Newton v. Atchison, Kansas, City of et al
Plaintiff: Lloyd A. Newton
Defendant: Atchison, Kansas, City of, Lisa Moody, Curtis Wheeler and Phil Burke
Case Number: 2:2023cv02153
Filed: April 5, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: John W Broomes
Referring Judge: Angel D Mitchell
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER denying #11 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 5/31/2023. (kas)
May 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION to Compel inspection and specify code violation by Plaintiff Lloyd A. Newton (referred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit for Motion to Compel, #2 Exhibits in support)(Newton, Lloyd)
May 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Based on the attached correspondence in which defense counsel indicates that Defendant City of Atchison will not take action against Plaintiff's property during the pendency of this proceeding, (Doc. 8) motion for a temporary restraining order is DENIED AS MOOT without prejudice to refiling because there is no irreparable harm if the motion is not granted. The parties are directed to proceed with the normal course of litigation in this matter.Entered by District Judge John W. Broomes on 05/12/2023. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jmr)
May 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PROPOSED ORDER re TRO and Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Lloyd A. Newton (referred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell) (Newton, Lloyd) Modified on 5/12/2023 to terminate motion per JWB chambers and retitle document (sz).
May 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Lloyd A. Newton (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List Exhibits to TRO)(Newton, Lloyd). Added MOTION for Preliminary Injunction on 5/12/2023 (kas).
May 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Curtis Wheeler, Lisa Moody, Atchison, Kansas, City of, Phil Burke. All Defendants. (Seck, Michael)
April 28, 2023 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION: Plaintiff Lloyd A. Newton is a registered pro se participant with e-filing & ECF notifications. (gw)
April 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons to Phil Burke by Lloyd A. Newton. (jk)
April 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons to Curtis Wheeler by Lloyd A. Newton. (jk)
April 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons to Lisa Moody by Lloyd A. Newton. (jk)
April 6, 2023 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge John W. Broomes and Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE AVAILABILITY: A United States magistrate judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action if all parties voluntarily consent. Information & consent forms are available at http://www.uscourts.gov/forms/civil-forms/notice-consent-and-reference-civil-action-magistrate-judge (jk)
April 6, 2023 Opinion or Order SUMMONS ISSUED as to Atchison, Kansas, City of, Phil Burke, Lisa Moody, Curtis Wheeler (Returned to plaintiff for service). Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge Form provided to Plaintiff for service with complaint. Copy of nef mailed to pro se Plaintiff Lloyd A. Newton at 1859 W. Summit Ave., San Antonio, TX 78201 by regular mail. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (jk)
April 6, 2023 Opinion or Order FILING FEE PAID: in the amount of $402, receipt number 200000586. (jk)
April 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons to City of Atchison, by Lloyd A. Newton. (jk)
April 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Lloyd A. Newton. (jk)
April 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City, filed by Lloyd A. Newton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (jk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Newton v. Atchison, Kansas, City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lloyd A. Newton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atchison, Kansas, City of
Represented By: Michael K. Seck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Moody
Represented By: Michael K. Seck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curtis Wheeler
Represented By: Michael K. Seck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phil Burke
Represented By: Michael K. Seck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?