
July 27, 2022 NOTICE OF DOCKET TEXT MODIFICATION by Deputy Clerk re #14 Designation of Place of Trial: Defendant Jamie Bolin requests a Fort Scott designation. (mam)
July 26, 2022 Filing 16 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Lisa Merrill upon L'Oreal USA, Inc. served on 7/12/2022, answer due 8/2/2022 (Tinney, Andrew)
July 26, 2022 Filing 15 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Lisa Merrill upon Matrix served on 7/12/2022, answer due 8/2/2022 (Tinney, Andrew)
July 26, 2022 Filing 14 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendant Jamie Bolin - trial to be held in Fort Scott. (Long, Nicole) Modified on 7/27/2022, location changed from KC to Fort Scott. (mam)
July 26, 2022 Filing 13 DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY by Jamie Bolin. (Long, Nicole)
July 26, 2022 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint by Jamie Bolin.(Long, Nicole)
July 26, 2022 Filing 11 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Nicole T. Long on behalf of Jamie Bolin (Long, Nicole)
July 13, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of DEFENDANT MONICA NAPIER'S REQUEST FOR PLACE OF TRIAL TO BE FORT SCOTT, KANSAS by Monica Napier (Weakley, Kevin)
July 13, 2022 Filing 9 DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY by Monica Napier. (Weakley, Kevin)
July 13, 2022 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Monica Napier.(Weakley, Kevin)
July 12, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Lisa Merrill upon Monica Napier served on 7/5/2022, answer due 7/26/2022 Served by Sheriff (Tinney, Andrew)
July 12, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Lisa Merrill upon Jamie Bolin served on 7/5/2022, answer due 7/26/2022 Served by Sheriff (Tinney, Andrew)
June 29, 2022 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jamie Bolin, L'Oreal USA, Inc., Matrix, Monica Napier. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (lb)
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER finding moot #4 Motion for Appointment of Next Friend filed by Plaintiff Lisa Merrill, natural mother of A.M., a minor. Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 17 does not require Plaintiff to obtain an order appointing her as next friend. She has properly identified her capacity in the #1 Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 6/22/2022. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ts)
June 21, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION for Order For Appointment of Next Friend by Plaintiff Lisa Merrill (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent to Serve as Next Friend)(Tinney, Andrew)
June 20, 2022 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Lisa Merrill. (Tinney, Andrew)
June 16, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiffs Lisa Merrill. (Tinney, Andrew)
June 16, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $402, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5803632.), filed by Lisa Merrill.(Tinney, Andrew)
June 16, 2022 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Civil cover sheet is missing signature. The filing attorney is directed to correct the deficiency immediately.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (lb)
June 16, 2022 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Holly L. Teeter and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (lb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Merrill v. Napier et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A M
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Merrill
Represented By: Charles Sticklen
Represented By: Sarah Sticklen
Represented By: Andrew Keegan Tinney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monica Naper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamie Bolin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Works Salon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L'Oreal USA Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matrix
Represented By: Heather S. Esau Zerger
Represented By: Reiley E. Pankratz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monica Napier
Represented By: Kathryn M. O'Shea
Represented By: Kevin D. Weakley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamie Bolin doing business as The Works Salon & Boutique
Represented By: John G. Schultz
Represented By: Nicole T. Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L'Oreal USA, Inc.
Represented By: Heather S. Esau Zerger
Represented By: Reiley E. Pankratz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?