Millard v. Olathe Health System, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jamy Millard
Defendant: Olathe Health System, Inc., Fusion Medical Staffing LLC and Benjamin M. Chen
Case Number: 2:2022cv02281
Filed: July 19, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: John W Broomes
Referring Judge: Kenneth G Gale
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Tort/Non-Motor Vehicle
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER, granting as unopposed, #14 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant Olathe Health System, Inc. has until 9/29/2022 to answer or otherwise plead, and to file its Corporate Disclosure Statement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 9/16/2022. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (tl)
September 15, 2022 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for extension of time by Defendant Olathe Health System, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Rickley, Kathryn)
September 15, 2022 Filing 13 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Kathryn J. Starrett Rickley on behalf of Olathe Health System, Inc. (Rickley, Kathryn)
September 15, 2022 Filing 12 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Mitchell E. Wood on behalf of Olathe Health System, Inc. (Wood, Mitchell)
September 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER, granting as unopposed, #10 Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. Defendant Fusion Medical Staffing LLC has until 9/21/2022 to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 9/8/2022. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (tl)
September 7, 2022 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant Fusion Medical Staffing LLC (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Goheen, Gregory)
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER re #8 Status Report filed by Jamy Millard. The Court has reviewed the response to the show cause order entered on August 2, 2022, and has examined whether diversity jurisdiction has been sufficiently plead. The Court is satisfied that there is diversity of citizenship and subject-matter jurisdiction exists. As such, the Court is satisfied with the response. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 8/31/2022. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (tl)
August 31, 2022 Filing 8 STATUS REPORT and Response to Show Cause Order by Jamy Millard. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Lewis Galloway)(Galloway, Lewis)
August 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER, granting as unopposed, #6 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. Defendant Fusion Medical Staffing LLC has until 9/7/2022 to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 8/25/2022. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (tl)
August 24, 2022 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant Fusion Medical Staffing LLC (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Goheen, Gregory)
August 10, 2022 Filing 5 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 8/24/2022 for Defendant Fusion Medical Staffing LLC to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 8/10/2022. (jsh)
August 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE regarding diversity jurisdiction. Show Cause Response due by 9/2/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 8/2/22. (df)
July 22, 2022 Filing 3 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Jamy Millard. (Galloway, Lewis)
July 19, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Jamy Millard. (Galloway, Lewis)
July 19, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $402, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5826725.), filed by Jamy Millard.(Galloway, Lewis)
July 19, 2022 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Benjamin M. Chen, Fusion Medical Staffing LLC, Olathe Health System, Inc. (issued to Attorney for service). (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (jk)
July 19, 2022 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge John W. Broomes and Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Millard v. Olathe Health System, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamy Millard
Represented By: Lewis M. Galloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Olathe Health System, Inc.
Represented By: Kathryn J. Starrett Rickley
Represented By: Mitchell E. Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fusion Medical Staffing LLC
Represented By: Gregory P. Goheen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin M. Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?