Indigo Ag, Inc. et al v. Deines-Pollan Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Indigo Ag, Inc. and Indigo Marketplace, LLC
Defendant: Deines-Pollan Services, LLC, Michael Deines and Ag Astra, LLC
Case Number: 2:2023cv02034
Filed: January 27, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Gwynne E Birzer
Referring Judge: Eric F Melgren
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2023 Filing 19 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Ag Astra, LLC. Amendment to #14 Corporate Disclosure Statement . (Woods, Samantha)
March 27, 2023 Filing 18 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Deines-Pollan Services, LLC. Amendment to #15 Corporate Disclosure Statement . (Woods, Samantha)
March 20, 2023 Filing 17 AMENDED CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Indigo Ag, Inc., Indigo Marketplace, LLC identifying Indigo Ag, Inc. as corporate parent. (Thompson, Robert)
March 9, 2023 Filing 16 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendants Ag Astra, LLC, Michael Deines, Deines-Pollan Services, LLC - trial to be held in Wichita. (Woods, Samantha)
March 9, 2023 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deines-Pollan Services, LLC identifying None as corporate parent . (Woods, Samantha)
March 9, 2023 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ag Astra, LLC identifying None as corporate parent . (Woods, Samantha)
March 9, 2023 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Ag Astra, LLC, Michael Deines, Deines-Pollan Services, LLC. (Woods, Samantha)
March 9, 2023 Filing 12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Ag Astra, LLC, Michael Deines, Deines-Pollan Services, LLC. (Woods, Samantha)
February 23, 2023 Filing 11 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 3/13/2023 for Defendant Ag Astra, LLC to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 2/23/2023. (jsh)
February 23, 2023 Filing 10 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 3/9/2023 for Defendants Michael Deines, Deines-Pollan Services, LLC to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 2/23/2023. (jsh)
February 23, 2023 Filing 9 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by William Rick Griffin on behalf of All Defendants. (Griffin, William)
February 23, 2023 Filing 8 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Samantha M. H. Woods on behalf of All Defendants. (Woods, Samantha)
February 13, 2023 Filing 7 EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT of #6 First Amended Complaint by Plaintiffs Indigo Ag, Inc., Indigo Marketplace, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10)(Stout, Courtney)
February 13, 2023 Filing 6 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ag Astra, LLC, Michael Deines, Deines-Pollan Services, LLC, filed by Indigo Ag, Inc., Indigo Marketplace, LLC. (Stout, Courtney)
February 10, 2023 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Indigo Ag, Inc., Indigo Marketplace, LLC upon Deines-Pollan Services, LLC served on 2/2/2023, answer due 2/23/2023 (Stout, Courtney)
February 10, 2023 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Indigo Ag, Inc., Indigo Marketplace, LLC upon Michael Deines served on 2/2/2023, answer due 2/23/2023 (Stout, Courtney)
February 10, 2023 Filing 3 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Indigo Ag, Inc., Indigo Marketplace, LLC upon Ag Astra, LLC served on 2/6/2023, answer due 2/27/2023 (Stout, Courtney)
January 30, 2023 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to Chief District Judge Eric F. Melgren and Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE AVAILABILITY: A United States magistrate judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action if all parties voluntarily consent. Information & consent forms are available at http://www.uscourts.gov/forms/civil-forms/notice-consent-and-reference-civil-action-magistrate-judge (jk)
January 30, 2023 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ag Astra, LLC, Michael Deines, Deines-Pollan Services, LLC (issued to Attorney for service). Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge Form provided to counsel for service with complaint. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (jk)
January 27, 2023 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Indigo Ag, Inc., Indigo Marketplace, LLC identifying Indigo Agriculture, Inc. and Indigo Ag, Inc. as corporate parent. (Thompson, Robert)
January 27, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City (Filing fee $402, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5971180.), filed by Indigo Ag, Inc., Indigo Marketplace, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Designation of Place of Trial, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7)(Thompson, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Indigo Ag, Inc. et al v. Deines-Pollan Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Indigo Ag, Inc.
Represented By: Robert M. Thompson
Represented By: Courtney Marie Stout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Indigo Marketplace, LLC
Represented By: Robert M. Thompson
Represented By: Courtney Marie Stout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deines-Pollan Services, LLC
Represented By: Samantha M. H. Woods
Represented By: William Rick Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Deines
Represented By: Samantha M. H. Woods
Represented By: William Rick Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ag Astra, LLC
Represented By: Samantha M. H. Woods
Represented By: William Rick Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?