Gragg v. Veritas H.H.S. et al
Plaintiff: Todd Gragg
Defendant: Veritas H.H.S., Maximus K.C., Derek Schmidt, Wyandotte County, Kansas District Court, James P. Blomberg, Daniel Soptic, William Mahoney and Laura Kelly
Case Number: 2:2022cv02292
Filed: July 26, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: John W Broomes
Referring Judge: Teresa J James
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2022 Filing 28 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Joni S. Cole on behalf of Daniel Soptic. (Cole, Joni)
September 22, 2022 Filing 27 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Defendant Veritas H.H.S. re: #18 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Valenti, Anthony)
September 21, 2022 Filing 26 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Defendant Maximus K.C. re: #22 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction (Delgado, Sergio)
September 20, 2022 Filing 25 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Defendants James P. Blomberg, Laura Kelly, William Mahoney, Derek Schmidt, Wyandotte County, Kansas District Court re: #15 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Phillips, Stephen)
September 20, 2022 Filing 24 MOTION to Stay Discovery by Defendant Maximus K.C. (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Delgado, Sergio)
September 20, 2022 Filing 23 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #22 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant Maximus K.C.(Delgado, Sergio)
September 20, 2022 Filing 22 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ( Response deadline 10/11/2022) by Defendant Maximus K.C. (Delgado, Sergio)
September 19, 2022 Filing 21 RESPONSE (titled, Notice of Motion Objection Demand Dismissal on the Grounds That Statements of Counsel in Their Briefs or Argument While Enlightening to the Court Are Not Sufficient for Purposes of Granting a Motion to Dismiss Take Judicial Notice Under Federal Rule 201(c)(2) of Evidence of an Adjudicated Fact Trinsey v Pagliaro, 229 F. Supp. 647 - Dist. Court, ED Pennsylvania 1964) by Plaintiff Todd Gragg re #15 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #18 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. (heo)
September 14, 2022 Filing 20 MOTION to Stay Discovery by Defendant Veritas H.H.S. (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Valenti, Anthony)
September 14, 2022 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #18 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Veritas H.H.S.(Valenti, Anthony)
September 14, 2022 Filing 18 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Veritas H.H.S. (Valenti, Anthony)
September 9, 2022 Filing 17 MOTION to Stay Discovery by Defendants James P. Blomberg, Laura Kelly, William Mahoney, Derek Schmidt, Wyandotte County, Kansas District Court (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Phillips, Stephen)
September 9, 2022 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants James P. Blomberg, Laura Kelly, William Mahoney, Derek Schmidt, Wyandotte County, Kansas District Court(Phillips, Stephen)
September 9, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants James P. Blomberg, Laura Kelly, William Mahoney, Derek Schmidt, Wyandotte County, Kansas District Court (Phillips, Stephen)
September 7, 2022 Filing 14 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 9/21/2022 for Defendant Maximus K.C. to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 9/7/2022. Mailed to pro se party Todd Gragg by regular mail. (jsh)
September 7, 2022 Filing 13 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Sergio Delgado on behalf of Maximus K.C.. (Delgado, Sergio)
September 6, 2022 Filing 12 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Todd Gragg upon Wyandotte County, Kansas District Court (Court Clerk) served on 8/22/2022, answer due 9/28/2022. (jsh)
September 6, 2022 Filing 11 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Todd Gragg upon William Mahoney served on 8/22/2022, answer due 9/28/2022. (jsh)
September 6, 2022 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Todd Gragg upon Daniel Soptic served on 8/22/2022, answer due 9/26/2022. (jsh)
September 6, 2022 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Todd Gragg upon Maximus K.C. served on 8/24/2022, answer due 9/14/2022. (jsh)
September 6, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Todd Gragg upon James P. Blomberg served on 8/22/2022, answer due 9/28/2022. (jsh)
September 6, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Todd Gragg upon Veritas H.H.S. served on 8/22/2022, answer due 9/27/2022. (jsh)
September 6, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Todd Gragg upon Derek Schmidt served on 8/24/2022, answer due 9/28/2022. (jsh)
September 2, 2022 Filing 5 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 9/26/2022 for Defendant Daniel Soptic to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 9/2/2022. Mailed to pro se plaintiff Todd Gragg at 621 Vale Street, Kansas City, KS 66103 by regular mail. (ada) Modified on 9/2/2022 (ada). Modified on 9/2/2022 (ada).
August 30, 2022 Filing 4 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 9/27/2022 for Defendant Veritas H.H.S. to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 8/30/2022. Mailed to pro se Plaintiff Todd Gragg at 621 Vale Street, Kansas City, KS 66103 by regular mail. (jk)
August 25, 2022 Filing 3 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 9/28/2022 for Defendants William Mahoney, James P. Blomberg, Derek Schmidt, Laura Kelly, Wyandotte County, Kansas District Court to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 8/25/2022. Mailed to pro se Plaintiff Todd Gragg at 621 Vale Street, Kansas City, KS 66103 by regular mail. (jk)
July 26, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Todd Gragg. (jsh)
July 26, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Summons Issued) with trial location of Kansas City, filed by Todd Gragg. (jsh)
July 26, 2022 SUMMONS ISSUED as to James P. Blomberg, Laura Kelly, William Mahoney, Maximus K.C., Derek Schmidt, Daniel Soptic, Veritas H.H.S., Wyandotte County, Kansas District Court. (issued to Returned to plaintiff for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (jsh)
July 26, 2022 FILING FEE PAID: in the amount of $ 402, receipt number K4631060874. (jsh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gragg v. Veritas H.H.S. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd Gragg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Veritas H.H.S.
Represented By: Anthony E. Valenti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maximus K.C.
Represented By: Sergio Delgado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derek Schmidt
Represented By: Stephen O. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyandotte County, Kansas District Court
Represented By: Stephen O. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James P. Blomberg
Represented By: Stephen O. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Soptic
Represented By: Joni S. Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Mahoney
Represented By: Stephen O. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Kelly
Represented By: Stephen O. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?