Uhlig, LLC v. PropLogix, LLC
Plaintiff: Uhlig, LLC doing business as CondoCerts doing business as WelcomeLink
Defendant: PropLogix, LLC
Case Number: 2:2022cv02475
Filed: November 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Angel D Mitchell
Referring Judge: Kathryn H Vratil
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2023 Filing 23 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #22 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint re #12 Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Uhlig, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Second Amended Complaint - clean copy), #2 Exhibit 2 (redlined Second Amended Complaint))(Cox, Juliet)
January 17, 2023 Filing 22 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint re #12 Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Uhlig, LLC. (referred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell) (Cox, Juliet)
January 17, 2023 Filing 21 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Uhlig, LLC re #15 Motion to Dismiss Count V of the Amended Complaint. (Cox, Juliet)
January 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #17 , #18 and #19 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice of David H. Wallace, Cary Matthew Snyder and Philip R. Bautista for PropLogix, LLC pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 1/6/2023. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mam)
January 6, 2023 Filing 19 MOTION for attorney Philip R. Bautista to appear pro hac vice (Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5953476.) by Defendant PropLogix, LLC. (referred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #2 ECF Registration Form)(Torline, Stephen)
January 6, 2023 Filing 18 MOTION for attorney Cary M. Snyder to appear pro hac vice (Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5953470.) by Defendant PropLogix, LLC. (referred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #2 ECF Registration Form)(Torline, Stephen)
January 6, 2023 Filing 17 MOTION for attorney David H. Wallace to appear pro hac vice (Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5953458.) by Defendant PropLogix, LLC. (referred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #2 ECF Registration Form)(Torline, Stephen)
December 30, 2022 Filing 16 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Jennifer Helen Salva on behalf of PropLogix, LLC. (Salva, Jennifer)
December 27, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss Count V of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Defendant PropLogix, LLC. (Torline, Stephen)
December 27, 2022 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by PropLogix, LLC identifying None as corporate parent. (Torline, Stephen)
December 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: The court ordered plaintiff to show cause why the court should not recommend that the district judge dismiss this case for lack of subject matter jurisdiction--namely, because plaintiff did not adequately plead complete diversity of citizenship between the parties. (ECF 6.) Plaintiff has now responded to the order to show cause (ECF 11) and filed an amended complaint (ECF 12). After reviewing the response and the amended complaint, the court is satisfied that plaintiff has sufficiently alleged facts that the parties are completely diverse for subject matter jurisdiction purposes under 28 U.S.C. 1332. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 12/14/2022. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(ht)
December 13, 2022 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against PropLogix, LLC, filed by Uhlig, LLC.(Cox, Juliet)
December 13, 2022 Filing 11 RESPONSE re #6 Order to Show Cause by Plaintiff Uhlig, LLC. (Cox, Juliet)
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Heather N. Tilley for Uhlig, LLC pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 12/2/2022. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ht)
December 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Thomas William Snyder for Uhlig, LLC pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 12/1/2022. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ht)
December 1, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION for attorney Heather N. Tilley to appear pro hac vice (Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5930288.) by Plaintiff Uhlig, LLC. (referred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell) (Attachments: #1 ECF Registration Form)(Cox, Juliet)
December 1, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION for attorney Thomas W. Snyder to appear pro hac vice (Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5930274.) by Plaintiff Uhlig, LLC. (referred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell) (Attachments: #1 ECF Registration Form)(Cox, Juliet)
November 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. The Court orders plaintiff to show cause in writing by December 13, 2022, why the Court should not recommend that the district judge dismiss this case without prejudice for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 11/29/2022. (kas)
November 28, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- personal service by Uhlig, LLC upon PropLogix, LLC served on 11/28/2022, answer due 12/19/2022. (Cox, Juliet)
November 23, 2022 SUMMONS ISSUED as to PropLogix, LLC. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry) (kmc)
November 21, 2022 Filing 4 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Uhlig, LLC - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Cox, Juliet)
November 21, 2022 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Uhlig, LLC identifying None as corporate parent. (Cox, Juliet)
November 21, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Uhlig, LLC. (Cox, Juliet)
November 21, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City (Filing fee $402, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5922332.), filed by Uhlig, LLC. (Cox, Juliet)
November 21, 2022 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Designation of place of trial is missing. The filing party/attorney is directed to correct the deficiency immediately. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) (kmc)
November 21, 2022 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil and Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) (kmc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Uhlig, LLC v. PropLogix, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Uhlig, LLC doing business as CondoCerts doing business as WelcomeLink
Represented By: Juliet Ann Cox
Represented By: Heather N. Tilley
Represented By: Thomas William Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PropLogix, LLC
Represented By: Cary Matthew Snyder
Represented By: David H. Wallace
Represented By: Jennifer Helen Salva
Represented By: Philip R. Bautista
Represented By: Stephen J. Torline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?