Hall v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Plaintiff: Gilbert N. Hall and Gilbert R. Hall
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Interested Party: Social Security Regional Administrator
Case Number: 2:2022cv02327
Filed: August 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: John W Lungstrum
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 416 Denial of Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2022 Filing 7 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Marc Thayne Warner on behalf of Social Security Administration, Commissioner of (Warner, Marc)
September 7, 2022 Filing 6 Summons Returned Executed -- served by certified mail on 8/29/2022 Summons served on United States Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit in reference to Summons served on US Attorney General)(Cox, Leland)
August 30, 2022 DOCKET ANNOTATION: #5 Return of Service of Summons Executed as to USA, filed by Gilbert R. Hall: this event was original filed at DE #3 using an incorrect event. The answer due date for Commissioner of Social Security Administration is 10/21/2022. (jal)
August 29, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Office of the Regional Counsel served by certified mail on 8/25/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit proof of service)(Cox, Leland) Modified on 8/30/2022 to update docket text (jal).
August 24, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Returned Executed -- served by Personal Service on 8/22/2022. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of served on 8/22/2022, answer due 10/21/2022. Summons served on United States Attorney. **This is a duplicate filing of Docket Entry #3 and is being filed for administrative purposes only.** (jal)
August 24, 2022 Filing 3 **DISREGARD - SEE DE #5 FOR CORRECT FILING** US Attorney for KS SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- certified mail by Gilbert R. Hall upon US Attorney Kansas served on 8/22/2022, answer due 9/12/2022 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit proof of service)(Cox, Leland) Modified on 8/30/2022 (jal).
August 18, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Gilbert N. Hall. (Cox, Leland)
August 18, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City, filed by Gilbert N. Hall.(Cox, Leland)
August 18, 2022 FILING FEE PAID: in the amount of $ 402.00, receipt number K4631060923. (jsh)
August 18, 2022 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge John W. Lungstrum for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jsh)
August 18, 2022 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Social Security Administration, Commissioner of, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (issued to Attorney for service) (jsh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hall v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gilbert N. Hall
Represented By: Leland E. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gilbert R. Hall
Represented By: Leland E. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Represented By: Marc Thayne Warner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Regional Administrator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?