Woodside Village North, LLC et al v. Allianz Global Corporate & Specialty
Plaintiff: Woodside Village North, LLC and Woodside Redevelopment, LLC
Defendant: Allianz Global Corporate & Specialty and AGCS Marine Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2022cv02295
Filed: July 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Daniel D Crabtree
Referring Judge: Kenneth G Gale
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 10/24/2022. (tl)
October 21, 2022 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Initial Rule 26(A)(1) Disclosures by AGCS Marine Insurance Company. (Crawford, William)
October 21, 2022 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Rule 26(A)(1) Initial Disclosures by Woodside Redevelopment, LLC, Woodside Village North, LLC. (Simon, Amber)
October 17, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of Rescheduled Hearing: THIS IS AN OFFICIAL NOTICE FOR THIS HEARING (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) Scheduling Conference is reset for 11/7/2022 at 10:00 AM via Telephone (KGG - CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749 ACCESS CODE 5407703) before Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale. (tl)
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 11/2/2022 at 10:00 AM via Telephone (KGG - CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749 ACCESS CODE 5407703) before Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale. Rule 26 Planning Conference Deadline 10/12/2022. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 10/21/2022. Proposed Scheduling Order Deadline 10/21/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 9/21/2022. (tl)
September 21, 2022 Filing 13 ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint, by AGCS Marine Insurance Company, Allianz Global Corporate & Specialty.(Crawford, William)
September 21, 2022 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by AGCS Marine Insurance Company identifying Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company as corporate parent (Crawford, William)
August 31, 2022 Filing 11 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Cary W. Miller on behalf of AGCS Marine Insurance Company. (Miller, Cary)
August 31, 2022 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Commissioner's Proof of Service by Woodside Redevelopment, LLC, Woodside Village North, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Commissioner's Proof of Service)(Weixelman, Lisa)
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER, granting as unopposed, #8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #5 Amended Complaint. Defendant AGCS Marine Insurance Company has until 9/21/2022 to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 8/30/2022. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (tl)
August 30, 2022 Filing 8 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #5 Amended Complaint by Defendant AGCS Marine Insurance Company. (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Crawford, William)
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER on #4 Response to Show Cause Order. Plaintiffs have carried their burden to establish that federal diversity jurisdiction existsunder 28 U.S.C. 1332. The court concludes plaintiffs have shown good cause why the court should not dismiss this action for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 8/12/2022. (mam)
August 8, 2022 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Woodside Redevelopment, LLC, Woodside Village North, LLC identifying NONE as corporate parent. (Weixelman, Lisa)
August 8, 2022 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against AGCS Marine Insurance Company, filed by Woodside Village North, LLC, Woodside Redevelopment, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit A - 14-16 Builders Risk, #3 Exhibit B - Add Named Insured, #4 Exhibit C - COC Add'l Named Insured, #5 Exhibit D - Amend Location, #6 Exhibit E - Extension Endt #10, #7 Exhibit F - Extension Endt #12)(Weixelman, Lisa)
August 8, 2022 Filing 4 RESPONSE re #3 Order to Show Cause by Plaintiffs Woodside Village North, LLC, Woodside Redevelopment, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Joshua White)(Weixelman, Lisa)
August 8, 2022 SUMMONS ISSUED as to AGCS Marine Insurance Company. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (jsh) Modified title on 8/10/2022. (jsh)
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Plaintiffs Woodside Village North, LLC and Woodside Redevelopment, LLC must show cause within seven days why the court should not dismiss this action for lack of subject matter jurisdiction under 28 U.S.C. 1332. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 8/1/2022. (ca)
July 28, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiffs Woodside Redevelopment LLC, Woodside Village North LLC. (Weixelman, Lisa)
July 28, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City (Filing fee $402, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5832949.), filed by Woodside Village North LLC, Woodside Redevelopment LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit A - 14-16 Builders Risk, #3 Exhibit B - Add Named Insured, #4 Exhibit C - COC Add'l Named Insured, #5 Exhibit D - Amend Location, #6 Exhibit E - Extension Endt #10, #7 Exhibit F - Extension Endt #12)(Weixelman, Lisa)
July 28, 2022 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree and Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (heo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woodside Village North, LLC et al v. Allianz Global Corporate & Specialty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Woodside Village North, LLC
Represented By: Amber J. Simon
Represented By: Lisa A. Weixelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Woodside Redevelopment, LLC
Represented By: Amber J. Simon
Represented By: Lisa A. Weixelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allianz Global Corporate & Specialty
Represented By: William Clayton Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AGCS Marine Insurance Company
Represented By: Cary W. Miller
Represented By: William Clayton Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?