Roadbuilders Machinery Supply Co., Inc. v. Sandvik Mining and Construction USA, LLC
Plaintiff: Roadbuilders Machinery Supply Co., Inc.
Defendant: Sandvik Mining and Construction USA, LLC
Case Number: 2:2022cv02331
Filed: August 19, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Teresa J James
Referring Judge: Holly L Teeter
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 23, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 11/22/2022 at 11:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James. Participants must dial CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749 and enter ACCESS CODE 4901386 to join the conference. Rule 26 Planning Conference deadline 11/4/2022. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures and Proposed Scheduling Order deadline 11/14/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 10/14/2022. (byk)
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Sandvik Mining and Construction USA, LLC identifying Sandvik, Inc. as corporate parent (Webb, Danne)
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint by Sandvik Mining and Construction USA, LLC.(Webb, Danne)
September 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 ] Defendant's Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead. Defendant Sandvik Mining and Construction USA, LLC is hereby granted an extension of time, up to and including 10/14/2022, in which to answer or otherwise respond to #1 Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 9/29/2022. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (byk)
September 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant Sandvik Mining and Construction USA, LLC (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Webb, Danne)
September 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #9 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead. Defendant Sandvik Mining and Construction USA, LLC is hereby granted an extension of time, up to and including 9/30/2022, in which to answer or otherwise respond to #1 Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 9/14/2022. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (byk)
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jeffrey L. Mapen for Sandvik Mining and Construction USA, LLC pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only; granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Amy B. Cheng for Sandvik Mining and Construction USA, LLC pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 9/13/2022. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION for attorney Amy B. Cheng to appear pro hac vice (Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5866336.) by Defendant Sandvik Mining and Construction USA, LLC. (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration in Support of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #2 ECF Registration Form Pro Hac Vice Electronic Filing)(Webb, Danne)
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION for attorney Jeffrey L. Mapen to appear pro hac vice (Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5866322.) by Defendant Sandvik Mining and Construction USA, LLC. (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration in Support of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #2 ECF Registration Form Pro Hac Vice Electronic Filing)(Webb, Danne)
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Defendant Sandvik Mining and Construction USA, LLC. (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Webb, Danne)
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Danne Wayne Webb on behalf of Sandvik Mining and Construction USA, LLC (Webb, Danne)
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER. The Court entered a show-cause order regarding diversity jurisdiction, noting that it was unable to determine what type of business entity Defendant is or its citizenship. Doc. #4 . Plaintiff responded, noting both Defendant's principal place of business, and that its sole member is a Swedish conglomerate. Doc. #5 . Although Plaintiff's response does not definitively clarify the issues raised in the show-cause order, the Court concludes at this time and in this posture that diversity has been pleaded and will deem the show-cause order satisfied. This order is without prejudice to any defenses Defendant may later assert. Signed by District Judge Holly L. Teeter on 8/30/2022. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(md)
August 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Roadbuilders Machinery Supply Co., Inc. identifying None as corporate parent (Healy, Michael)
August 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RESPONSE re #4 Order to Show Cause by Plaintiff Roadbuilders Machinery Supply Co., Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Sandvik Dealer Agreement 3-19-1999, #2 Exhibit Sandvik Annual Report)(Healy, Michael) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/26/2022: #3 Corrected Exhibit Sandvik Annual Report) (mam).
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 9/6/2022. Signed by District Judge Holly L. Teeter on 8/22/2022. (kas)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Roadbuilders Machinery Supply Co., Inc. - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Healy, Michael)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Roadbuilders Machinery Supply Co., Inc.. (Healy, Michael)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $402, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5849173.), filed by Roadbuilders Machinery Supply Co., Inc..(Healy, Michael)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Holly L. Teeter and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order SUMMONS ISSUED as to Sandvik Mining and Construction USA, LLC (issued to Attorney for service). (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (jk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roadbuilders Machinery Supply Co., Inc. v. Sandvik Mining and Construction USA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roadbuilders Machinery Supply Co., Inc.
Represented By: Michael P. Healy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandvik Mining and Construction USA, LLC
Represented By: Amy B. Cheng
Represented By: Danne Wayne Webb
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Mapen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?