Davis v. Males et al
Plaintiff: Ronald J. Davis, Sr.
Defendant: Daniel H. Lampson, Lt. Craig Males, Off. Jesse Moley, Terrance Gaston, Chief Kwim Bromley, Larry Markle, Lisa Montgomery, Heath Lampson and Montgomery County, Kansas
Case Number: 2:2022cv02330
Filed: August 19, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Kansas City Office
Presiding Judge: Gwynne E Birzer
Referring Judge: Teresa J James
2 Judge: Holly L Teeter
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2022 Filing 15 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail (USM-285) by Ronald J. Davis, Sr upon Montgomery County, Kansas served on 10/7/2022, answer due 10/28/2022. Mailed to pro se party Ronald J. Davis, Sr. by regular mail. (jsh)
October 14, 2022 Filing 14 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail (USM-285) by Ronald J. Davis, Sr upon Jesse Moley served on 10/6/2022, answer due 10/27/2022. Mailed to pro se party Ronald J. Davis, Sr. by regular mail. (jsh)
October 14, 2022 Filing 13 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail (USM-285) by Ronald J. Davis, Sr upon Larry Markle served on 10/6/2022, answer due 10/27/2022. Mailed to pro se party Ronald J. Davis, Sr. by regular mail. (jsh)
October 14, 2022 Filing 12 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail (USM-285) by Ronald J. Davis, Sr upon Craig Males served on 10/6/2022, answer due 10/27/2022. Mailed to pro se party Ronald J. Davis, Sr. by regular mail. (jsh)
October 14, 2022 Filing 11 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail (USM-285) by Ronald J. Davis, Sr upon Lisa Montgomery served on 10/6/2022, answer due 10/27/2022. Mailed to pro se party Ronald J. Davis, Sr. by regular mail. (jsh)
October 14, 2022 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail (USM-285) by Ronald J. Davis, Sr upon Daniel H. Lampson served on 10/6/2022, answer due 10/27/2022. Mailed to pro se party Ronald J. Davis, Sr. by regular mail. (jsh)
October 14, 2022 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail (USM-285) by Ronald J. Davis, Sr upon Montgomery County, Kansas (Robert Bever, County Commissioner) served on 10/6/2022, answer due 10/27/2022. Mailed to pro se party Ronald J. Davis, Sr. by regular mail. (jsh)
October 14, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail (USM-285) by Ronald J. Davis, Sr upon Kwim Bromley served on 10/5/2022, answer due 10/26/2022. Mailed to pro se party Ronald J. Davis, Sr. by regular mail. (jsh)
September 30, 2022 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kwim Bromley, Terrance Gaston, Daniel H. Lampson, Craig Males, Larry Markle, Jesse Moley, Lisa Montgomery, Montgomery County, Kansas, and County Commissioner for Montgomery County, Kansas. (issued to US Marshal for service) Copy mailed to pro se Plaintiff Ronald J. Davis, Sr. at 101 Edgewood Dr., Coffeyville, KS 67337 by regular mail. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (jk)
September 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(d). The Clerk shall issue summons for each Defendant listed in Plaintiff's Complaint. Service of the Summons and Complaint shall be made by a United States Marshal or Deputy Marshal or by a person specially appointed pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(c)(3). Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 9/29/2022.A copy of the Order was mailed to pro se Plaintiff by regular mail. (byk)
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #3 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Service of Summons and Complaint is withheld pending further order of the Court. A separate Order to Show Cause or Report and Recommendation will be entered by the Court after it completes its review of Plaintiff's Complaint. A copy of this Order will be mailed to pro se party Plaintiff by regular mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 8/24/2022. (byk)
August 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer no longer assigned to case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 8/23/22. Mailed to pro se party Ronald J. Davis, Sr., 101 Edgewood Dr., Coffeyville, KS 67337 by regular mail (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(spa)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: Case reassigned to District Judge Holly L. Teeter for all further proceedings. Chief District Judge Eric F. Melgren no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 8/19/2022.Mailed to pro se party Ronald J. Davis, Sr. by regular mail. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(cm)
August 19, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Ronald J. Davis, Sr. (NOTE - Access to document is restricted pursuant to the courts privacy policy) (referred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Financial Status) (jsh)
August 19, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Ronald J. Davis, Sr. (jsh)
August 19, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (No Summons Issued) with trial location of Kansas City, filed by Ronald J. Davis, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (jsh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Males et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel H. Lampson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Craig Males
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Off. Jesse Moley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terrance Gaston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chief Kwim Bromley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Markle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heath Lampson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montgomery County, Kansas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald J. Davis, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?