Baker v. Chin et al
Plaintiff: Richard Kent Baker and Douglas Baker
Defendant: Alan Chin, Lillian Yuen, Linda Leong, Michael Leong, Connie Gereaux, Enviroguard, LLC and Millennium Green, LLC
Case Number: 2:2023cv02103
Filed: March 6, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Daniel D Crabtree
Referring Judge: Teresa J James
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #24 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for a Stay of Proceedings Until a Personal Representative is Appointed for Richard Baker. The Court grants a stay of this case pending further order of the Court. A telephone Status Conference is set for 6/13/2023 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James. Participants must dial 1-888-363-4749 and enter ACCESS CODE 4901386 to join the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 4/26/2023.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (byk)
April 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: Per 25 Order, telephone Status Conference set for 6/13/2023 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James. (TJJ-CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749 ACCESS CODE 4901386). (byk)
April 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Unopposed MOTION to Stay Case (Until a Personal Representative is Appointed for Richard Baker) by Plaintiff Douglas Baker (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Dougherty, Eddie)
April 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #21 Defendants Alan Chin, Lillian Yuan, Enviroguard, LLC, and Millennium Green, LLC's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendants Alan Chin, Lillian Yuan, Enviroguard, LLC, and Millennium Green, LLC, are hereby granted a fourteen (14) day extension of time, up to and including 5/4/2023, to answer, move, or otherwise respond to #1 Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 4/9/2023. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (byk)
April 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Carson M. Hinderks on behalf of Alan Chin, Enviroguard, LLC, Millennium Green, LLC, Lillian Yuen. (Hinderks, Carson)
April 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (attorney) by Defendants Alan Chin, Enviroguard, LLC, Millennium Green, LLC, Lillian Yuen (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Durone, Anthony)
April 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Anthony J. Durone on behalf of Alan Chin, Enviroguard, LLC, Millennium Green, LLC, Lillian Yuen. (Durone, Anthony)
April 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Defendants Linda Leong and Michael Leong's Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendants Linda Leong and Michael Leong are hereby granted a fourteen (14) day extension of time, up to and including 5/4/2023, to answer, move, or otherwise respond to #1 Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 4/17/2023. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (byk)
April 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Move, Or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendants Linda Leong, Michael Leong (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Brandt, William)
April 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SUGGESTION OF DEATH as to Richard Baker by Douglas Baker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Douglas Baker)(Dougherty, Eddie)
April 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Christopher M. Huck for Linda Leong and Michael Leong pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 04/03/2023. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (kmc)
April 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION for attorney Christopher M. Huck to appear pro hac vice (Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-6026861.) by Defendants Linda Leong, Michael Leong. (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Brandt, William)
March 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Defendants Linda Leong and Michael Leong's Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendants Linda Leong and Michael Leong are hereby granted a fourteen (14) day extension of time, up to and including 4/20/2023, to answer, move, or otherwise respond to #1 Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 3/31/2023. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (byk)
March 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendants Linda Leong, Michael Leong. (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Brandt, William)
March 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Emily Lynn Cipra on behalf of Linda Leong, Michael Leong. (Cipra, Emily)
March 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Emily L. Cipra on behalf of Linda Leong, Michael Leong. (Brandt, William) Modified on 3/31/2023, wrong attorney logged in. (mam)
March 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by William Perry Brandt on behalf of Linda Leong, Michael Leong. (Brandt, William)
March 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Douglas Baker upon Michael Leong served on 3/16/2023, answer due 4/6/2023. (Dougherty, Eddie)
March 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Douglas Baker upon Linda Leong served on 3/16/2023, answer due 4/6/2023. (Dougherty, Eddie)
March 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Douglas Baker upon Millennium Green, LLC served on 3/16/2023, answer due 4/6/2023. (Dougherty, Eddie)
March 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Douglas Baker upon Enviroguard, LLC served on 3/16/2023, answer due 4/6/2023. (Dougherty, Eddie)
March 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Douglas Baker upon Lillian Yuen served on 3/16/2023, answer due 4/6/2023. (Dougherty, Eddie)
March 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Douglas Baker upon Alan Chin served on 3/16/2023, answer due 4/6/2023. (Dougherty, Eddie)
March 7, 2023 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE AVAILABILITY: A United States magistrate judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action if all parties voluntarily consent. Information & consent forms are available at http://www.uscourts.gov/forms/civil-forms/notice-consent-and-reference-civil-action-magistrate-judge (jk)
March 7, 2023 Opinion or Order SUMMONS ISSUED as to Alan Chin, Enviroguard, LLC, Connie Gereaux, Linda Leong, Michael Leong, Millennium Green, LLC, Lillian Yuen (issued to Attorney for service). Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge Form provided to counsel for service with complaint. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (jk)
March 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Douglas Baker - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Dougherty, Eddie) Modified on 3/7/2023 to correct the filer name. (jk)
March 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Douglas Baker. (Dougherty, Eddie) Modified on 3/7/2023 to correct the filer name. (jk)
March 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City (Filing fee $402, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-6004187.), filed by Douglas Baker. (Dougherty, Eddie) Modified on 3/7/2023 to correct the filer name. (jk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baker v. Chin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Kent Baker
Represented By: Eddie G. Dougherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Baker
Represented By: Eddie G. Dougherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan Chin
Represented By: Anthony J. Durone
Represented By: Carson M. Hinderks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lillian Yuen
Represented By: Anthony J. Durone
Represented By: Carson M. Hinderks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Leong
Represented By: Christopher M. Huck
Represented By: Emily Lynn Cipra
Represented By: William Perry Brandt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Leong
Represented By: Christopher M. Huck
Represented By: Emily Lynn Cipra
Represented By: William Perry Brandt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connie Gereaux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enviroguard, LLC
Represented By: Anthony J. Durone
Represented By: Carson M. Hinderks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Millennium Green, LLC
Represented By: Anthony J. Durone
Represented By: Carson M. Hinderks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?