Clear Spring Property & Casualty Company v. Arch Nemesis, LLC
Plaintiff: Clear Spring Property & Casualty Company
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Arch Nemesis, LLC
3Rd Party Defendant: Concept Special Risks Ltd., Off the Hook Yacht Sales NC, LLC, Off the Hook Yacht Sales, LLC and West Coast Real Estate & Insurance, Inc. doing business as West Coast Global Insurance Services
Case Number: 2:2022cv02435
Filed: October 24, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Daniel D Crabtree
Referring Judge: Teresa J James
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 Declaratory Judgement (Insurance)
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2022 Opinion or Order SUMMONS ISSUED re #11 Third-Party Complaint as to Concept Special Risks Ltd., Off the Hook Yacht Sales NC, LLC, Off the Hook Yacht Sales, LLC, and West Coast Real Estate & Insurance d/b/a West Coast Global Insurance Services. (issued to Attorney for service) Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge Form provided to counsel for service with complaint. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (kmc)
December 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Concept Special Risks Ltd., Off the Hook Yacht Sales NC, LLC, Off the Hook Yacht Sales, LLC and West Coast Real Estate & Insurance, Inc., filed by Arch Nemesis, LLC. (NOTE -- This is a duplicate of #11 , re-filed for administrative purposes.) (mam)
December 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint AND COUNTERCLAIMS against Clear Spring Property & Casualty Company by Arch Nemesis, LLC. (Kaiser, Clayton) Modified on 12/20/2022, see #12 for the duplicate filing to account for the Third Party Complaint. (mam)
December 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Clear Spring Property & Casualty Company of Arch Nemesis LLC (Stanley, Jordon)
December 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Defendant Arch Nemesis LLC's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant Arch Nemesis LLC is hereby granted an extension until December 19, 2022, in which to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's #1 Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 12/7/2022. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ts)
December 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #1 Complaint (attorney),, by Defendant Arch Nemesis, LLC (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Kaiser, Clayton)
November 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 12/12/2022 for Defendant Arch Nemesis, LLC to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 11/17/2022. (kmc)
November 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Clayton J. Kaiser on behalf of Arch Nemesis, LLC (Kaiser, Clayton)
November 2, 2022 Opinion or Order SUMMONS ISSUED as to Arch Nemesis, LLC. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry) (kmc)
October 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Appointment of a Special Process Server. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 10/26/2022. (ts)
October 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION for Order Appointing Special Process Server by Plaintiff Clear Spring Property & Casualty Company (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Stanley, Jordon)
October 25, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (kmc)
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Clear Spring Property & Casualty Company identifying Group One Thousand One, LLC as corporate parent (Stanley, Jordon)
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Clear Spring Property & Casualty Company - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Stanley, Jordon)
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $402, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5898503.), filed by Clear Spring Property & Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Policy, #2 Exhibit Ex B - Ex. B- Stahlberg Survey, #3 Exhibit Ex. C- Letter of Compliance, #4 Exhibit Ex. D- Captain Charter Supplementary Sheet, #5 Exhibit Ex. E- ROR, #6 Exhibit Ex. F- Correspondence from Insured, #7 Exhibit Ex. G - Statement, #8 Exhibit Ex. H - Denial Letter, #9 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)(Stanley, Jordon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clear Spring Property & Casualty Company v. Arch Nemesis, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clear Spring Property & Casualty Company
Represented By: Jordon T. Stanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Arch Nemesis, LLC
Represented By: Clayton J. Kaiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Concept Special Risks Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Off the Hook Yacht Sales NC, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Off the Hook Yacht Sales, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: West Coast Real Estate & Insurance, Inc. doing business as West Coast Global Insurance Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?